Fitzhugh v. Marshall

Petitioner: Kenneth Carroll Fitzhugh, Jr.
Respondent: John Marshall
Case Number: 5:2007cv01091
Filed: February 22, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/20/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
February 12, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/10/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
November 20, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Allowing Further Briefing on Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
February 6, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzhugh v. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Carroll Fitzhugh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Marshall
Represented By: Catherine Amy Rivlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?