Grateful Dead Productions et al v. Sagan et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv07727
Filed: December 18, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2009 229 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of All Remaining Claims and Counterclaims Being Asserted In Action Without Prejudice and Dismissal of Entire Action re 228 Stipulation. The Court terminates all pending deadlines, hearings and motions. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 12, 2008 226 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 224 Stipulation. PARTIES TO LODGE AND SERVE EXPERT DISCLOSURES FROM DECEMBER 8, 2008 TO DECEMBER 30, 2008; AND REBUTTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURES FROM DECEMBER 22, 2008 TO JANUARY 13, 2009. All other deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Order shall remain unchanged. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
November 17, 2008 223 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT ROBERT WEIR re 213 Stipulation filed by Bill Graham Archives LLC, William Sagan, Norton LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 29, 2008 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to Clarify Operative Causes of Action in Advance of November 17 Hearing. In addition by 11/12/08 at 3:00pm the moving parties SHALL deliver to the Court, by way of the Clerk's Office, a tabbed three ring binder containing the opening brief and any supporting documents. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 29, 2008. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008) Modified on 11/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grateful Dead Productions et al v. Sagan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?