Kessler v. United States Of America

Case Number: 5:2006cv07492
Filed: December 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL RE: 58 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
April 20, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 56 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 5, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
December 5, 2008 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 48 Stipulation filed by John Kessler. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/5/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?