O'Haire v. Napa State Hospital et al

Case Number: 5:2007cv00002
Filed: December 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2014 196 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 195 of Dismissal With Prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/8/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
November 13, 2013 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 190 Granting Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference. FINAL CONTINUANCE. When the Settlement is Finalized - Parties are to File a Dismissal by 12/16/2013 or Appear for the Case Management Conference on 12/20/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/13/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
August 1, 2013 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 181 Granting Request to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/1/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
June 28, 2013 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 178 Granting Request to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2013 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/28/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
April 24, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 175 Granting Request to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
March 28, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 173 Granting Request to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/28/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
February 26, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/26/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 7, 2013 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 167 Granting Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/7/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
October 22, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 160 Granting Request to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
July 3, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 153 Granting Joint Stipualtion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2012 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/3/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
February 29, 2012 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 149 Granting Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time: Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/29/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
October 24, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL, Attorney Gary Ross Allen for Paul D. O'Haire added. Status Conference set for 12/2/11 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/24/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
June 3, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Plaintiff to Federal Pro Bono Project and Staying Proceedings Pending Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/3/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
January 27, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING writ of habeas corpus to transport plaintiff to settlement conference February 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/25/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 10, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for transport of Plaintiff/inmate to Solano State Prison for settlement conference 2/1/11 issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/7/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
June 24, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Granting 121 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
February 9, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Denying 116 Motion to Compel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 5, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Addressing Pending Discovery Motions by Judge Ronald M. Whyte 77 , 78 , 81 , 82 , 83 . (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 8, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
August 7, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting in Part and Denying in Part 47 Napa State Hospital Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Granting 60 Disability Rights California and Kessler's Motion to Dismiss. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
April 16, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 67 and vacating hearing (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
March 9, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO COMPEL 65 66 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
December 9, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 44 Granting Extension of Time; Directing Defendant NSH to Respond to Request by Plaintiff by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
November 12, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel Denying 41 Motion for Summons; Granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
September 11, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Claims; Directing Served Defendants to File Answer or Notice of Appearance; Directing Plaintiff to Serve Unserved Defendants or Show Cause for Lack of Service; Denying 37 Motion for an Initial Assessment of Costs; Denying as Moot 33 Motion to Advance Screening of Case; Instructions to Clerk by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Haire v. Napa State Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?