Enwere v. Terman Apartments, LP et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Enwere
Defendant: Terman Associates, L.P., G&K Management Company, Inc. and Tatyana Mendhuk
Case Number: 5:2007cv01239
Filed: March 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Sua Sponte Judicial Referral Regarding Related Case, also filed in Case No. C-11-00727 JCS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 11, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER re Mid-Deposition Disputes. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/19/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/16/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Scheduling Plaintiff's Deposition for March 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/2/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re 142 Defendants' Request for Clarification and Assistance in Scheduling. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/12/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER OVERRULING 141 OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/9/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re 139 Denying Defendants' Request for Clarification and Assistance in Scheduling. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/15/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING 128 REQUEST FOR STAY AND ADJUSTING SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/9/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 115 Motion to Compel San Mateo County Health Department to Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 INTERIM ORDER re 115 Defendants Motion to Compel San Mateo County Health Department to Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/3/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DENYING 118 REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/26/08. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re 116 Denying Defendants' Request to Appear by Courtcall at Motions to Compel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/18/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER re 113 Granting Plaintiff's Request to Extend Deadline to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/4/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 INTERIM ORDER re 105 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/15/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re 101 HUD's Response to Order Dated September 17, 2008. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/19/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re 98 HUDs Statement of Compliance with Order Dated September 10, 2008. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/17/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting in Part and Deferring in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel HUD to Comply with Subpoena. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enwere v. Terman Apartments, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Enwere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terman Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Eve Helayne Lewin Wagner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&K Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Eve Helayne Lewin Wagner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatyana Mendhuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?