The Facebook, Inc. v. Connectu, Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg alleges that Defendants ConnectU, Inc., Cameron WInklevoss, Tyler Vinklevoss, Divya Narendra, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Wiliams, Wayne Change and David Gucwa circumvented the Terms of Use for the Facebook website by illicitly employing the user IDs and passwords of friends to mask Defendants\' real identities, accessed the Facebook website to steal information and data for commercial purposes, and advertised to and solicited members to join www.connectu.com.

Plaintiff: The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg
Defendant: David Gucwa, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams, ConnectU LLC and Wayne Chang
Undetermined: Fenwick & West LLP and R. Gregory Roussel
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss
Special Master: Special Master George C. Fisher
Other: Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.
Interested Party: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP
Trustee: Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
Intervenor: CNET Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv01389
Filed: March 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
0 Judge: Maria-Elena James
1 Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2013 Remarks: Case files returned from Court of Appeals (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
December 14, 2011 Filing 803 NOTICE by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP Notice of Satisfaction of Attorneys' Lien (Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 802 NOTICE by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P. of Satisfaction and Extinguishment of Attorneys' Lien (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 801 FILED UNDER SEAL ORDER re #798 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER by Judge James Ware finding as moot #776 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot #778 Motion (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 798 REDACTED Proposed Order. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 797 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 28, 2011, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/29/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 796 NOTICE by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss Of Withdrawal Of All Pending Motions In Massachusetts District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 795 Minute Entry: Arguments heard. Trustee to submit proposed order of disbursal (under seal). Defendants to notify Court whether Massachusetts case is going forward. Case continued to 12/5/11 at 9:00 am.Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 11/28/2011) re #790 MOTION Administrative Relief to Attend Hearing by Telephone filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP, #791 MOTION to Appear by Telephone , Administrative Request for Relief, filed by Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP, #776 MOTION for Attorney Fees Partially Under Seal/Redacted filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P., #778 MOTION To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration - REDACTED VERSION filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. Status Conference set for 12/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 794 NOTICE of Appearance by Merri Anne Baldwin re John G. Heller appearing for Finnegan, Henderson, et al. (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 793 ORDER by Judge James Ware DENYING #791 Motion to Appear by Telephone (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER by Judge James Ware DENYING #790 Motion appear by telephone (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 18, 2011 Filing 791 MOTION to Appear by Telephone , Administrative Request for Relief, filed by Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP. (Parke, Evan) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 18, 2011 Filing 790 MOTION Administrative Relief to Attend Hearing by Telephone filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 11/22/2011. (Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 9, 2011 Filing 789 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #773 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Reply In Support Of Motion To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Schrag, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 Filing 788 REPLY (re #776 MOTION for Attorney Fees Partially Under Seal/Redacted ) in Support of Motion for Disbursement of Settlement Proceeds to Finnegan Henderson for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed byFinnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.. (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 Filing 787 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #773 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISBURSING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS FROM ESCROW IN ACCORDANCE WITH JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS LIEN by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Wolfson Declaration)(Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 786 RESPONSE (re #776 MOTION for Attorney Fees Partially Under Seal/Redacted, #778 MOTION To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration - REDACTED VERSION ) (THIS DOCUMENT REPLACES DOCKET NO. 783) - FACEBOOK, INC. AND MARK ZUCKERBERGS CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO: 1) MOTION OF CONNECTU FOUNDERS TO PAY LIENHOLDERS AND COMPLETE EXCHANGE OF CONSIDERATION (DKT NO. 777); 2) QUINN EMANUELS MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISBURSING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS (DKT. NO. 775); AND 3) MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS TO FINNEGAN HENDERSON (DKT. NO. 776) [REDACTED VERSION] filed byThe Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 785 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re #782 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #781 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 784 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of #783 Opposition/Response to Motion,, CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO: 1) MOTION OF CONNECTU FOUNDERS TO PAY LIENHOLDERS AND COMPLETE EXCHANGE OF CONSIDERATION (DKT NO. 777); 2) QUINN EMANUELS MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISBURSING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS (DKT. NO. 775); AND 3) MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS TO FINNEGAN HENDERSON (DKT. NO. 776) (REDACTED Version) filed byThe Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #783 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 783 *** RESPONSE FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE REFER TO #786 . *** RESPONSE (re #776 MOTION for Attorney Fees Partially Under Seal/Redacted, #778 MOTION To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration - REDACTED VERSION ) CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO: 1) MOTION OF CONNECTU FOUNDERS TO PAY LIENHOLDERS AND COMPLETE EXCHANGE OF CONSIDERATION (DKT NO. 777); 2) QUINN EMANUELS MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISBURSING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS (DKT. NO. 775); AND 3) MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS TO FINNEGAN HENDERSON (DKT. NO. 776) (REDACTED Version) filed byThe Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/7/2011) Modified on 11/8/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/8/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 Filing 782 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #773 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, I. Neel Chatterjee Declaration In Support of CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO: 1) MOTION OF CONNECTU FOUNDERS TO PAY LIENHOLDERS AND COMPLETE EXCHANGE OF CONSIDERATION (DKT NO. 777); 2) QUINN EMANUELS MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISBURSING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS (DKT. NO. 775); AND 3) MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS TO FINNEGAN HENDERSON (DKT. NO. 776) by The Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 781 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #773 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO: 1) MOTION OF CONNECTU FOUNDERS TO PAY LIENHOLDERS AND COMPLETE EXCHANGE OF CONSIDERATION (DKT NO. 777); 2) QUINN EMANUELS MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISBURSING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS (DKT. NO. 775); AND 3) MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS TO FINNEGAN HENDERSON (DKT. NO. 776) by The Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 780 AFFIDAVIT re #779 Document E-Filed Under Seal, EXHIBIT A TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID A. BARRETT ON BEHALF OF BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP AS COURT-APPOINTED TRUSTEE by Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP. (Parke, Evan) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 779 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #773 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID A. BARRETT ON BEHALF OF BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP AS COURT-APPOINTED TRUSTEE by Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT D)(Parke, Evan) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 778 MOTION To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration - REDACTED VERSION filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/9/2011. (Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 777 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #773 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Motion To Pay Lienholders And Complete The Exchange of Consideration by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Tyler Meade, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Tyler Meade, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Tyler Meade, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Tyler Meade)(Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 776 MOTION for Attorney Fees Partially Under Seal/Redacted filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/9/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 775 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #773 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Motion for Disbursement of Settlement Proceeds for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 774 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #773 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISBURSING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS FROM ESCROW IN ACCORDANCE WITH JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS LIEN by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam B. Wolfson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam B. Wolfson, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Adam B. Wolfson, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Adam B. Wolfson, #5 Proposed Order)(Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 1, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to: Motions to be filed by 11/3/11. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/9/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part #769 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #770 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 772 RESPONSE (re #770 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Administrative Request for Order Disbursing Settlement Proceeds filed byThe Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 27, 2011 Filing 771 RESPONSE (re #769 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Opposition to Administrative Request to File 15 Page Oversized Brief filed byThe Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 Filing 770 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 24, 2011 Filing 769 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 768 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 441.65 against ConnectU. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 767 *****FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD*****CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011) Modified on 5/23/2011 (sp, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER AND AMENDED OPINION of USCA (ALEX KOZINSKI, J. CLIFFORD WALLACE and BARRY G. SILVERMAN). Amending Disposition Opinion. Like the district court, At some point, litigation must come to an end. That point has now been reached. AFFIRMED; re: Winklevosses Claim The opinion is amended as follows: Page 4909, Lines 20-24 Replace < with < The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. See Fed. R. App. P. 35, 40. No further petitions for rehearing or rehearing en banc may be filed. related #764 OPINION as to #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #668 Notice of Appeal,filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011) Modified text on 5/26/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Filing 765 BILL OF COSTS by The Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 764 USCA FILED OPINION (ALEX KOZINSKI, J. CLIFFORD WALLACE and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) Like the district court litigation must come to an end. That point has now been reached. AFFIRMED. Judge: AK Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. re: #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, #668 Notice of Appeal filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Modified on 5/26/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER of USCA Filed (ALEX KOZINSKI, J. CLIFFORD WALLACE and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) Appellees February 18, 2009 motion to dismiss portions of this consolidated appeal is denied for the reasons set out in the opinion filed today. The motions for judicial notice and to strike portions of the briefs are denied as moot as to #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #668 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER Granting #759 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas B. Mason. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER Granting #758 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lisa Barclay. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 760 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #582 Notice of Appeal, 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, case number 08-16745 (Attachments: #1 Record Transmittal Form)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2011 Filing 759 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas B. Mason ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008969.) filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 758 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lisa Barclay ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008968.) filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 757 NOTICE by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P. Notice of Lien (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER of USCA (ALEX KOZINSKI, J. CLIFFORD WALLACE and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) Media organizations have expressed an interest in video recording the oral argument in these consolidated cases. Any party objecting to video recording must file its opposition, not to exceed 1,200 words, no later than 4:00 p.m., PST, on Friday, January 7, 2011. Information submitted to the court under seal may have since become public knowledge. The parties may each file a motion to unseal specific parts of the briefs and excerpts of record. Motions must be filed no later than 9:00 a.m., PST, on Monday, January 10, 2011, and may not exceed 1,200 words. Appended to each motion must be a list (1) identifying by page number the items to unseal and (2) providing a publicly available source for each item, if possible. Any opposition must be filed no later than 4:00 p.m., PST, on Monday, January 10, 2011, and may not exceed 1,200 words.as to #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #668 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying #751 Quinn Emanuel's Miscellaneous Administrative Request for an Order Disbursing Settlement Proceeds in Accordance with Arbitration Award (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER Granting #752 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 753 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP re #752 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #751 MOTION Administrative Relief (Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 752 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 751 MOTION Administrative Relief for an order disbursing settlement proceeds filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Van Dalsem, Bruce) (Filed on 12/17/2010) Modified on 12/17/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2010 Filing 750 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel as to #615 Notice of Cross-Appeal and #675 Notice of Cross-Appeal only. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010) Modified on 1/27/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER of USCA Filed (Appellate Commissioner) The motion of Facebook, et al., for voluntary dismissal of Nos. 08-16849 and 09-15133 under Federal Rule of Appellate Practice 42(b) is granted. The cross-appeals are dismissed without prejudice to movants filing later timely appeals from appealable orders. A copy of this order shall act as the mandate of this court as to Nos. 08-16849 and 09-15133 only. as to #675 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc., #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER of USCA Filed order (Appellate Commissioner)On December 11, 2009, the motions panel referred plaintiff Facebook's motion to dismiss portions of case Nos. 08-16745 and 08-16873 to the merits panel. The request of defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narenda ("the Founders") to withdraw their March 5, 2009 opposition to Facebook's motion to dismiss, in order to allow the movants to include a revised opposition to the motion in the first cross-appeal brief, is denied. The opposed motion of defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narenda ("the Founders") for leave to file an oversized first brief on cross-appeal of 20,609 words is granted in part. The defendants shall file a substitute first brief on cross-appeal not to exceed 17,500 words on or before April 26, 2010. The second cross-appeal brief is due May 26, 2010. The third cross-appeal brief is due June 25, 2010. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief. Volumes Four and Five of the Founders' excerpts of record shall be filed under seal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 27-13. The defendants may also file the substitute opening brief under seal. 9th Cir. R. 27-13.. (Pro Mo) 7281420 [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] as to #675 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc., #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc., #668 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER OVERRULING CONNECTUS OBJECTION TO CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE JAMES DECEMBER 30, 2009 ORDER AS PREMATURE re #742 Objection, filed by ConnectU LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 14, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 11, 2010 Filing 746 Joinder re #742 Objection, by The Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #741 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF SEEKING AN ORDER TO EXAMINE AND COPY SEALED DOCUMENTS. Permission is also granted for the court copy service to assist Howard Rice in copying those pleadings specified by Howard Rice. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010) Modified on 1/11/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2010 Filing 744 RESPONSE to re #741 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF SEEKING AN ORDER TO EXAMINE AND COPY SEALED DOCUMENTS by The Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Filing 743 AFFIDAVIT re #742 Objection, Declaration of Alison P. Buchanan in Support of Objection to Magistrate James' Order Denying ConnectU's Request for Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Towery, James) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Filing 742 OBJECTIONS to re #736 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ConnectU's Objection to Magistrate Judge James' Order Denying ConnectU's Request for Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 741 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF SEEKING AN ORDER TO EXAMINE AND COPY SEALED DOCUMENTS filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(SeLegue, Sean) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 Filing 740 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 739 MANDATE of USCA The Judgment of this Court, #725 entered 12/14/09, takes effect this date. This Constitutes the FORMAL MANDATE of this Court. as to #708 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #730 Motion to Seal (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice #727 Motion for hearing date relating to production of ConnectU's documents (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 28, 2009 Filing 735 RESPONSE to re #729 Joinder - Response to Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg's Joinder in ConnectU's Renewed Request For Hearing Date Relating to Production of ConnectU's Documents by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (SeLegue, Sean) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Filing 734 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Facebook, Inc. re #729 Joinder (Confidential Under Seal Exhibit A) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 738 EXHIBIT A (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2009 Filing 733 Declaration of Thomas B. Mason in Support of #731 Objection, to and Motion to Strike, ConnectU's Renewed Request For Hearing Date Relating to Production of ConnectU's Documents filed byDivya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #731 ) (SeLegue, Sean) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 732 Declaration of Sean M. SeLegue in Support of #731 Objection, to and Motion to Strike, ConnectU's Renewed Request For Hearing Date Relating to Production of ConnectU's Documents filed byDivya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #731 ) (SeLegue, Sean) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 731 OBJECTIONS to re #727 MOTION hearing date relating to production of ConnectU's Documents - Objection to, and Motion to Strike, ConnectU's Renewed Request For Hearing Date Relating to Production of ConnectU's Documents by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SeLegue, Sean) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Received Document Exhibit A (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 730 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg's Joinder filed by The Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 12/23/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2009 Filing 729 Joinder re #727 MOTION hearing date relating to production of ConnectU's Documents by The Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 728 Declaration of Alison P. Buchanan in Support of #727 MOTION hearing date relating to production of ConnectU's Documents filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #727 ) (Towery, James) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 727 MOTION hearing date relating to production of ConnectU's Documents filed by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying #718 Motion for Hearing (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER of USCA filed (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, PAMELA ANN RYMER and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) The courts October 9, 2009 order to show cause is discharged. This appeal is dismissed as unnecessary because the order appealed herein was issued by the district court on a limited remand pursuant to this courts July 1, 2009 order in consolidated appeals Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. The Clerk shall transfer all filings on the docket for appeal No. 09-17050 to consolidated appeal Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. The notice of appeal filed in this docket shall be filed as an amended notice of appeal in docket Nos. 08- 16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. This appeal is dismissed and all pending motions are denied as moot as to #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER of USCA Filed - (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, PAMELA ANN RYMER and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) The motion of Appellants and Cross-Appellees Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narenda (the Founders) to consolidate these appeals is granted. Previously consolidated appeal Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873 are now consolidated with appeal and cross-appeal Nos. 09-15021 and 09-15133. The stay of proceedings in these consolidated appeals is lifted. The motion to withdraw the opening brief filed on November 4, 2008 in consolidated appeal Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873 is granted. The brief is withdrawn. The Founders opposition to ConnectU, Inc.s motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 08-16745 is construed as a motion to intervene in appeal No. 08-16745. So construed, the motion is granted. ConnectU, Inc.s motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 08-16745 is construed as a motion to withdraw from that appeal. So construed, the motion is granted. The Facebook, Inc.s February 18, 2009 motion to dismiss portions of appeal Nos. 08-16745 and 08-16873 is referred to the panel that will decide the merits of this appeal. The Founders motion to reset the briefing schedule is granted in part. The first brief in these consolidated cross-appeals is due February 1, 2010; the second brief is due March 3, 2010; the third brief is due April 2, 2010; and the fourth brief is due within 14 days after service of the third brief. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. as to #708 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #675 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc., #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc., #668 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
