Medina v. Countrywide Home Loans Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv06774
Filed: October 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS WESTMORT CORP. AND VALERIE TOUNG-VI NGUYEN PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a) re 193 Stipulation filed by Martin Medina. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
December 10, 2008 192 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURUSANT to FRCP 419a)(1) as to DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. re 189 Stipulation. The Order to Show Cause set for 12/15/2008 is VACATED. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 5, 2008 188 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER As Modified by the Court to Continue Show Cause Hearing from 11/10/2008 to 12/15/2008 re 187 Stipulation filed by Martin Medina. The parties are to file a stipulated dismissal on or before 11/24/2008. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/15/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/5/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Countrywide Home Loans Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?