Huch v. United States Of America
Case Number: 5:2006cv06641
Filed: October 25, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Excise Tax
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re: 52 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/28/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 Notice (Other) filed by United States Of America, Case stayed. Trial (11/3) and Pretrial conference (10/28) dates vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/26/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huch v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?