November 30, 2009 Filing 723 Notice of Joinder and Joinder to Founders' Opposition to ConnectU's #718 Motion for a Telephonic Conference (Civil Local Rule 7-11) by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 11/30/2009) Modified on 12/1/2009 ,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2009 Filing 722 Proposed Order re #718 ConnectU's Rule 7-11 Motion re Scheduling Hearing re Contempt by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (SeLegue, Sean) (Filed on 11/30/2009) Modified on 12/1/2009 ,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2009 Filing 721 Memorandum in Opposition re #718 MOTION for Hearing CONNECTUS CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 MOTION FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE TO SCHEDULE A HEARING ON AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AGAINST THE FOUNDERS AND FINNEGAN filed byDivya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (SeLegue, Sean) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 23, 2009 Filing 720 Proposed Order re [ #718 MOTION for Hearing CONNECTUS CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 MOTION FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE TO SCHEDULE A HEARING ON AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AGAINST THE FOUNDERS AND FINNEGAN by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 11/23/2009) Modified on 11/30/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2009 Filing 719 Declaration in Support of #718 MOTION for Hearing CONNECTUS CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 MOTION FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE TO SCHEDULE A HEARING ON AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AGAINST THE FOUNDERS AND FINNEGAN filed byConnectU LLC. (Related document(s) #718 ) (Towery, James) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 Filing 718 MOTION for Hearing CONNECTUS CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 MOTION FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE TO SCHEDULE A HEARING ON AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AGAINST THE FOUNDERS AND FINNEGAN filed by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying #715 Motion (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 716 Declaration of ALISON P. BUCHANAN in Support of #715 MOTION REQUEST FOR HEARING DATE RELATING TO PRODUCTION OF CONNECTU'S DOCUMENTS filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #715 ) (Buchanan, Alison) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 715 MOTION REQUEST FOR HEARING DATE RELATING TO PRODUCTION OF CONNECTU'S DOCUMENTS filed by ConnectU LLC. (Buchanan, Alison) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
September 28, 2009 Filing 714 AMENDED Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re appeal #708 Notice of Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2009 Filing 713 *** Clerk's Error *** please see #714 Amended Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA #708 Notice of Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009,(typographical error.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2009 Filing 712 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 08/17/09 (minutes #690 ) Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez before Judge Ware, (SeLegue, Sean) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 Filing 711 USCA Case Number 09-17050 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #708 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 710 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #708 Notice of Appeal, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 709 RECEIVED: Civil Appeals Docketing Statement forwarded to 9th Circuit US Court of Appeals by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss re #708 Notice of Appeal, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 708 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #704 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 10/15/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order posted on 9/2/09, #2 Exhibit - Representation Statement)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 707 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Selegue (Selegue, Sean) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 706 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome B. Falk, Jr (Falk, Jerome) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 705 NOTICE of Appearance by John Phillip Duchemin (Duchemin, John) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER GRANTING CONNECTU'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR DELIVERY OF CLIENT FILES; REFERRING THE PARTIES TO CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE JAMES FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW OF CONNECTU'S CLIENT FILES by Judge James Ware finding as moot #692 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief; finding as moot #696 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ; granting #700 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal(jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009) Modified docket text on 9/3/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 Filing 703 PROOF OF SERVICE OF CONNECTU'S LOCAL RULE 7-11 Motion FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 Received Document motion (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 26, 2009 Filing 702 Proposed Order re #700 MOTION connectu's civil local rule 7-11 for leave to file promissory notes under seal by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 Filing 701 Declaration of ALISON P. BUCHANAN in Support of #700 MOTION connectu's civil local rule 7-11 motion for leave to file promissory notes under seal filed byConnectU LLC. (Related document(s) #700 ) (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 Filing 700 MOTION for Leave to File civil local rule 7-11 promissory notes under seal filed by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 Filing 699 Memorandum in Opposition #692 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 Filing 698 Proposed Order re #696 MOTION CONNECTU'S CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE the proposed one-page SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF and supporting declaration of J. E. Towery. Exhibits A and B to the supplemental brief. by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 Filing 697 Declaration of ALISON P. BUCHANAN IN SUPPORT OF CONNECTU'S #696 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 filed by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.)
August 26, 2009 Filing 696 MOTION CONNECTU'S CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 695 Proposed Order #692 Granting Founders Leave to File Supplemental Brief by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2009 Filing 694 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Founders' #692 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2009 Filing 693 RESPONSE to re #687 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #690 Motion Hearing, Concerning Court's Request for Additional Information on ConnectU Debt, by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Parke, Evan) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 692 MOTION for Leave to File Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narendra's Civil L.R. 7-11 Supplemental Brief filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2009 Filing 691 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/17/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2009. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 8/18/2009) Modified on 8/24/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2009 Filing 690 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re #686 Ninth Circuit Remand re Connectu's Motion to Disquality Counsel held on 8/17/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/17/2009). The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2009 Filing 689 RESPONSE to re #687 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, THE FOUNDERS STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER OF JULY 29, 2009, REGARDING CONNECTUS APPELLATE MOTION TO DISQUALIFY, AND DECLARATION by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Parke, Evan) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 688 STIPULATION FACEBOOK, ZUCKERBERG, AND CONNECTU'S JOINT STIPULATED FACTS RE: MOTION TO DISQUALIFY BY CONNECTU, INC. by ConnectU LLC. (Towery, James) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING AND SETTING HEARING ON CONNECTU'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY RE #686 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals' limited remand and mandate. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics on briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009) Modified docket text on 7/29/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER of USCA (ALEX KOZINSKI, RICHARD A. PAEZ and RICHARD C. TALLMAN) The motion of ConnectU, Inc. to substitute new counsel in consolidated appeals Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873 is granted. These consolidated and related appeals and cross-appeals are REMANDED to the district court for the limited purpose of enabling the district court to consider the issues raised in ConnectU, Inc.s motion to disqualify counsel, the opposition thereto and the reply filed in support of the motion. The Clerk shall forward to the district court ConnectU, Inc.s motion to disqualify counsel, the Founders response thereto and ConnectU, Inc.s reply, received on January 20, 2009, February 13, 2009 and February 26, 2009, respectively. Proceedings in these consolidated and related appeals are stayed pending further order of the court. Within 60 days of the filing date of this order or within 7 days of the district courts ruling on the motion to disqualify, whichever occurs first, the parties shall file a report on the status of district court proceedings and motion for appropriate relief. 6976558 [08-16745, 09-15021, 09-15133, 08-16873, 08-16849]as to #675 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc., #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc., #668 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 685 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/11/07, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Bryce, E-mail Courtreporter232@aol.com Telephone number (510)828-9404. Tape Number: FTR 10:30-12:47. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 684 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/16/08, before Judge Richard Seebog. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Bryce, E-mail Courtreporter232@aol.com Telephone number (510)828-9404. Tape Number: FTR 2:40-3:29. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 683 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION re: hearing dates #113 minutes of 7/11/07 FTR Kelly Bryce, #211 minutes of 10/10/07, #267 minutes of 1/16/08 FTR Kelly Bryce by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 2/9/2009) Modified text on 2/12/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2009 Filing 682 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal #668 Notice of Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 22, 2009 Filing 681 USCA Case Number 09-15133 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 680 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-28-08, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2009. (las, ) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 679 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form re #668 Notice of Appeal,, Transcript due by 1/20/2009. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Parke, Evan) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 678 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #675 Notice of Cross Appeal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2009 Filing 677 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #675 Notice of Cross Appeal, #676 Appeal Remark (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Filing 676 Representation statement re #675 Notice of Cross Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Filing 675 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to #667 Order, #232 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 2/6/2009. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Filing 674 USCA Case Number 09-15021 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #668 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 30, 2008 Filing 673 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #668 Notice of Appeal, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Filing 672 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File #669 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 671 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File #670 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 670 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2008 Filing 669 Representation statement pursuant to USCA rule 3-2 re #668 Notice of Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2008 Filing 668 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #667 Order, #653 Order, #476 Order, #428 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion to Seal Document, #461 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Sealed Motion, #665 Order, #610 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Stay by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 1/20/2009. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/8/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 15, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 666 Proposed Order by George C. Fisher. (Fisher, George) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 665 AMENDED JUDGMENT ORDERING SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF RELEASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 21, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION; AND VACATING THE NOVEMBER 3, 2008 JUDGMENT by Judge James Ware denying #657 Motion ; granting #659 Motion (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 663 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal #582 Notice of Appeal, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal,; USCA case no 08-16745 and 08-16849 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 662 Declaration of Evan A. Parke in Support of #661 Memorandum in Opposition, by Defendants, filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #661 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 661 Memorandum in Opposition re #657 MOTION Administrative Relief to Correct #653 Order, #659 MOTION for Clarification of re #653 Order, #654 Order by Defendants filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 660 Declaration in Support of Theresa A. Sutton in support of #659 MOTION for Clarification filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #659 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 Filing 659 MOTION for Clarification re #653 Order, #654 Order filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 Filing 658 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of #657 MOTION Administrative Relief to Correct 11.3.08 Order re #653 Order, filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #657 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 657 MOTION Administrative Relief to correct #653 Order filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER from the USCA re: #635 Petitioner has NOT demonstrated that the case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. The petition is DENIED. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER of USCA ("CNET") motion to intervene is GRANTED. CNET'S motion to unseal documents filed in the district court is DENIED. as to #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 654 JUDGMENT ORDERING SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF RELEASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 3, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER DIRECTING THE SPECIAL MASTER TO DELIVER THE PROPERTY BEING HELD IN TRUST TO THE PARTIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THEIR SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re #634 Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 3, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 652 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing (Date Filed: 10/28/2008). The Court to issue further order following hearing. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2008)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER Granting #641 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/23/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 648 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File docket #647 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/17/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 646 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File docket #644, and #645 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 651 EXHIBITS A,F,H,I,J,K, and N (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2008 Filing 647 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss re #644 Memorandum in response, #645 Declaration in Support (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2008 Received Exhibits A,F,H,I,J,K, and N (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 643 Proposed Order re #641 MOTION to Seal CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS (EXHIBITS A, F, H, I, J, K, AND N) TO DECLARATION OF EVAN A. PARKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 642 Declaration in Support of #641 MOTION to Seal CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS (EXHIBITS A, F, H, I, J, K, AND N) TO DECLARATION OF EVAN A. PARKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed byConnectU LLC. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 641 MOTION to Seal CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS (EXHIBITS A, F, H, I, J, K, AND N) TO DECLARATION OF EVAN A. PARKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 640 Exhibits A, F, H, I, J, K, and N to Parke Declaration NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2008) Modified text on 10/16/2008 ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***)(cv, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2008 Filing 639 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC re (EXHIBITS A, F, H, I, J, K, AND N)(submitted under seal) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2008) Modified text on 10/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2008 Filing 638 Declaration of Evan A. Parke in Support of #637 Response to Order to Show Cause by ConnectU and the ConnectU Founders Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narendra filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #637 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/13/2008)
October 13, 2008 Filing 637 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ConnectU LLC and the ConnectU Founders Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narendra. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/13/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER of USCA as to #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 645 Declaration of Randall T. Garteiser (exhibits A through F) in Support of #644 Memorandum in RESPONSE filed byQuinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP. (Related document(s) #644 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 Filing 644 MEMORANDUM in RESPONSE to the Court's re #634 Order to Show Cause filed byQuinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP. (Related document(s) #634 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 Filing 636 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 635 A Petition for writ of mandamus has been received in the Clerk's Office of the USCA for the 9th circuit. Case Number 08-74104 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #1 Exhibit Case Caption) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: set pursuant to #634 Order. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/28/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT NO. 1 re #630 Special Masters Order filed by George C. Fisher. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 19, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 633 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal #611 Notice of Appeal, #582 Notice of Appeal, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS TO REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER #1 #630 Special Masters Order filed by George C. Fisher. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 11, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 632 CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS (UNDER SEAL)pursuant to order #631 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2017: #1 632-2) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 Filing 630 Special Masters Order Special Master Report # 1. (Fisher, George) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER of USCA as to #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER of USCA as to #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Defendants MOTION to consolidate cases is GRANTED. Court records do not currently reflect that the district court has issued the certificates of record for case Nos. 08-16745 and 08-16849. The Parties SHALL MONITOR the issuance of the certificates. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 627 USCA Case Number 08-16873 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #611 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 27, 2008 Filing 626 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Copy 4 of the #625 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Evan A. Parke on behalf of ConnectU LLC (Parke, Evan) (Filed on 8/27/2008) Modified on 8/28/2008,link (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2008 Filing 625 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Order Form, Copy 1, by ConnectU LLC for proceedings held on 6/23/2008, 7/2/2008,C/R Irene Rodriguez; 8/6/2008 C/R Le-Anne Shortridge before Judge James Ware.. (Parke, Evan) (Filed on 8/27/2008) Modified on 8/28/2008,(counsel used incorrect event) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2008 Filing 624 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal #582 Notice of Appeal, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 623 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/06/08, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (las, ) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 622 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #621 Transcript Designation COPY FOUR (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 621 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. for proceedings held on 8/6/08 before Judge Ware.. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 620 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for #603 proceedings held on 8/6/08 before Judge James Ware, Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 20, 2008 Filing 619 USCA Case Number 08-16849 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 USCA time schedule order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 618 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #615 Notice of Cross Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/15/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2008 Filing 617 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #616 Docket Annotation, #615 Notice of Cross Appeal, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2008 Filing 616 Representation Statement re: #615 Notice of Cross-Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2008 Filing 615 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to #476 Judgment enforcing settlement agreement #231 Order on Motion for Sanctions, #232 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 9/12/2008. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2008 Filing 614 AMENDED ORDER of USCA as to #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER of USCA as to #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC. Appellant's emergency stay is DENIED. The briefing schedule established previously SHALL remain in effect. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2008)
