C., v. Palo Alto Housing Corp., et al

Plaintiff: Alyssa C.,
Defendant: Palo Alto Housing Corp.,, Palo Alto Housing Services, LLC and The City of Palo Alto
Case Number: 5:2007cv01112
Filed: February 23, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Complaint with Prejudice pursuant to settlement agreement, with all claims for fees and costs satisfied by settlement re 33 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
February 19, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM. Stipulated Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 4/3/2009. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
January 22, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 22, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C., v. Palo Alto Housing Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto Housing Corp.,
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto Housing Services, LLC
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Palo Alto
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa C.,
Represented By: Michael Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?