Elvira Teran et al v. County Of Monterey et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv06947
Filed: November 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 20, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
May 20, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 20, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
April 28, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FROM 5/4/2009 TO 6/1/2009 re 134 Stipulation. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 5/22/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 10, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE from 4/13/2009 to 5/4/2009. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 4/24/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
October 1, 2008 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 56 Defendant Taser's Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff, 58 Stipulation . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/1/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/1/2008) Modified docket text on 10/8/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 56 Defendant Taser's "Ex Parte" Motion to Extend the Discovery Cutoff. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/26/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elvira Teran et al v. County Of Monterey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?