August 11, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #611 Notice of Appeal, (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 612 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss re #611 Notice of Appeal. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 611 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #476 Order, #428 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Discovery,, Order on Motion to Seal Document, #461 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Sealed Motion, #610 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Stay by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. Filing fee $ 455 receipt number 54611003706. Appeal Record due by 9/10/2008. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying #574 Motion to Intervene; denying #578 Motion to Stay (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 604 USCA Case Number 08-16745 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 603 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 8/7/2008) re #578 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending #582 Appeal MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending #582 Appeal filed by ConnectU LLC, #574 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further order. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2008)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER Granting #589 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/6/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER Granting #593 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/6/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 5, 2008 Filing 600 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #592 Declaration in Support, Via Hand Delivery and Federal Express (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
August 5, 2008 Filing 599 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #592 Declaration in Support, #595 Memorandum in Opposition, #591 Memorandum in Opposition, #596 Declaration in Support, #597 Proposed Order Via Electronic Mail (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
August 5, 2008 Filing 598 USCA Case Number 08-16745 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Time schedule order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 609 EXHIBITS 4 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Filing 608 EXHIBITS 3 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Filing 607 EXHIBIT 2 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Filing 606 EXHIBITS 1 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Filing 597 Proposed Order denying re #574 MOTION to intervene by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Modified on 8/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Filing 596 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of #595 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Errata H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #595 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 595 Memorandum in Opposition re #574 to Motion to Intervene by C. Winklevoss, T. Winklevoss and D. Narendra filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Modified on 8/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Filing 594 Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper in Support of #593 MOTION to Seal filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #593 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 593 MOTION to Seal Un-Redacted Exhibits 1 and 2, and Confidential exhibits 3 and 4, to the declaration of I.N. Chatterjee filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Modified on 8/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Filing 592 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of #591 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Manual Filing, #3 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Manual Filing, #5 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Manual Filing, #6 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Manual Filing, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #591 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 591 Memorandum in Opposition re #578 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending #582 Appeal MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending #582 Appeal filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Received Exhibit 4 (SUBMITTED) under seal.(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Received Exhibit 3 (SUBMITTED) under seal.(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Received Exhibit 2 (SUBMITTED) under seal.(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Received Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of I. C. Chatterjee (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 605 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2008 Filing 590 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss Re UNREDACTED Third Party Complaint Against the Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg (Byrne, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2008 Filing 589 MOTION to Seal the unredacted version of the 3rd party complaint under seal filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Sean O'Shea in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal)(Byrne, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2008 Received 3rd party complaint (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 588 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal #582 Notice of Appeal, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER Granting #583 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for for Attorney Mark A. Weissman. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/1/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #578 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending #582 Appeal MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending #582 Appeal. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2008 04:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER Granting #580 Motion to Shorten Time; Setting Accelerated Briefing Schedule re #578 Motion to Stay Judgment. Opposition due on for before 8/4/2008. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2008 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 585 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #582 Notice of Appeal, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2008 Filing 584 Proposed Order re #583 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark A. Weissman (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 583 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark A. Weissman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003655.) filed by ConnectU LLC, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 clerk mailed copy of order #433 to Attorney Sean F. O'Shea along with ECF Registration form. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 581 Declaration of Evan A. Parke in Support of #580 MOTION to Shorten Time In Relation To Motion To Stay filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #580 ) (Parke, Evan) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 580 MOTION to Shorten Time In Relation To #578 Motion To Stay execution of judgment pending #582 filed by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parke, Evan) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 579 Declaration of D. Michael Underhill in Support of #578 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending #582 Appeal filed by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #578 ) (Parke, Evan) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 578 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending #582 Appeal filed by ConnectU LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parke, Evan) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 577 Intervenors SUBMIT the attached 3rd party complaint in response to the Court's order #576 dated 7/30/08 and in support of the #574 Motion to Intervene filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Third Party Complaint)(Related document(s) #574 ) (Byrne, Mark) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2008 Filing 582 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #476 Order, #428 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Discovery,, Order on Motion to Seal Document, #461 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Sealed Motion by ConnectU LLC. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 8/29/2008. (Attachments: #1 docketing statement)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2008: #2 Exhibit A thru E) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #574 MOTION to Intervene. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2008 04:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying #573 Motion to Shorten Time (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
July 29, 2008 Filing 575 ERRATA RE #573 APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON #574 MOTION TO INTERVENE by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. (Byrne, Mark) (Filed on 7/29/2008) Modified on 7/30/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2008 Filing 574 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Sean F. O'Shea in Support, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)(Byrne, Mark) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 29, 2008 Filing 573 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. re: #574 MOTION to intervene; Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Order Shortening Time on Motion to Interven)(Byrne, Mark) (Filed on 7/29/2008) Modified on 7/30/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2008 Filing 490 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #489 Response ( Non Motion ) (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 11, 2008 Filing 489 RESPONSE to re #478 Response ( Non Motion ) Facebook Inc and Mark Zuckerberg's Objection to ConnectU Inc's Proposed Form of Release by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 11, 2008 Filing 488 OBJECTIONS to re #479 Response ( Non Motion ) [Proposed] Form of Release of Claims by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER by Judge James Ware finding as moot #380 Motion ; finding as moot #271 Motion to Compel (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER Granting #390 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER Granting #439 Motion to Seal Document Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER Granting #446 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Granting #456 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/10/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 482 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #479 Response ( Non Motion ) (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 481 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/02/08, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2008. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 480 AFFIDAVIT of George C. Fisher pursuant to Rule 53(b)(3) by George C. Fisher. (Fisher, George) (Filed on 7/9/2008) Modified on 7/11/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2008 Filing 479 RESPONSE to re #476 Order [Proposed] Form of Release of Claims by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 478 [Proposed] Form of Release by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2008) Modified on 7/11/2008,(conform with document posted by counsel) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2008 Filing 477 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/23/2008, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene Rodriguez. FILED UNDER SEAL Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing.. Redaction Request due 7/21/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2008. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 2, 2008 Filing 476 JUDGMENT ENFORCING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 2, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
July 2, 2008 Filing 475 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF A MASTER; NOMINATION OF INDIVIDUAL TO SERVE AS MASTER. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 2, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
July 2, 2008 Filing 474 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/23/08, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/21/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2008. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting CNET's #467 Motion to Intervene for the LIMITED purpose of moving to unseal court records.; conditionally granting #467 Motion to Unseal Document. ***The Court REFERS ALL MATTERS pertaining to access to any other documents or pleadings filed under seal, including the CONFIDENTIAL MOTION to enforce Settlement and RESPONSIVE papers, to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Judge James will determine the timing of the hearing of any motion with respect to access to those documents or pleadings.*** (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008) Modified on 7/16/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2008 Filing 472 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 7/2/2008) re #467 MOTION to Intervene and MOTION to Unseal Document and Hearing Transcriptfiled by CNET Networks, Inc., #461 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Enforcement of Settlement as set by the Court. The Court to Issue further order on motions. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/2/2008)
July 1, 2008 Filing 471 Reply to Opposition re #467 MOTION to Intervene and MOTION to Unseal Document and Hearing Transcript filed byCNET Networks, Inc.. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
June 30, 2008 Filing 470 Memorandum in Opposition re #467 MOTION to Intervene and MOTION to Unseal Document and Hearing Transcript filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying in Part and Granting in Part)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
June 30, 2008 Filing 469 RESPONSE to re #461 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Sealed Motion PROPOSED FORMS OF JUDGMENT by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
June 27, 2008 Filing 468 Brief re #467 MOTION to Intervene and MOTION to Unseal Document and Hearing Transcript filed byCNET Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) #467 ) (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 Filing 467 MOTION to Intervene and, MOTION to Unseal Document and Hearing Transcript filed by CNET Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motions for Leave to Intervene and to Unseal Hearing Transcript and Other Documents)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER by Judge James Ware finding as moot #251 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot #259 Motion ; finding as moot #261 Motion for Extension of Time to File; finding as moot #262 Motion for Joinder (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER by Judge James Ware terminating #320 Motion to Withdraw (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER by Judge James Ware terminating #250 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER Referring Case to Chief Magistrate Judge Larson for Reassignment of Discovery Judge. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/26/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER RE: ANTICIPATED MOTION BY CNET NEWS TO UNSEAL FILINGS AND TRANSCRIPTS. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 26, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 25, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: set pursuant to #461 Order. Proposed Form of Judgment due 6/30/2008. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting plaintiff's CONFIDENTIAL MOTION to ENFORCE THE PARTIES SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT.(jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2008) Modified on 7/17/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 459 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC re #454 MOTION for Leave to File CONNECTU, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR LEAVE UNDER CIVIL L.R. 7-11 TO FILE ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY RESPONDING TO THE COURTS QUESTIONS RAISED AT THE JUNE 23, 2008 HEARING (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Filing 458 Proposed Order re #456 MOTION to Seal Document CONNECTU, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Filing 457 Declaration of EVAN A. PARKE in Support of #456 MOTION for leave to file under Seal the ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY filed by ConnectU LLC. (Related document(s) #456 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 456 MOTION for leave to file under Seal Document CONNECTU, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 455 Proposed Order re #454 MOTION for Leave to File ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY RESPONDING TO THE COURTS QUESTIONS RAISED AT THE JUNE 23, 2008 HEARING by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2008 Filing 454 MOTION for leave to file The ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY RESPONDING TO THE COURTS QUESTIONS RAISED AT THE JUNE 23, 2008 HEARING (item under seal)***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING *** filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2008) Modified on 6/25/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2008 Filing 460 Minute Entry: (FILED UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/23/2008) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/23/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 572 Declaration of S. C. Holtzman (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 571 , 529 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 571 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 529 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Received Declaration (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Received Opposition (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting #355 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #357 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #360 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #368 Motion to Seal; granting #371 Motion to Seal; granting #376 Motion to Seal; granting #383 Motion to Seal; granting #401 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #404 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #409 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #425 Motion to Seal; granting #426 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #246 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #255 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #274 Motion to Seal; granting #302 Motion to Seal; granting #313 Motion to Seal; granting #321 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #328 Motion to Seal; granting #333 Motion to Seal (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 451 CLERK'S NOTICE re #376 MOTION for leave to file under seal the Motion to Quash and Protective Order, #378 Sealed Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, #409 MOTION to Seal Opposition to #376 MOTION to quash. The Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order before Judge James Ware previously noticed for June 23, 2008 at 9:00 AM should been re-noticed to be heard before the recently assigned Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 450 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 449 Proposed Order DENYING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN CONNECTUS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS #329 CONFIDENTIAL MOTION by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/20/2008) Modified on 6/23/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2008 Filing 448 Proposed Order re #446 MOTION to Seal opposition and the declaration of S. C. Holtzman by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/20/2008) Modified on 6/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2008 Filing 447 Declaration of EVAN A. PARKE in Support of #446 MOTION to Seal filed by ConnectU LLC. (Related document(s) #446 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/20/2008) Modified on 6/23/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2008 Filing 446 MOTION to file under Seal the OPPOSITION AND (2) DECLARATION OF STEVEN C. HOLTZMAN re: #329 CONFIDENTIAL MOTION filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/20/2008) Modified text on 6/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2008 Filing 445 OPPOSITION to objections to and motion to strike evidence and declaration of S. C. Holtzman by ConnectU LLC NOTIFICATION of Manual Filing (item under seal) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/20/2008) Modified on 6/23/2008 ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2008 Filing 444 OBJECTIONS to re #438 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply, Received Document by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 19, 2008 Filing 570 MOTION for Leave to File SURREPLY (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to #485 order to file under seal is granted. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 Received Surreply in opposition to confidential motion to enforce settlement agreement (SUBMITTED under seal as part of MOTION for leave to). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 Received MOTION for leave to file (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 Filing 443 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC re #442 Proposed Order, #438 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply, #440 Declaration in Support, #441 Proposed Order, #439 MOTION to Seal Document #438 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 Filing 442 Proposed Order re #438 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 Filing 441 Proposed Order re #439 MOTION to file under Seal the Sur-reply by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2008) Modified on 6/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2008 Filing 440 Declaration of EVAN A. PARKE in Support of #439 MOTION to Seal Document #438 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed byConnectU LLC. (Related document(s) #439 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 Filing 439 MOTION to file sur-reply under Seal THE #438 MOTION filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2008) Modified on 6/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2008 Filing 438 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2008) Modified on 6/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2008 Filing 437 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference (Date Filed: 6/18/2008). Motion Hearing re #329 SEALED MOTION set for 6/23/2008 11:00 AM, Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 436 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #421 Declaration in Support, #424 Reply to Opposition, #420 Reply Memorandum, #422 Declaration in Support, #423 Declaration in Support, (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 16, 2008 Filing 435 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Via Hand Delivery Of Confidential Documents (Dkt. Nos. 329 - 332) (submitted under seal) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/16/2008) Modified on 6/17/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2008 Filing 434 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER Granting #430 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean F. O'Shea. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/13/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 11, 2008 Filing 431 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC re #430 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2008 Filing 432 Proposed Order re #430 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean F. O'Shea by ConnectU LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2008 Filing 430 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean F. O'Shea ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003362.) filed by ConnectU LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2008 Filing 429 Proposed Order re #398 Order re Pending Motions to Seal by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER Denying #366 Motion for Leave to File; Denying #374 Motion for Discovery; Granting in part and Denying in part #393 Motion to Seal Document, Granting #414 Stipulation. