Kaltwasser v. Cingular Wireless, LLC

Plaintiff: Jonathan C Kaltwasser
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 5:2007cv00411
Filed: January 22, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/15/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
September 29, 2011 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS STATEMENT Status Report due by 10/11/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 186 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS re 177 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/17/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
September 13, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
June 30, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL 155 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO CITE JUNE 21, 2010 ORDER. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 21, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DEFERRING DETERMINATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/21/2010. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 8, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 146 EMERGENCY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO STAY ACTION. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
April 27, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AMENDING ORDER ENTERED ON MARCH 22, 2010 (approving 135 ). Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2010 is RESET for 6/11/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 13, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ADDITIONAL PAGES FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING re 128 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/12/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
March 22, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AMENDING ORDER ENTERED ON FEBRUARY 11, 2010 (approving 115 ). The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for class certification, previously set for 5/7/2010, is RESET for 5/21/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
February 11, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AMENDING ORDER ENTERED ON DECEMBER 4, 2009 (approving 105 ). Motion For Class Certification set for hearing on 5/7/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/11/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
December 15, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 94 Stipulation filed by Jonathan C Kaltwasser. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on December 15, 2008. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaltwasser v. Cingular Wireless, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Nathan Lewis Garroway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan C Kaltwasser
Represented By: Janet Lindner Spielberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?