Robinson v. Carey

Case Number: 5:2006cv06960
Filed: November 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/30/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
April 24, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 31 Motion for Fourth Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
March 18, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
December 9, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
October 15, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 19 Granting Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/10/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?