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/10/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 569 Declaration of K. M. Lui-Kwan (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 568 RESPONSE (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 567 OBJECTIONS (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 566 Declaration of T. Wang (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 563 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 565 Declaration of A. Sarin, PH.D. (UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) 529 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 564 Declaration of I. Neel (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 563 RESPONSE in Support re 529 confidential motion (UNDER SEAL)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received declaration of A. Sarin, PH.D. (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received Declaration of I. N. Chatterjee (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received reply (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received Declaration of T. Wang (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received Objections (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 427 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of #426 MOTION to Seal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #426 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 426 MOTION to Seal Document #421 Declaration of I.N.Chatterjee in Support, #424 Objections to motion to strike evidence re: #333 confidential motion , #420 Reply Memorandum in support of #333 Confidential , #422 Declaration of A. Sarin, PH.D in Support, #423 Declaration of T. Wang in Support filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 425 MOTION to Seal reply and the corrected declaration of K. M. Lui_Kwan CORRECTION OF DOCKET #415 filed by R. Gregory Roussel, Fenwick & West LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 424 OBJECTIONS to and MOTION to strike Evidence Submitted in Connectu's opposition to plaintiff's #333 Confidential Motion (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) Item under seal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 423 Declaration of Ted Wang in Support of #420 Reply Memorandum ISO #333 Confidential Motion (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #420 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 ,(counsel failed to link to motion.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 422 Declaration of Atulya Sarin in Support of #420 Reply Memorandum ISO #333 Confidential Motion (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING)filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #420 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 421 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of #420 Reply Memorandum ISO #333 Confidential Motion (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #420 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 420 Reply Memorandum ISO #333 Confidential Motion (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 419 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R. Gregory Roussel, Fenwick & West LLP re #417 Notice (Other), #416 Notice (Other) (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Filing 418 Declaration of K. M. Lui-Kwan in Support of #415 MOTION to Seal Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, and Corrected Declaration filed by R. Gregory Roussel, Fenwick & West LLP. (Related document(s) #415 ) (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 417 AMENDED Declaration of Kalama M. Lui-Kwan in Support of Motion to Quash and for Protective Order *** NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING *** (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 416 Reply in Support of Motion to Quash and for Protective Order ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING *** (Item under seal) (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 415 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #425 . *** MOTION to Seal Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, and Corrected Declaration filed by R. Gregory Roussel, Fenwick & West LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified on 6/10/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Filing 414 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order extending time to file Joint [Proposed] Order re #398 Order by ConnectU LLC, Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/9/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2008 Received Amended Declaration of K. M. Lui-Kwan (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Received reply (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 562 SECOND Declaration of E. A. Parke (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 561 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of R. T. Clarkson (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 560 Declaration of R. T. Clarkson (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 559 Declaration of C. Winklevoss (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 558 CORRECTED Declaration of D. M. Hitscherich (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 557 Declaration of R. T. Clarkson (UNDER SEAL)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 556 Declaration of R. T. Clarkson (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Proposed Order Denying re #376 MOTION (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 555 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #376 MOTION to quash (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) #378 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Proposed Order (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 554 Memorandum in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 413 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 412 OPPOSITION to motion to quash and the declarations in support thereof. NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING Item under seal(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/3/2008, (Counsel efiled the MFN as a "Notice" this is incorrect, Pursuant to General Order 45, section VII the MFN is NOT to be efiled as a Notice) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2008 Filing 411 Proposed Order Granting ConnectU's #409 Administrative Motion to Seal Opposition to #376 MOTION to quash; 2nd declaration of E. A. Parke, Supplemental Declaration of R. T. Clarkson, Declaration of R.T. Clarkson, Declaration of C. Winklevoss, Corrected Declaration of D. Hitscherich and [Proposed] Order denying the #376 motion to quash and for a protective order by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2008 Filing 410 Declaration of Steven C. Holtzman In Support of ConnectU's #409 Administrative Motion to Seal Opposition to #376 MOTION to quash; 2nd declaration of E. A. Parke, Supplemental Declaration of R. T. Clarkson, Declaration of R.T. Clarkson, Declaration of C. Winklevoss, Corrected Declaration of D. Hitscherich and [Proposed] Order denying the #376 motion to quash and for a protective order filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2008 Filing 409 MOTION to Seal Opposition to #376 MOTION to quash; 2nd declaration of E. A. Parke, Supplemental Declaration of R. T. Clarkson, Declaration of R.T. Clarkson, Declaration of C. Winklevoss, Corrected Declaration of D. Hitscherich and [Proposed] Order denying the #376 motion to quash and for a protective order filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2008 Filing 408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 407 OPPOSITION to confidential motion to enforce settlement, documents in support thereof NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/3/2008, (Counsel efiled the MFN as a "Notice" this is incorrect, Pursuant to General Order 45, section VII the MFN is NOT to be efiled as a Notice) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2008 Filing 406 Proposed Order Granting ConnectU's Administrative #404 Motion to Seal by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2008 Filing 405 Declaration of Steven C. Holtzman In Support of ConnectU's #404 Administrative Motion to Seal filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2008 Filing 404 MOTION to Seal Opposition to #333 Confidential Motion , 2nd declaration of E. A. Parke, Supplemental Declaration of R. T. Clarkson, Declaration of C. Winklevoss, Corrected declaration of D. Hitscherich and the [Proposed} order denying #333 Confidential motion Document filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2008 Received SECOND declaration of E. A. Parke (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Received SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of R. T. Clarkson (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Received AMENDED Declaration of D. M. Hitscherich (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Received declaration of R. T. Clarkson (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Received Declaration of C. Winklevoss (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Proposed Order Denying motion filed by M. Zuckerberg's and Facebook to enforce a purported settlement agreement (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Received Opposition to M. Zuckerberg's and Facebook motion to enforce settlement agreement (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Proposed Order Denying the Motion to quash filed by Fenwick and West LLP and G. Roussel(SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Received Opposition (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 403 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #399 Memorandum in Opposition, and Sutton Declaration in Support Thereof (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
May 29, 2008 Filing 552 Declaration of T. Sutton (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 551 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 29, 2008 Filing 551 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 548 motion (UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) 548 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 29, 2008 Proposed Order denying re #396 request to reschedule (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 29, 2008 Received declaration of T. Sutton (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 29, 2008 Received Opposition (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 29, 2008 Filing 402 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of #401 MOTION to Seal Document #400 Declaration in Opposition, #399 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #401 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 29, 2008 Filing 401 MOTION to Seal Opposition TO #393 MOTION and the declaration of T. Sutton in support thereof filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/29/2008) Modified on 5/29/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2008 Filing 400 *** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY *** please see #399 Memorandum in Opposition NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Item under seal) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #399 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/29/2008) Modified on 5/29/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2008 Filing 399 Memorandum in Opposition re #393 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Item under seal)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/29/2008) Modified on 5/29/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2008 Proposed Order re 548 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Filing 550 Declaration of S. C. Holtzman (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 548 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Filing 549 Declaration of S. C. Holtzman (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 548 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Filing 548 Renotice motion to enforce settlement agreement (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to #452 Order granting leave to file under seal.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Filing 547 RESPONSE in Support (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Proposed Order re: to reschedule hearing (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Received Document Declaration of S. C. Holtzman (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Received Document REQUEST to reschedule hearing (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Received Document Reply in support (SUBMITTED) under seal(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER re Pending Motions to Seal. Deadline to File Joint Proposed Order re Motions to Seal on or before 6/9/2008. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/27/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 23, 2008 Filing 397 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 Filing 396 REQUEST to reschedule hearing on plaintiff's motion to enforce Alleged settlement agreement; declaration of S. C. Holtzman; [Proposed] Order granting in support thereof; and Connectu, Inc's reply in support of motion to shorten time for motion for expedited discovery and evidentiary hearing NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/23/2008) Modified on 5/29/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF). (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/23/2008)
May 23, 2008 Filing 395 Proposed Order Granting ConnectU's Administrative #393 Motion to Seal by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/23/2008) Modified on 5/29/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2008 Filing 394 Declaration of Steven C. Holtzman In Support of ConnectU's Administrative #393 Motion to Seal REQUEST to reschedule hearing on plaintiff's motion to enforce Alleged settlement agreement; declaration of S. C. Holtzman; [Proposed] Order granting in support thereof; and Connectu, Inc reply filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/23/2008) Modified on 5/29/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2008 Filing 393 MOTION to Seal the REQUEST to reschedule hearing on plaintiff's motion to enforce Alleged settlement agreement; declaration of S. C. Holtzman; [Proposed] Order granting in support thereof; and Connectu, Inc's reply in support of motion to shorten time for motion for expedited discovery and evidentiary hearing filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/23/2008) Modified on 5/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/29/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2008 Filing 553 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) 539 , 544 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 22, 2008 Received opposition (SUBMITTED under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 22, 2008 Filing 392 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #389 Memorandum in Opposition (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 22, 2008 Filing 391 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of #390 MOTION to Seal Document [(Related document(s) #390 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/22/2008) Modified on 5/23/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2008 Filing 390 MOTION to Seal opposition to motion to shorten time for motion for expedited discovery for evidentiary hearing. filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/22/2008) Modified on 5/22/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2008 Filing 389 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #374 MOTION for Discovery filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #374 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 546 Declaration (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 21, 2008 Received AMENDED Declaration of D. M. Hitscherich (SUBMITTED under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 388 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 20, 2008 Proposed Order Denying re 537 MOTION (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 20, 2008 Filing 545 Memorandum in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 20, 2008 Received Order denying MOTION for leave to file reply (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 20, 2008 Received Opposition to motion for leave to file reply (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 20, 2008 Filing 387 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 20, 2008 Filing 386 Opposition to motion for leave to file reply and motion to strike (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/20/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2008 Filing 385 Proposed Order Granting ConnectU's #383 Administrative Motion to Seal by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/20/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 ,***(counsel failed to properly link to motion.)*** (cv, COURT STAFF).(cv, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2008 Filing 384 Declaration of Steven C. Holtzman In Support of ConnectU's Administrative #383 Motion to Seal filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/20/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008,***(counsel failed to properly link to motion.)*** (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2008 Filing 383 MOTION for leave to file under Seal Opposition to request for leave to file reply to and motion to strike portions of opposition filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/20/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Proposed Order (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 544 MOTION to Shorten Time (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to #452 order granting leave to file under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 544 MOTION to Shorten Time (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to 452 order granting leave to file under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 543 Declaration of E. A. Parke (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 539 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 542 Declaration of D. M. Hitscherich (UNDER SEAL). (Related document(s) 539 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 541 Declaration of C. Winklevoss (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 539 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 540 Declaration of R. T. Clarkson (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 539 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 539 MOTION for Expedited Discovery, MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing pursuant to #452 order granting to file under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received Order (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received Declaration of K. M. Lui-Kwan (SUBMITTED) under seal(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received MOTION to quash (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received MOTION to quash (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received Declaration of K. M. Lui-Kwan (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received MOTION to change time of deposition (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received MOTION to change time of deposition (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received Declaration of E. A. Parke (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received Declaration of R. T. Clarkson (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received Declaration of C. Winklevoss (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 *** FILED IN ERROR *** please see amended Declaration of D. M. Hitscherich (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/22/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Received MOTION for discovery (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received MOTION for discovery (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Received MOTION to shorten time for MOTION for expedited discovery (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 382 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R. Gregory Roussel, Fenwick & West LLP re #379 Notice (Other), #378 Notice (Other), #381 Notice (Other), #380 Notice (Other), #376 MOTION to Seal Document (Administrative) By Non-Parties MOTION to Seal Document (Administrative) By Non-Parties, #377 Declaration in Support (Baker, Tyler) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 381 Declaration of Kalama M. Lui-Kwan (Baker, Tyler) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 380 MOTION to Change Time of Deposition Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11; [Proposed] Order (Baker, Tyler) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 379 Declaration of Kalama M. Lui-Kwan In Support of Motion to Quash and for Protective Order***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(Baker, Tyler) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 378 Sealed Motion to Quash and for Protective Order; [Proposed] Order ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Baker, Tyler) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)***(cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/21/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 377 Declaration of Kalama M. Lui-Kwan In Support of #376 Administrative Motion By Non-Parties R. Gregory Roussel and Fenwick & West LLP to Seal Documents filed by R. Gregory Roussel, Fenwick & West LLP. (Baker, Tyler) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008,***(counsel failed to properly link to motion.)*** (cv, COURT STAFF). (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 376 MOTION for leave to file under seal the Motion to Quash and Protective Order, Declaration of K. M. Lui-Kwan, and the Motion to change time of Deposition, and the Declaration of K. M. Lui-Kwan in support thereof. By Non-Parties filed by R. Gregory Roussel, Fenwick & West LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion By Non-Parties R. Gregory Roussel and Fenwick & West LLP to Seal Documents)(Baker, Tyler) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 375 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 374 MOTION for expedited discovery and supporting documents (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 373 Proposed Order Granting ConnectU's Administrative #371 Motion to Seal by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008,***(counsel failed to properly link to motion.)*** (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 372 Declaration of Evan A. Parke In Support of ConnectU's Administrative #371 Motion to Seal filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008,(*** counsel failed to properly link to motion.)*** (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 371 MOTION for leave to file under Seal the Motion for discovery and supporting documents and exhibits in support thereof, [Proposed] Order, the MOTION to shorten time, and the [proposed] order filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/21/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2008 Filing 538 Declaration of Y. P. Greer (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 537 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 537 MOTION for Leave to File (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to #452 order to seal granted. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Received Declaration of Y.P. Greer (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Received Document MOTION and [Proposed] order for leave to file a reply and motion to strike portions of opposition to Facebook's request #363 (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 370 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #366 MOTION Admin Req for Leave to File Reply and Mtn to Strike, #367 Declaration in Support (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 369 Declaration in Support of #368 MOTION to Seal Document #366 MOTION Admin Req for Leave to File Reply and Mtn to Strike, #367 Declaration in Support filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #368 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 368 MOTION for leave to file under Seal The Request for leave to file reply to and motion to strike portions of opposition and the proposed order and the declaration of Y. P. Greer in support and the exhibits filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/16/2008) Modified text on 5/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2008 Filing 367 ***DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY *** please see #366 MOTION Admin Req for Leave to File Reply and Mtn to Strike filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/16/2008) Modified text on 5/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2008 Filing 366 MOTION for Leave to File Reply and Motion to Strike filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, and the Declaration of Y.P. Greer, and the Exhibits in support thereof.***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event,(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/16/2008) Modified text on 5/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2008 Filing 365 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File the proof of service docket no. 364 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2008)
