Person v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Carl E. Person contends that defendant Google, Inc.\'s quality score analysis prevents him from purchasing keyword targeted internet advertising at the advertised minimum cost-per-click prices and discriminates against him and other small business users who are not high volume advertisers.

Related case: Person v. Google, Inc. from the U.S. District Court-Southern District of New York.

Plaintiff: Carl E. Person
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2006cv07297
Filed: November 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2007 63
Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal 59 Notice of Appeal : (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
July 24, 2007 59
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 57 Judgment, 56 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Carl E. Person. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 5461101390. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2007 (gm, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 57
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/25/2007. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 15, 2007 55
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2007 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/15/2007) re 46 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2007)
June 1, 2007 54
Proof of Service via U.S. MAIL . re 53 (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/1/2007) Modified on 6/5/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2007 50 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 49 Stipulation filed by Carl E. Person, Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2007 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/10/07. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
May 9, 2007 49
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO ADJOURN CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JUNE 15, 2007 by Carl E. Person. (Person, Carl) (Filed on 5/9/2007)
April 30, 2007 48
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion To Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 47 Declaration in Support, (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
March 21, 2007 44
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2007 10:30 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 16, 2007 43 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 17 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2007)
March 14, 2007 42
NOTICE of Appearance by Carl E. Person , Pro Se [for ECF filings] (Person, Carl) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 9, 2007 41
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2007 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 3/9/2007) re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google Inc. and [21] MOTION for Leave to File filed by Carl E. Person. The motions are taken under submission. The Case Management Conference is not held. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2007)
March 1, 2007 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE re 37 Stipulation filed by Google Inc., Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2007 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/1/07. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007)
February 27, 2007 39
Reply Memorandum re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byGoogle Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/27/2007)
February 22, 2007 38
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, March 7, 2007 at 10:30 a.m. PST. ADR Unit will initiate the call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2007)
February 21, 2007 37
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Adjourn Case Management Conference to March 9, 2007 at 2:00pm by Google Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/21/2007)
February 15, 2007 32
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Google Inc. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
February 14, 2007 30
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 13, 2007 29 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part [21] Motion for Administrative Relief (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2007)
February 12, 2007 27
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 25 Memorandum in Opposition,, 26 Declaration in Support (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
January 25, 2007 19
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 18 Declaration in Support, (Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 18, 2007 16
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2007 10:30 AM. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2007)
January 5, 2007 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RELATING CASES.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/07. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
January 2, 2007 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 7 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion for Transfer to San Jose Division, 8 Declaration in Support, (Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/2/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Person v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E. Person
Represented By: Carl E. Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?