Hightower v. Felker

Petitioner: Kyron Lamont Hightower
Respondent: T. Felker
Case Number: 5:2007cv01338
Filed: March 7, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 44 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
June 17, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 38 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal and Application for Certificate of Appealability. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
March 18, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
September 11, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 15 Motion to Stay; Granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hightower v. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyron Lamont Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?