May 14, 2008 Filing 536 Declaration of E. A. Parke (UNDER SEAL) (Related document(s) 535 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 14, 2008 Proposed Order re 533 Renotice motion hearing (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 14, 2008 Filing 535 Memorandum in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 14, 2008 Filing 364 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of opposition and declaration and proposed order concerning plaintiff's request pursuant to civil L.R. 7-11 (documents submitted under seal) by ConnectU LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2008 Received [Proposed] Order concerning plaintiff's #355 motion and Defendant's opposition (SUBMITTED under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 14, 2008 Received Document Declaration (SUBMITTED under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 14, 2008 Received Document Opposition (SUBMITTED under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 14, 2008 Filing 363 Opposition to #355 motion to file under by ConnectU LLC ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2008) Modified on 5/15/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2008 Filing 362 Proposed Order #360 Motion to Seal. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2008) Modified on 5/15/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2008 Filing 361 Declaration of Evan A. Parke In Support of #360 CONNECTU's Administrative Motion to Seal filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2008) Modified on 5/15/2008
May 14, 2008 Filing 360 MOTION to Seal opposition and supporting Documents filed by ConnectU LLC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2008) Modified text on 5/15/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 534 Declaration of I. Neel (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 533 Renotice of CONFIDENTIAL motion (UNDER SEAL)Pursuant to #452 order granting leave to file under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Received Declaration of I.N. Chatterjee (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 Received Administrative request re: CONFIDENTIAL motion (SUBMITTED under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 359 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #357 MOTION Administrative Request, #358 Declaration in Support (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 358 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of #357 MOTION Administrative Request filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #357 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 357 MOTION to file under seal pursuant to LR 7-11; Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in support thereof, exhibits and the proposed order *** ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc..(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/15/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 356 Declaration in Support of #355 MOTION to Seal Document filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #355 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 355 MOTION to file under Seal Plaintiff administrative request to Civil L.R. 7-11; Declaration of I. N. Chatterjee and exhibits in support there of Document filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER Granting 350 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER Granting 349 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER Granting 348 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER Granting 347 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 5, 2008 Proposed Order re 350 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A. Barrett by ConnectU, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 350 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A. Barrett ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003104.) filed by ConnectU, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Proposed Order re 349 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney D. Michael Underhill by ConnectU, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 349 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney D. Michael Underhill ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003103.) filed by ConnectU, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Proposed Order re 348 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan M. Shaw by ConnectU, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 348 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan M. Shaw ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003102.) filed by ConnectU, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Proposed Order re 347 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Evan Andrew Parke by ConnectU, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 347 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Evan Andrew Parke ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003101.) filed by ConnectU, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
April 30, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #345 RENOTICE of MOTION. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 346 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing from 6/2/2008 to 6/23/2008 re #345 RE-NOTICE OF motion hearing re: #333 MOTION (pursuant to LR 79-5(b)to file confidential motion and supporting documents under seal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Plaintiffs' "Confidential Motion" Hearing set for 6/23/2008 09:00 AM, Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties are reminded that future filings regarding leave to file documents under seal are to follow the Civil Local Rules. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 29, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
April 29, 2008 Filing 345 RE-NOTICE OF motion hearing re: #333 MOTION (pursuant to LR 79-5(b)to file confidential motion and supporting documents under seal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 4/29/2008) Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER VACATING REASSIGNMENT ORDER TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #343 Order. The Court sets a Case Management Conference for June 23, 2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. The parties are to file a joint case management statement by June 13, 2008. Any other previously set deadlines and hearings before Judge Ware remain as scheduled. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/29/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to the next available United States Magistrate Judge because both parties have CONSENTED to jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. That any deadlines and hearings previously set before Judge James Ware have been VACATED and should be RE-NOTICED before the assigned Magistrate Judge. see related documents #28 #29 . Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2008) Modified text on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to this case.***All scheduled hearing are vacated and should be RE-NOTICE for hearing before the Judge to whom the case has been reassigned.*** Signed by The Executive Committee on 04/25/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 5/7/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 04/25/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER OF RECUSAL from hearing or determining any matters in this action. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on April 25, 2008. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2008 Filing 339 PROOF of service re #337 (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/29/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER OF RECUSAL from hearing or determining any matters as PRESIDING JUDGE in this action. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2008 Filing 337 NOTICE of ATTORNEY'S LIEN, Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP has and claims a lien over the claims and causes of action of, and any JUDGMENT, SETTLEMENT or other RECOVERY PAID TO, the ConnectU Parties. filed by Bruce E. Van Dalsem, Randall T. Garteiser, David E. Azar, Peter Calamari, and Richard I. Werder, Jr. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2008) Modified on 10/17/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 532 Declaration of G. Roussel (UNDER SEAL)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 531 Declaration of T. A. Sutton (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 530 Declaration of M. Howitson (UNDER SEAL)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 529 CONFIDENTIAL MOTION (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to #452 order to file under seal granted. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Christopher Holtzman (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 335 PROOF OF SERVICE via Federal Express and/or Hand Delivery by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #332 , #329 #331 , #330 (Filed on 4/23/2008) Text modified on 4/24/2008 conforming to posted document caption, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 334 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 In Support of Sealing (I) Plaintiffs' Confidential Motion; (II) Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton and Exhibits in Support Thereof; (III) Declaration of Greg Roussel and Exhibits in Support Thereof; (IV) Declaration of Mark Howitson #333 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #333 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Text modified on 4/24/2008 conforming to posted dcoument caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 333 MOTION for leave to file under Seal (pursuant to LR 79-5(b) #329 "Confidential Motion" ; Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton and Exhibits; Declaration of Greg Roussel and Exhibit; Declaration of Mark Howitson filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Text modified on 4/24/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/28/2008. Modified on 5/2/2008,(link to motion to which document relates to.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 332 Declaration of Mark Howitson in Support of Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerbreg's Confidential Motion re #329 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** filed by Mark Zuckerberg, (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Text modified on 4/24/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 331 DECLARATION of Greg Roussel in Support of Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerbreg's Confidential Motion with Exhibits A,B,and C re [329 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #329 ) (Sutton, Theresa) ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Filed on 4/23/2008) Text modified on 4/24/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 330 DECLARATION of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerbreg's Confidential Motion with Exhibits A and B re #329 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #329 ) ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Text modified on 4/24/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 329 CONFIDENTIAL MOTION and [Proposed] Order filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Text modified on 4/24/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** Motion submitted under seal (pursuant to LR 79-5(b)to file confidential motion)(counsel used incorrect event,correct event is motion.) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2008 Filing 528 EXHIBIT D (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 Filing 527 EXHIBIT C (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 Filing 526 EXHIBIT B (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 328 MOTION to Seal Exhibits B-D to the Declaration of Yvonne Greer Submitting Supplemental Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial summary Judgment re #251 ; and Motion to Compel Compliance by Defendants pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams #271 (Greer Declaration) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2008 09:30 AM. (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Text modified on 2/25/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2008 Filing 327 Declaration of Yvonne Greer Submitting Supplemental Evidence In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( #251 ); and Motion to Compel Compliance by Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams ( #271 ) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B [Under Seal], #3 Exhibit C [Under Seal], #4 Exhibit D [Under Seal])(Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER re #325 Stipulation. The action is DISMISSED without prejudice against defendant Gucwa pursuant to FRCP 41(a)91)(A). filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/19/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2008) Modified on 4/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2008 Filing 325 STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order re Gucwa by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 2/15/2008) Modified on 2/19/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Filing 525 (REVISED) Declaration of W. Williams (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 524 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Modified on 2/15/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Filing 323 Declaration of Winston Williams (Revised) in Support of Defendants Connectu LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Text modified on 2/15/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 5/2/2008,(Counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)
February 14, 2008 Filing 322 (Revised) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Filing 321 Motion to File Under Seal the Highlighted and Unredacted Version of (Revised) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Declaration Of Winston Williams (Revised) In Support Thereof; Declaration of Scott R. Mosko; [Proposed] Order filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Modified on 2/15/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Filing 320 MOTION to Withdrawal of Pleadings at Docket Nos. #300 and #301 and MOTION for leave of Substitution of Pleadings by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Text modified on 2/15/2008 conforming to posted dcoument caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008,(counsel used incorrect event, correct event is motion, not a Notice, and failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Filing 319 ERRATA re Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502((C) and 15 USC 7704(A)(1) and 15 USC 7704(B)(1) and the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton filed in Support Thereof #311 , #310 by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Text modified on 2/15/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Filing 318 PROOF OF SERVICE re 311 via personal delivery by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #311 (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Text modified on 2/15/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 523 EXHIBIT 7 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 522 EXHIBIT 5 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 521 EXHIBIT 3 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 520 EXHIBIT 2 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 519 EXHIBIT 1 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 518 EXHIBIT H (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 517 EXHIBIT G (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 516 EXHIBIT F (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 515 EXHIBIT E (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 514 EXHIBIT A (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 317 EXHIBITS 1-3,5,7 to declaration by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Modified text on 5/2/2008***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 317 EXHIBITS 1-3,5,7 to declaration by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Modified text on 5/2/2008***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 316 EXHIBITS A,E-H to declaration of T. Sutton by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Modified on 5/2/2008***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 316 EXHIBITS A,E-H to declaration of T. Sutton by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Modified on 5/2/2008***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 315 Declaration of Yvonne P Greer Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(B) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Exhibits A, E-H to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 USC 7704(A)(1) and 15 USC 7704(B)1) #313 313]) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 314 PROOF OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #309 (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 313 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and E-H to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of its Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(A)(1) and 15 USC 7704(B)(1) and Exhibits 1-3, 5 and 7 to the Declaration of I Neel Chatterjee in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Compliance by Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams with filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 312 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of Motion to Compel Compliance by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software and W. Williams with Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #309 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 311 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(A)(1) and 15 USC 7704(B)(1) #251 #310 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice of Manual Filing), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (Notice of Manual Filing), #6 Exhibit F (Notice of Manual Filing), #7 Exhibit G (Notice of Manual Filing), #8 Exhibit H (Notice of Manual Filing), #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #310 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on Modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 310 *** FILED IN ERROR *** please see #319 amended Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #251 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption by (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 5/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 309 Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Compliance by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software and W Williams with Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 308 Declaration of Tina Naicker in Support of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Objections to Exhibits Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #307 filed byM ark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #307 ) (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 307 Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Objections to Exhibits Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #304 Objection, by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 306 Declaration of Yvonne Greer Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(B) in Support of Sealing Exhibit B to the Declaration of G. Hunter Jones in Support of Defendants' ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Judgment re #302 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Related document(s) #302 ) (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 305 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(D) in Support of Sealing Exhibit A to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants' ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Judgment re #302 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Related document(s) #302 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Text modified on 2/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2008 Filing 304 Defendants' Objections to the Exhibits to the Declaration of Monte Cooper in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 513 Declaration of W. Williams (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 512 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 511 EXHIBIT C (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 510 EXHIBIT B (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 509 Declaration of G. Hunter (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 508 EXHIBIT A (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Modified on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 302 MOTION for leave to file under seal to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Declaration of Winston Williams Including Exhibit B; and Exhibits A and C to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support Thereof; (Proposed) Order filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Text modified on 2/7/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel selected multiple motions, this is incorrect.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 301 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Text modified conforming to posted document caption on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 300 Declaration of Winston Williams in Support of Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Text modified conforming to posted document caption on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 299 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( #292 ) by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Text modified conforming to posted document caption on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 298 Exhibit A to Declation of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Text modified conforming to posted document caption, on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/12/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 297 Exhibit B to the Declaration of G. Hunter Jones in Support of Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Text modified conforming to posted document caption, on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 296 Declaration of G. Hunter Jones in Support of Defendants Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Text modified conforming to posted document caption on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 295 Exhibit A to the Declaration of G. Hunter Jones in Support of Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( #292 ) filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Linkage added Modified on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 294 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( #292 ) filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Linkage added on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 293 Declaration of Cameron Winklevoss In Support of Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( #292 ) filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Linkage added on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 292 REDACTED DOCUMENT of the OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( #251 ) filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Linkage added on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 291 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams with Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses ( #289 ) filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Linkage added on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 290 Declaration of Winston Williams in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance ( #289 ) by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams with Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Linkage added on 2/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 289 Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams' Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance ( #271 ) by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams with Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Text modified on 2/7/2008, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg re #285 Administrative Motion (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
February 4, 2008 Filing 287 Defendants ConnectU LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winson Williams and Wayne Chang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 for Order Requiring Defendants to Provide Dates for Deposition filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 2/4/2008) Text modified on 2/5/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2008 Filing 286 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Administrative Request for Order Requiring Defendants to Provide Deposition Dates #285 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #285 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/30/2008) Text modified on 1/31/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2008 Filing 285 Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 for Order Requiring Defendants to Provide Dates for Deposition filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/30/2008) Text modified on 1/31/2008 conforming to posted document caption. Incorrect event type used by filer (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2008 Filing 507 EXHIBIT A (UNDER SEAL)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2008)
January 24, 2008 Filing 506 Declaration of C. Shiflett and EXHIBITS (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2008)
January 24, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2008)
