Shloss v. Joyce Featured Case

Case consolidated with Schloss v. Sweeney et al.

Plaintiff: Carol Loeb Shloss
Defendant: Stephen James Joyce
Case Number: 5:2007cv00517
Filed: January 25, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2007 FILE LOCATED AT FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER (FRC) San Bruno, CA. Accession #:021-07-0061; Location #: 735542; Box #: 192. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
March 29, 2007 7 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the settlement agreement attached to lead case C06-3718 JW as exhibit 1, Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/28/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2007) Modified on 3/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2007 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Howard R. Lloyd as the Referral Judge. Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 3/20/07. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2007 (srm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING CONSOLIDATING CASES. The clerk shall CONSOLIDATE actions C06-3718 JW with C07-517 MEJ. All future filings shall be in LEAD CASE C 06-03718 JW Shloss v Sweeny Case number C07-517 MEJ, Plaintiff shall effect service of process on defendant by 9/10/07.re 4 Order Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Status Conference set for 9/10/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/16/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2007) Modified text on 3/20/2007, to correct typographical error. (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. The Court invites the parties to appear for a Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2007 10:00 AM before Hon. James Ware, Courtroom #8, 4th Floor. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/21/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2007)
January 31, 2007 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding COPYRIGHT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2007)
January 25, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 25, 2007 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2007. Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/25/07. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 25, 2007 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Stephen James Joyce ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 5461100033.). Filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2007 (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shloss v. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Loeb Shloss
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen James Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?