Valencia et al v. French Connection Bakery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Freddy Gomez, Arturo Valencia, Cesar Sancruz, Javier Santacruz and Edgar Santacruz
Defendant: French Connection Bakery, Inc. and Amirali Amini Aliabadi
Mediator: Jean C. Gaskill
Case Number: 5:2007cv01118
Filed: February 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/26/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 96 Plaintiffs' Motion to Subpoena Certain Documents Concerning a Third-party Witness Ann Joe after Discovery Cut-Off. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATED ORDER re (21 in 5:08-cv-00996-PVT) to Extend Discovery Cutoff Date. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/23/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re (65 in 5:07-cv-01118-PVT, 19 in 5:08-cv-00996-PVT) Striking Class Allegations from Complaint. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/5/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Class Allegations Should Not Be Stricken. Show Cause Response due by 12/4/2008. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/20/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia et al v. French Connection Bakery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Gomez
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Valencia
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Sancruz
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Santacruz
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Santacruz
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: French Connection Bakery, Inc.
Represented By: Ali Pasha Hamidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amirali Amini Aliabadi
Represented By: Ali Pasha Hamidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Jean C. Gaskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?