January 24, 2008 Filing 284 PROOF OF SERVICE re #274 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Portions of Their Motion to Compel Compliance By Defendants Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams With Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses re #271 MOTION to Compel MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Portions of Their Motion to Compel Compliance By Defendants Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams With Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/24/2008) Text modified on 1/25/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 Filing 505 EXHIBIT 13 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 504 EXHIBIT 12 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 503 EXHIBIT 11 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 502 EXHIBIT 9 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 501 EXHIBIT 6 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 500 EXHIBIT 5 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 499 EXHIBIT 4 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 498 EXHIBIT 3 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 497 SEALED MOTION (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to #452 order granting to file under seal.(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 283 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 282 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 Filing 281 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 280 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 279 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 278 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 277 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 276 DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 23, 2008 Filing 275 EXHIBITS to Plaintiffs #271 PORTIONS OF THE Motion to Compel "Compliance" by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to comply with #234 Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses. ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING *** Item under seal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2008 09:30 AM. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Text modified on 1/24/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel used incorrect event, correct event is exhibits, not a motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 Filing 274 MOTION to Seal PORTIONS of Their #271 Motion to Compel"Compliance by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to COMPLY with the #234 Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses re #271 ; and Exhibits 3-6, 9 and 11-13 to the Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper in thereof; and the Declaration of Chris Shiflett in Support thereof including Exhibits 1, 1A, 2-3 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2008 09:30 AM. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Text modified on 1/24/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 Filing 273 Declaration of Chris Shiflett in Support of re #271 *** NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING ***, Item under seal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) #271 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Text modified on 1/24/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). ). Modified text on 4/30/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 Filing 272 Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper in Support of #271 MOTION to Compel Defendants Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to COMPLY with #234 Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses; filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Part 1], #2 Exhibit 1[Part 2], #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) #271 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Text Modified on 1/24/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2008 Filing 271 ***REDACTED/PUBLIC VERSION***: MOTION to Compel "Compliance" by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to COMPLY with #234 Order Granting Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses; MOTION for an order to PRODUCE ALL computer web servers, and the Alternatively MOTION for an order ENTERING evidentiary finding that PNS adn Williams set three ConnectU invitation e-mails to each of the at least three million registered Facebook users as of 7/1/05; memorandum in support thereof. filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2008 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 11/17/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Discovery due by 9/30/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2008 02:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2008. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
January 22, 2008 Filing 269 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (corrected) of #76 against all defendants. Filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/22/2008) Text modified on 1/23/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified TEXT on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2008 Filing 268 Notice of Filing of Corrected Second Amended Complaint During the CM Conference held on 1/16/08 #267 minutes Court GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (corrected) described in the #263 CM Statement by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/22/2008) Text modified on 1/23/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2008 Filing 267 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/16/2008 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/16/2008). (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2008)
January 14, 2008 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Alan Lincoln, Esq (Lincoln, Sean) (Filed on 1/14/2008)
January 14, 2008 Filing 265 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Civil L.R. 6-3 Motion for Order Enlarging Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment[ 264] filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #264 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/14/2008) Text modified on 1/15/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2008 Filing 264 Opposition to Defendants' Civil L.R. 6-3 Motion for Order Enlarging Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #261 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/14/2008) Text modified on 1/15/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2008 Filing 263 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/11/2008) Modified on 1/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2008 Filing 262 MOTION for joinder of Defendant David Gucwa in #251 MOTION for summary judgment and MOTION for plaintiffs motion for summary judgment be TAKEN OFF calendar to allow him time to evaluate case and prepare defense Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f); Declaration of Valerie M. Wagner in Support Thereof by David Gucwa re #260 Declaration in Support, #259 Defendants' Motion for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) (Wagner, Valerie) (Filed on 1/11/2008) Text modified on 1/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel used incorrect event and failed to select multiple motions. (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 Filing 261 Defendants' Civil L.R. 6-3 Motion for Order Enlarging Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Declaration of Scott R. Mosko; [Proposed] Order filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 1/10/2008) Text modified on 1/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 Filing 260 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants' Motion for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) #259 filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #259 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 1/10/2008) Text modified on 1/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 Filing 259 Motion for an order POSTPONING the due date for defendants opposition to plaintiff's #251 motion for partial summary judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) filed by Wayne Chang, ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 1/10/2008) Text modified on 1/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 493 EXHIBITS (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
January 7, 2008 Filing 492 Declaration of C. Shiflett (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
January 7, 2008 Filing 491 SEALED MOTION (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to #452 order granting to file under seal the motion. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Received UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
January 7, 2008 Received UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
January 7, 2008 Received UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
January 7, 2008 Filing 258 EXHIBITS 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 to the Declaration of Chris Shiflett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(A)(1) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(B)(1) ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #253 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 257 PROOF OF SERVICE via Hand Delivery by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment #252 Declaration in Support, #253 Declaration in Support (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 256 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Portions of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(A)(1) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(B)(1) Declaration of Chris Shiflett in Support Thereof Including Exhibits 1-3, and Exhibits 1, 2, and 4 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support Thereof re #255 MOTION to Seal Document #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #252 Declaration in Support, #253 Declaration in Support MOTION to Seal Document #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #252 Declaration in Support, #253 Declaration in Support filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #255 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 255 MOTION for leave to file under Seal PORTIONS of Their #251 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability and the Declaration of Chris Shiflett in Support Thereof Including Exhibits 1-3, and Exhibits 1, 2, and 4 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support Thereof #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment #252 Declaration in Support, #253 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Seal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2008 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel selected multiple motions this is incorrect. (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 254 Declaration of Mark E. Zuckerberg in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(A)(1) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(B)(1) re #251 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #251 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 253 Declaration of Chris Shiflett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(A)(1) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(B)(1) re #251 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) )filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #251 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 252 Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(A)(1) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(B)(1) #251 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 and 7 - Notice, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9.1, #10 Exhibit 9.2, #11 Exhibit 9.3, #12 Exhibit 9.4, #13 Exhibit 9.5, #14 Exhibit 9.6, #15 Exhibit 9.7, #16 Exhibit 10, 11, and 12 - Notice, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28-31 - Notice, #33 Exhibit 31A, #34 Exhibit 32-34 Notice, #35 Exhibit 35.1, #36 Exhibit 35.2, #37 Exhibit 35.3, #38 Exhibit 36-38 Notice, #39 Exhibit 40-43 Notice, #40 Exhibit 44, #41 Exhibit 45-48 Notice, #42 Exhibit 49, #43 Exhibit 50-55 Notice, #44 Exhibit 56, #45 Exhibit 57-59 Notice, #46 Exhibit 60, #47 Exhibit 61 Notice, #48 Exhibit 62, #49 Exhibit 63-64 Notice, #50 Exhibit 65, #51 Exhibit 66)(Related document(s) #251 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 251 REDACTED DOCUMENT of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Liability Pursuant to California Penal Code Section 502(C) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(A)(1) and 15 U.S.C. 7704(B)(1) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2008 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1exhibits *** NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING *** )(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2008,(counsel used incorrect event> (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 250 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Winston Williams filed by Winston Williams; hearing set for 1/23/08 at 9:30am (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008,(counsel used incorrect event) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 249 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Supplemental Response to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to Winston Williams #248 by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Related document(s) #248 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 248 Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Finnegan's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Winston Williams re #239 by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2008 Filing 496 EXHIBIT M1 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 2, 2008 Filing 495 EXHIBIT L1 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 2, 2008 Filing 494 EXHIBIT K (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 2, 2008 Received EXHIBIT (SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 2, 2008 Received EXHIBIT (SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 2, 2008 Received EXHIBIT (SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL) filed by (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 2, 2008 Filing 247 Proof of Service via Federal Express re re #245 filed by by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/2/2008) Text modified on 1/3/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2008 Filing 246 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits K, L-1 AND M-1 to the Declaration of Theresa Sutton in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Finnegan's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Winston Williams #245 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/2/2008) Text modified on 1/3/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2008 Filing 245 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Finnegan's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Winston Williams #244 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, L-1 and M-1 Notice of Manual Filing, #12 Exhibit L-2, #13 Exhibit M-2, #14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #244 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/2/2008) Text modified on 1/3/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2008 Filing 244 Plaintiff's Response to Finnegan's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Winston Williams re #239 by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 1/2/2008) Text modified on 1/3/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #242 Motion to Shorten Time. Pending a ruling on the MOTION to withdraw, counsel shall CONTINUE to make reasonable periodic efforts to contact Williams and to procure his cooperation in fulfilling his obligations in this litigation. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007) Modified on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2007 Filing 242 Motion for Order Shortening Time AND MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Winston Williams; Declaration of Scott R. Mosko; and [Proposed] Order filed by Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 12/18/2007) Text modified on 12/19/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2007 Filing 241 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Winston Williams #239 filed by Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #239 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 12/18/2007) Text modified on 12/19/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2007 Filing 240 Declaration of Jason M. Webster in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Winston Williams #239 filed by Winston Williams. (Related document(s) #239 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 12/18/2007) Text modified on 12/19/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2007 Filing 239 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Winston Williams filed by Winston Williams. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 12/18/2007) Text modified on 12/19/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #224 Motion to Seal Document (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 12, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2008 02:30 PM. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #212 Motion to Compel; Setting Case Management Conference re #233 . (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 11, 2007 Filing 233 Plaintiffs' Civil Local Rule 7-11 Miscellaneous Administrative Request for Order Setting Case Management Conference or Issuing Case Management order file d by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theresa Sutton, #2 (Proposed) Order Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 12/11/2007) Text modified, incorrect event type used on 12/12/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #136 Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narendra (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2007)
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #126 Motion for Sanctions (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2007)
November 19, 2007 Filing 230 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Facebook's Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5(d) to File Under Seal the Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 3 and 4; Proposed Order filed byPacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Text modified on 11/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2007 Filing 229 Declaration of Yvonne Greer in Support of Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 3 and 4; #222 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M) (Related document(s) #222 ) (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Text modified on 11/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2007 Filing 228 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing re #212 continued to 12/14/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 14, 2007 Filing 238 Document Filed UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
November 14, 2007 Filing 237 Document Filed UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
November 14, 2007 Filing 236 Document Filed UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
November 14, 2007 Document Received Under Seal (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
November 14, 2007 Filing 227 Portions of Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 3 and 4 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2007 Filing 226 Exhibit I to Declarationof Monte M. F. Cooper by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2007 Filing 225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #222 Reply Memorandum, #223 Declaration in Support, [Documents Filed Under Seal] (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
November 14, 2007 Filing 224 Facebook's Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5 (d) to File Under Seal the Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of Interrogatories 3 and 4 and Exhibits I and K to the Declaration of Monte Cooper in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel #222 , #223 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Text modified on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2007 Filing 223 Declaration of Monte Cooper in Support of Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of Interrogatories 3 and 4 #222 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I#2 Exhibit J#3 Exhibit K#4 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #222 ) (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Text modified on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2007 Filing 222 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of Interrogatories 3 and 4 re #212 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Manual Filing Notification of Portions of Reply P&As)(Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Text modified on 11/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2007 Filing 221 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Winston Williams and Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 4 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4-A#5 Exhibit 4-B#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 11/7/2007) Text modified on 11/8/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2007 Filing 220 Defendant Winston Williams and Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 3 and 4 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 11/7/2007) Text modified on 11/8/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #214 Motion to Seal Document (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2007)
October 22, 2007 Filing 216 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Facebook's Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5(b) & (d) to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 3 and 4 and Exhibits F, G and H to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel re ( #212 ), ( #213 ) filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 10/22/2007) Modified on 10/23/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2007 Filing 215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #213 Declaration in Support,, #212 MOTION to Compel PNS and W. Williams to Provide Resps to Interrogatories 3 and 4 [re Under Seal MTC and Exs. F, G, H] (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 17, 2007 Filing 219 DOCUMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
October 17, 2007 Filing 218 SEALED MOTION and memorandum in support thereof (FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007) Modified on 5/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2008,(clerk's error incorrect event, correct event is motion, not memorandum (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2007 Received Document (UNDER SEAL). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
October 17, 2007 Filing 214 Facebook's Administrative Request Pursuant to Lcoal Civil Rule 79-5(b) & (d) to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of of Interrogatories Nos 3 and 4 and Exhibit F, G and H to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel re #213 , #212 by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2007 09:30 AM. (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 10/17/2007) Text modified on 10/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2007 Filing 213 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's MOTION to Compel Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to Provide Complete and Supplemental Responses to Facebook's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 3 and 4 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #212 ) (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 10/17/2007) Text modified on 10/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/18/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2007 Filing 212 PUBLIC/REDACTED Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Facebook's Motion to Compel Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams to Provide Complwete Supplemental Responses to Facebooks's First SEt of Interrogatories No 3 and 4 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2007 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 #2 Proposed Order)(Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 10/17/2007) Text modified on 10/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2007 Filing 211 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2007 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 10/10/2007) re #136 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Mo MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Mo MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Mo filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, #126 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2007)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #196 Motion to Seal Document. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #169 Motion to Seal Document. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #162 Motion to Seal Document. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #159 Motion to Seal. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 4, 2007 Filing 201 Declaration of Service of Exhibits Filed Under Seal by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #197 (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 10/4/2007) Text modified on 10/5/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2007 Filing 200 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5(b) & (d) to File Under Seal Exhibits LL. MM. NN, OO and PP to the Supplemental Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; [Proposed Order] filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 10/4/2007) Text modified on 10/5/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2007 Filing 199 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5(b) & (d) to File Under Seal Exhibits C, E, L, M, O, U, X, and CC to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; [Proposed Order filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 10/4/2007) Text Modified on 10/5/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2007 Filing 210 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
