Houston Casualty Company v. International Grand Tours, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Houston Casualty Company
Defendant: International Grand Tours, Inc. and Norman Ronnie Hansen
Case Number: 5:2007cv01188
Filed: February 28, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 126 for Dismissal With Prejudice, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/21/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
August 28, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 121 for Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiff/Intervenors Edwardsville, Edwardsville [Ill] Community School District #7 terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/28/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
November 5, 2008 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting 103 Motion to Quash Service; granting 103 Motion to Set Aside Default. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
September 26, 2008 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Whyte on 09/26/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Casualty Company v. International Grand Tours, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Grand Tours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Ronnie Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Casualty Company
Represented By: Louis Harrison Castoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?