Gebrezgiabher v. Mike

Case Number: 5:2006cv07864
Filed: December 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 64 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
September 22, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Appealability. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
August 25, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/24/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gebrezgiabher v. Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?