October 2, 2007 Received Exhibits (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
October 2, 2007 Filing 198 Declaration of Yvonne P. Greer Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(D) in support of Sealing Exhibits V-8-E, V-8-G, V-8-H,and V-4; and Withdrawing the Confidential Designations to Exhibits V-5-Q and V8-B to the Declaration of Scott Mosko in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Evidentiary and Related Sanctions filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #162 ) (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 10/2/2007) Text modified on 10/3/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2007 Filing 197 Supplemental Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss #157 , #158 filed byMark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LL, MM, NN, OO and PP)(Related document(s) #157 , #158 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 10/2/2007) Text modified on 10/3/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2007 Filing 196 Plaintiffs' Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5(b) and (D) to file Under Seal Exhibits LL, MM, NN, OO and PP) to the Supplemental Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ( #136 ) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2007 09:30 AM. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 10/2/2007) Text modified on 10/3/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER re Sealing Motions #93 , #104 , #129 , #138 . (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 26, 2007 Filing 209 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
September 26, 2007 Received Exhibit (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
September 26, 2007 Filing 173 Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper in Support of Facebook's Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions ( #172 ) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #172 ) (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Text modified on 9/27/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2007 Filing 172 Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Evidentiary and Related Sanctions Against Defendants Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra and their counsel re #126 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Text modified on 9/27/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2007 Filing 171 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re hand delivery of ( #170 ) filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Text modified on 9/27/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2007 Filing 170 Exhibit XXV to Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Text modified on 9/27/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2007 Filing 169 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit XXV to Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; Declaration of Scott R. Mosko; [Proposed] Order filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Text modified on 9/27/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2007 Filing 168 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Reply ( #167 ) to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ( #136 ) filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit XVIII#2 Exhibit XIX#3 Exhibit XX#4 Exhibit XXI#5 Exhibit XXII#6 Exhibit XXIII#7 Exhibit XXIV#8 Exhibit XXVI#9 Exhibit XXVII#10 Exhibit XXVIII)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Text modified on 9/27/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2007 Filing 167 Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ( #136 ) filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Text modified on 9/27/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 Filing 166 Declaration OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #158 (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 Filing 165 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #158 (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 Received Exhibit (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
September 19, 2007 Filing 208 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Filing 207 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Filing 206 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Received Exhibits (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) )(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Received Exhibits (DOCUMENTS RECEIVED UNDER SEAL)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 Filing 164 Certificate of Service (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Text modified on 9/20/2007(bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2007 Filing 163 Exhibits V-4, V-5-A, through V-5-D, V-5-H through V-5-J, V-5-M through V-5-P, V-5-R, V-7, V-8-E, V-8-G, V-8-H, X through XII, XIV and XVII to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Evidentiary and Related Sanctions, Including Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) by ConnectU, LLC (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Text modified on 9/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2007 Filing 162 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits V-4, V-5-A, through V-5-D, V-5-H through V-5-J, V-5-M through V-5-P, V-5-R, V-7, V-8-E, V-8-G, V-8-H, X through XII, XIV and XVII to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Evidentiary and Related Sanctions, Including Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927; Declaration of Scott R. Mosko; [Proposed] Order filed by ConnectU, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Text modified on 9/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2007 Filing 161 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Evidentiary and Related Sanctions, Including Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927 ( #160 ) filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I#2 Exhibit II#3 Exhibit III#4 Exhibit IV#5 Exhibit VI#6 Exhibit VII#7 Exhibit VIII#8 Exhibit IX#9 Exhibit XIII#10 Exhibit XV#11 Exhibit XVI#12 Exhibit V-1#13 Exhibit V-2#14 Exhibit V-3#15 Exhibit V-5#16 Exhibit V-5-E#17 Exhibit V-5-F#18 Exhibit V-5-G#19 Exhibit V-5-K#20 Exhibit V-5-L#21 Exhibit V-5-Q#22 Exhibit V-5-S#23 Exhibit V-6#24 Exhibit V-8#25 Exhibit V-8-A#26 Exhibit V-8-B#27 Exhibit V-8-C#28 Exhibit V-8-D#29 Exhibit V-8-F#30 Exhibit V-9#31 Exhibit V-10#32 Exhibit V-11#33 Exhibit V-12#34 Exhibit V-13)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Text Modified on 9/20/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2007 Filing 160 Defendants Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Opposition to( #126 ) Plaintiffs' Motion for Evidentiary and Related Sanctions, Including Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Text modified on 9/20/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2007 Filing 159 MOTION to Seal Exhibits C, E, L, M, O, U, X and CC to The Declaration of Theresa Sutton (Docket # 158) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration #2 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Text Modified on 9/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2007 Filing 158 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support o Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss #157 Exhibit II#30 Exhibit JJ#31 Exhibit KK)(Related document(s) #157 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Text modified on 9/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2007 Filing 157 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ( #136 ) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Text modified on 9/20/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 Filing 156 Exhibit V-8-B (re ( #100 ) filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 Filing 155 Exhibit V-5-Q re #137 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Related document(s) #137 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 Filing 154 EXHIBIT - B re #100 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Related document(s) #100 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 Filing 153 Joint Proposed Order re Sealing Motions #135 by Wayne Chang, Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc., ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 Filing 152 Declaration of Scott R. Moskoin Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal ( #104 ) filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 Filing 151 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal ( #104 ) filed byPacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007. linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2007 Filing 150 NOTICE of REFILING EXHIBIT 2 TO DOCKET ( #92 ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #149 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit by The Facebook, Inc. re #92 Declaration in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET #149 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/7/2007) Modified on 9/10/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2007 Filing 149 *** EXHIBIT FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #150 . *** Notice of Re-filing of Exhibit 2 to Docket ( #92 ) by The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/7/2007) Modified on 9/10/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/10/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2007 Filing 148 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(d) Withdrawing the "Confidential" Designation of Exhibit 2 to Docket ( #92 ) filed by The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #93 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/7/2007) Text modified on 9/10/2007 to conform to document cation post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2007 Filing 147 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(d) in Supoprt of Sealing Exhibits V-8-E, V-8-G, V-8-H and V-4; and Withdrawing the "Confidential" Designation of Exhibit V-5Q and V-8-B to The Declaration of Scott Mosko in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ( #38 ) filed by The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #138 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 9/7/2007) Modified on 9/10/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2007 Filing 146 Defendant David Gucwa's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ( #76 ) Violation of California Penal Code 502(C); California and Massachusetts Common Law Misappropriation/Unfair Competition; Violation of Massachusetts General Law 93A; 18 U.S.C. 1030; and 15 U.S.C. 7704 and 7705 by David Gucwa. (Wagner, Valerie) (Filed on 9/7/2007) Text modified on 9/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel, hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2007 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Margo Wagner (Wagner, Valerie) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 7, 2007 Filing 144 Corrected Certificate of Service ( #139 ) by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/7/2007) Modified on 9/7/2007, incorrect event type used., hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Received Exhibits (DOCUMENTS RECEIVED UNDER SEAL). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007)
September 5, 2007 Filing 143 Defendant Wayne Chang's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ( #76 ) by Wayne Chang. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Modified on 9/6/2007, hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Filing 142 Defendant Winston Williams's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ( #76 ) by Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Modified on 9/6/2007, hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Filing 141 Defendant Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to Amended Complaint #76 ) by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Text modified on 9/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel, hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Filing 140 Certificate of Service re ( #139 ) by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Text modified on 9/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel, hyper link added, incorrect event type used (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Filing 139 Exhibits V-4, V-5-A through V-5-D, V-5-H through V-5-J, V-5-M through V-5-R, V-7, V-8-B, V-8-E, V-8-G and V-8-H to Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Moving Defendants' Names from the Second Amended Complaint by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Text modified on 9/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Filing 138 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits V-4, V-5-A through V-5-D, V-5-H through V-5-J, V-5-M through V-5-R, V-7, V-8-B, V-8-E, V-8-G and V-8-H to Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Moving Defendants' Names from the Second Amended Complaint; and (Proposed) Order filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Text modified on 9/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Filing 137 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Moving Defendants' Names from the Second Amended Complaint filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I#2 Exhibit II#3 Exhibit III#4 Exhibit IV#5 Exhibit V-1#6 Exhibit V-2#7 Exhibit V-3#8 Exhibit V-5#9 Exhibit V-5-E#10 Exhibit V-5-F#11 Exhibit V-5-G#12 Exhibit V-5-K#13 Exhibit V-5-L#14 Exhibit V-5-S#15 Exhibit V-6#16 Exhibit V-8#17 Exhibit V-8-A#18 Exhibit V-8-C#19 Exhibit V-8-D#20 Exhibit V-8-F#21 Exhibit V-9#22 Exhibit V-10#23 Exhibit V-11#24 Exhibit V-12#25 Exhibit V-13)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Text modified on 9/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Filing 136 Defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Moving Defendants Names from the Second Amended Complaint filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Text modified on 9/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/27/07. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re #133 Stipulation, filed by ConnectU, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/27/07. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 24, 2007 Filing 133 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Enlarging Time for Response to Second Amended Complaint ( #76 ) and Changing Hearing Date by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 8/24/2007) Text modified on 8/27/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel, hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2007 Filing 194 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL ) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 193 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 192 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 191 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 190 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 189 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 132 Received Exhibit EE: to I Neel Chatterjee's Declaration in Support of Facebook's Motion for Sanctions by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Received Exhibit DD: to I Neel Chatterjee's Declaration in Support of Facebook's Motion for Sanctions by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Received Exhibit CC: to I Neel Chatterjee's Declaration in Support of Facebook's Motion for Sanctions by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Received Exhibit BBJ: to I Neel Chatterjee's Declaration in Support of Facebook's Motion for Sanctions by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Received Exhibit U: to I Neel Chatterjee's Declaration in Support of Facebook's Motion for Sanctions by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Received Exhibit J: to I Neel Chatterjee's Declaration in Support of Facebook's Motion for Sanctions filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 131 Proof of Service by Hand Delivery by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #127 (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/22/2007) Text modified on 8/24/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2007 Filing 130 Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper in Support of Sealing Exhibits U, CC and EE to the Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Suport of Facebook's Motion for Sanction #129 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/22/2007) Text modified on 8/24/2007 to conform to document captions post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2007 Filing 129 Facebook's Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5(b) and (d) to File Under Seal Exhibits J, U, BB, CC, DD, and EE, to the Declatation of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of Facebook's Motion for Sanction filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/22/2007)Text modified on 8/24/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2007 Filing 128 (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiffs' MOTION for Evidentiary and Related Sanctions, Including Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927, Against Defendants Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler winklevoss, Diyva Narendra and their Counsel re #126 by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/22/2007) Text modified on 8/24/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2007 Filing 127 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of Facebook's Motion for Sanctions #126 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice re Under Seal Exs. J, U, BB, CC, DD, and EE#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F#8 Exhibit G#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Q#18 Exhibit R#19 Exhibit S#20 Exhibit T#21 Exhibit V#22 Exhibit W#23 Exhibit X#24 Exhibit Y#25 Exhibit Z#26 Exhibit AA#27 Exhibit FF#28 Exhibit GG#29 Exhibit HH#30 Exhibit II#31 Exhibit JJ#32 Exhibit KK#33 Exhibit LL#34 Exhibit MM#35 Exhibit NN#36 Exhibit OO#37 Exhibit PP#38 Exhibit QQ#39 Exhibit RR#40 Exhibit SS#41 Exhibit TT#42 Exhibit UU#43 Exhibit VV#44 Exhibit WW#45 Exhibit XX#46 Exhibit YY)(Related document(s) #126 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/22/2007) Text modified on 8/24/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2007 Filing 126 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Evidentiary and Related Sanctions, Including Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927, Against Defendants Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler winklevoss, Diyva Narendra and their Counsel filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2007 09:30 AM. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 8/22/2007) Text modified on 8/24/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #111 Motion to Strike (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2007)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
August 5, 2007 Filing 195 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 123 Plaintiffs' Reply to ConnectU LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike ConnectU LLC's Affirmative Defenses re #111 , #96 , filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Day, Chester) (Filed on 8/1/2007) Text modified on 8/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 122 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendant ConnectU, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike ConnectU, LLC's Affirmative Defenses filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Text Modified on 8/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 121 Defendant ConnectU, LLC's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike ConnectU, LLC's Affirmative Defenses filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Text Modified on 8/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Theresa A. Sutton in re July 19, 2007 Supplemental Memorandum re #118 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #118 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Text modified on 7/23/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Filing 119 Supplemental Letter Brief in Support of Defendant Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.'s and Defendant Winston Williams's Motion to Dismiss filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Text modified on 7/23/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2007 Filing 118 Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdication #90 , filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Travel Jungle#2 Exhibit Verizon v. Ralsky#3 Exhibit Mary CLE v. First Choice Internet#4 Exhibit Washington v. Heckel#5 Exhibit Internet Doorway v. Parks#6 Exhibit Gordon v. Virtumundo#7 Exhibit D.C. Micro Dev. v. Lange#8 Exhibit Robert Diaz Enters. v. Elete#9 Exhibit Flowserve Corp. v. Midwest Pipe Repair)(Related document(s) #90 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 7/19/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2007 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. David Gucwa served on 6/26/2007, answer due 7/16/2007. (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons to Complaint served on David Gucwa on 06/26/07, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 7/17/2007) Modified on 7/18/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2007 Filing 115 (Proposed) Order Granting Administrative Request to Seal Exhibit D to Mosko Declaration by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 7/13/2007) Text modified on 7/16/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2007 Filing 114 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(d) in Support of Sealing Exhibit D to the Declaration of Scott Mosko ( #104 ) in Support of Defendants' Reply Memorandum filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 7/13/2007) Text modified on 7/16/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel, hjyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2007 Filing 113 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/11/2007 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 7/11/2007), Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2007 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 7/11/2007). (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2007)
July 10, 2007 Filing 112 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Connectu LLC's Affirmative Defenses and re #111 #96 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #111 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 7/10/2007) Text modified on 7/11/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2007 Filing 111 Plaintiffs' Notice of MOTION to Strike ConnectU LLC's Affirmative Defenses re #96 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 7/10/2007) Text modified on 7/11/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2007 Filing 110 Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Evidence Submitted in Support of Its Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 7/10/2007) Text modified on 7/11/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2007 Filing 109 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 7/10/2007) Text modified on 7/11/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 188 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 6, 2007 Filing 187 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 6, 2007 Received Exhibit SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 6, 2007 Filing 108 Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Evidence Submitted in Support of Its Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #100 by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 106 Supplemental Declaration of John Taves in Support of Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc's and Winston Williams' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdication re #99 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. (Related document(s) #99 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 105 Supplemental Declaration of Winston Williams in Support of Defendnats Pacific Northwest Software, Inc's and Winston Williams' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdication filed by Winston Williams. (Related document(s) #99 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 104 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, and D to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants' Repl; [Proposed] Order re #100 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 103 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re #100 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 102 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re #100 ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 101 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re #100 (Mosko, Scott) ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal)(Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel(bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 100 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.'s and Winston Williams's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re #99 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit . C)(Related document(s) #99 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2007 Filing 99 Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc's and Winston Williams' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction( #23 ) filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Text modified on 7/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel, hyper-link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2007 Filing 98 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 28, 2007 Filing 97 PROOF OF SERVICE by Hand re #92 , #91 of Confidential Under Seal Documents (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 6/28/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Text modified on 6/29/2007 to conform to document cation post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 Filing 186 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 185 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 184 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 183 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 182 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 181 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 180 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 179 EXHIBITS (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 178 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 177 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 176 EXHIBIT (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 175 Opposition (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 26 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 21 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 17 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 16 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Monte M. F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Received Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (DOCUMENT RECEIVED UNDER SEAL)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 Filing 96 Defendant ConnectU LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ( #76 ) by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 6/25/2007) Modified on 6/26/2007, hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 Filing 95 EXHIBITS - 6 re #92 Declaration in Support, CORRECTED Docket #92- Exhibit 6 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #92 ) (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 6/25/2007) Modified on 6/26/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 Filing 94 Declaration of Michael W. Trinh in Support of Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion and Related Exhibits Under Seal #93 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #93 ) (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 6/25/2007) Text modified on 6/26/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 Filing 93 Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Related Exhibits Under Seal filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 6/25/2007) Text modified on 6/26/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 Filing 92 Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #90 , filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Manual Filing Notification of Exhibits of Under Seal Exs. 1, 2, 7, 9, 11-14, 16, 17, 19, 21, 26#2 Exhibit 3#3 Exhibit 4#4 Exhibit 5#5 Exhibit 6#6 Exhibit 8#7 Exhibit 10 (1 of 3)#8 Exhibit 10 (2 of 3)#9 Exhibit 10 (3 of 3)#10 Exhibit 15 (1 of 4)#11 Exhibit 15 (2 of 4)#12 Exhibit 15 (3 of 4)#13 Exhibit 15 (4 of 4)#14 Exhibit 18 (1 of 8)#15 Exhibit 18 (2 of 8)#16 Exhibit 18 (3 of 8)#17 Exhibit 18 (4 of 8)#18 Exhibit 18 (5 of 8)#19 Exhibit 18 (6 of 8)#20 Exhibit 18 (7 of 8)#21 Exhibit 18 (8 of 8)#22 Exhibit 20#23 Exhibit 22#24 Exhibit 23#25 Exhibit 24#26 Exhibit 25 (1 of 2)#27 Exhibit 25 (2 of 2)#28 Exhibit 27#29 Exhibit 28#30 Exhibit 29#31 Exhibit 30#32 Exhibit 31#33 Exhibit 32#34 Exhibit 33#35 Exhibit 34#36 Exhibit 35)(Related document(s) #90 ) (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 6/25/2007) Text modified on 6/26/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 Filing 91 OPPOSITION to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #90 (Cooper, Monte)***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) (Filed on 6/25/2007) Text modified on 6/26/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 Filing 90 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams' MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re #23 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 6/25/2007) Text modified on 6/26/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re #88 Stipulation filed by Winston Williams, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/18/07. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2007)
June 18, 2007 Filing 88 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED ORDER] by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 6/18/2007) Modified on 6/19/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2007 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wayne Chang on 6/2/07, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
June 14, 2007 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on David Gucwa on 6/1/07, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
June 14, 2007 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Divya Narendra on 6/2/07, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg re #78 Rule 6-3 Motion (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2007) Modified on 6/14/2007 (rssec, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2007 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, etc. served on Tyler Winklevoss on 6/5/07, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
June 14, 2007 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, etc. served on Cameron Winklevoss on 6/5/07, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
June 8, 2007 Filing 81 Declaration of Theresa Sutton in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to ConnectU's Civil L.R. 6-3 Motion to Enlarge Time re #80 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Text modified on 6/12/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2007 Filing 80 Plaintiff's Opposition to ConnectU's Motion to Enlarge Time filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Text modified on 6/12/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2007 Filing 79 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc. re #77 Errata (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Text modified on 6/8/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2007 Filing 78 Defendant ConnectU LLC's Civil L.R. 6-3 Motion to Enlarge Time, Declaration of Scott R. Mosko, and [Proposed] Order filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 6/5/2007) Text modified on 6/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2007 Filing 77 ERRATA re Caption on Second Amended Complaint Filed May 30, 2007 (Docket ( #76 ) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 6/5/2007) Modified on 6/5/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2007 Summons Issued as to Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, David Gucwa, Wayne Chang, Cameron Winklevoss. as to the Second Amended Complaint (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
May 30, 2007 Filing 76 *** please see #269 corrected SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed by The Facebook, Inc. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 5/30/2007) Text modified on 5/30/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/1/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008,(link to document) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2007 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2007 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 5/23/2007) re #34 MOTION to Expedite Discovery re Personal Jurisdiction filed by The Facebook, Inc.,. (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2007)
May 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #34 Motion to Expedite. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part #25 Motion to Dismiss with leave to AMEND within 20 days from the date of this order. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 6/1/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2007 Filing 72 STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RE: JURISDICTION by The Facebook, Inc.. (Greer, Yvonne) (Filed on 5/15/2007)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #63 Motion to file documents under seal. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2007)
May 9, 2007 Filing 67 Amended Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal; [Proposed] Order filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 5/9/2007) Text modified on 5/10/2007 to conform to document post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2007 Filing 66 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal; [Proposed] Order filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 5/9/2007) Text modified on 5/10/2007 to conform to dcoument caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2007 Received Received Exhibit I to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery (DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL) by The Facebook, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007)
May 3, 2007 Received Received Exhibit H to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery (DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL) by The Facebook, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007)
May 3, 2007 Received Exhibit E to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery (DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL) by The Facebook, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007)
May 2, 2007 Filing 71 EXHIBIT I to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007)
May 2, 2007 Filing 70 EXHIBIT H to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007)
May 2, 2007 Filing 69 EXHIBIT E to the Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007)
May 2, 2007 Filing 65 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2007 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 5/2/2007) re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.'s and Defendant Winston Williams's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.,, Winston Williams,, #25 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ConnectU LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by ConnectU, LLC,. (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2007)
May 2, 2007 Filing 64 Proof of Service via Hand Delivery by The Facebook, Inc. re #60 #63 #61 #62 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/2/2007) Text modified on 5/3/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2007 Filing 63 Facebook's Administration Request to File Exhibits E, H and I to the Suttion Declaration Under Seal in Support of Facebook's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery re: Personal Jurisdiction #61 filed by The Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/2/2007) Text modified on 5/3/2007 to conform to document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2007 Filing 62 EXHIBITS E, H, AND I TO DECLARATION OF THERESA A. SUTTON IN SUPPORT OF FACEBOOK INC.'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) by The Facebook, Inc.(Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/2/2007) Text modified on 5/3/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2007 Filing 61 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook, Inc's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery re: Personal Jurisdiction #60 filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #60 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/2/2007) Text modified on 5/3/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2007 Filing 60 Reply Memorandum In Support of Facebook Inc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery Re: Personal Jurisdiction filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 5/2/2007) Modified on 5/3/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Seal. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 25, 2007 Filing 59 EXHIBIT D and E to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams' Opposition to Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery re; Personal Jurisdiction re 58 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Related document(s) 58 ) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL)
April 25, 2007 Filing 58 Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams' Opposition to Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery re; Personal Jurisdiction #34 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 Received Joint Stipluation Regarding Responses to Plaintiff's Document Requests and Maintenance of Electronic Data (DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL) by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 Received Exhibits D and E to the Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams' Opposition to Facebook, Inc's Motion for Expedited Discovery re: Personal Jurisdiction. (DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL) by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 Received Defendants Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams' Opposition to Facebook, Inc's Motion for Expedited Discovery re: Personal Jurisdiction. (DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL) by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( 55 ) by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/25/2007) Modified on 4/26/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2007 Filing 55 Defendants Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams' Opposition to Plaintiff Facebook, Inc's Motion for Expedited Discovery re: Personal Jurisdication re #34 filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (REDACTED VERSION FOR PUBLIC VIEWING)
April 25, 2007 Filing 54 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc. and Winston Williams' Opposition to Facebook's Motion for Expedited Discovery Re: Personal Jurisdiction filed byPacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit F#5 Exhibit G#6 Exhibit H#7 Exhibit I)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 Filing 53 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal; Declaration of Scott R. Mosko; [Proposed] Order filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 Filing 52 Defendant's Pacific Northwest Software and Winston Williams Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal; Declaration of Scott R. Mosko; (Proposed) by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/25/2007) Modified on 4/25/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Text modified on 4/25/2007 to conform to document catpion post by counsel. (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2007 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE re: On April 5, 2007, counsel for Plaintiff filed Exhibit A to Declaration of I Neel Chatterjee (#46) manually, on paper. This case has been designated for electronic filing, pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and General Order 45.The above mentioned paper document has been filed and docketed. However, General Order 45 provides at Section III that cases assigned to judges who participate in the e-filing program "shall be presumptively designated" as e-filing cases. Therefore, counsel for Plaintiff should submit Exhibit A to Declaration of I Neel Chatterjee (46), in PDF format within 10 days, as an attachment in an e-mail message directed to the judges chamber's "PDF" email box listed at http://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
April 18, 2007 Filing 50 Defendant's ConnectU LLC's Reply to Facebook's Inc's Opposition to ConnectU LLC's, Reply to Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to ConnectU's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claimfiled by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/18/2007) Text modified on 4/19/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #40 Motion to Advance Case Management Conference and Related Dates. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 12, 2007 Filing 48 Defendant ConnectU's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Advance the Case Management Conference ([40}) filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/12/2007) Modified on 4/18/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2007 Filing 47 Facebook's Opposition to ConnectU LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)re #25 filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/11/2007) Text modified on 4/12/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #30 Motion to Enlarge Time. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 9, 2007 Filing 44 Defendant ConnectU, LLC De-Designation of Confidential Information (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/9/2007) Modified on 4/10/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/10/2007 (rssec, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2007 Filing 43 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendants Pacific Northwest, Inc. and Winston Williams' Opposition to Facebooks' Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ P 12(B)(2) and Reschedule May 2, 2007 Hearing filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #42 ) (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/9/2007) Text modified on 4/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2007 Filing 42 Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc and Winston Williams' Opposition to Facebook's to Facebook's Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2), and Reschedule May 2, 2007 Hearing filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/9/2007) Text modified on 4/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2007 Filing 41 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's MOTION To Reschedule The June 20, 2007 Case Management Conference #40 filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Related document(s) #40 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/9/2007) Text modified on 4/10/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2007 Filing 40 Facebook's MOTION To Reschedule The June 20, 2007 Case Management Conference filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/9/2007) Modified on 4/10/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 46 EXHIBIT A to Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of Facebook's motion for Expedited Discovery re Personal Jurisdiction re #35 filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #35 ) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 39 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by The Facebook, Inc. re Received Document (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Received Exhibit A to Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of Facebook's Motion for Expedited Discovery re Personal Jurisdiction (DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL) by The Facebook, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 5, 2007 Filing 38 Exhibit A to the Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjeeby The Facebook, Inc.***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING***(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008, (counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 37 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebook's Administrative Request to File Certain Documents Under Seal filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Text modified on 4/6/2007 to conform to document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 36 MOTION to file under seal exhibit A to the Declaration of I. N. Chatterjee filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Modified on 4/6/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Text modified on 4/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 35 Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee in Support of Facebook's Motion fro Expedicted Discovery re: Personal Jurisdiction #34 filed by The Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) #34 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Text modified on 4/6/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 34 Facebook, Inc.'s MOTION for Expedited Discovery re: Personal Jurisdiction filed by The Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Modified on 4/6/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 33 Plaintiff Facebook, Inc's Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 DIsclosure Statement by The Facebook, Inc. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Modified on 4/6/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2007 Filing 32 Plaintiff Facebook, Inc's Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/5/2007) Text modified on 4/5/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2007 Filing 31 Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in Support of Facebrook's MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(B)( #30 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #30 ) (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/4/2007) Modified on 4/5/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2007 Filing 30 Facebrook's MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(B)(2), and Reschedule May 2, 2007 Hearing filed by Facebrook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/4/2007) Text modified on 4/5/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2007 Filing 29 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Facebook, Inc... (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 28 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ConnectU, LLC, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams.. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 27 Declaration of Winston Williams in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2( #23 ) filed by Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/22/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 26 Declaration of Scott R. Mosko in Support of Defendant Connectu LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ( #25 ) filed by ConnectU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/22/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ConnectU LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by ConnectU, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 21, 2007 Filing 24 Declaration of John Taves in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) ( #23 ) filed by Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Modified on 3/22/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Defendants Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.'s and Winston Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Text modified on 3/22/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 22 Defendant Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.'s Joinder in ConnectU LLC's Notice of Removalby Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Text modified on 3/22/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2007 Filing 21 Defendant Winston Williams's Joinder in ConnectU LLC's Notice of Removal by Winston Williams. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 3/21/2007) Text modified on 3/22/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2007 Filing 20 Notice of Interested Parties by ConnectU, LLC (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 3/14/2007) Text modified on 3/15/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2007 Filing 19 Index of State Court Pleadings #291-295 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 18 Index of State Court Pleadings #247-#290 (Tab #280 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed in State Court filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Modified on 6/1/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2007 Filing 17 Index of State Court Pleadings #226-246 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 16 Index of State Court Pleadings #196-225 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 15 Index of State Court Pleadings #176-195 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 14 Index of State Court Pleadings #146-175 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 13 Index of State Court Pleadings #116-145 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 12 Index of State Court Pleadings #100-115 filed by ConnectU, LLC.(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 11 Index of State Court Pleadings #77 - 99 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 10 Index of State Court Pleadings #66 - 75 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 9 Index of State Court Pleadings #51 - 65 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 8 Index of State Court Pleadings #50 filed byConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 7 Index of State Court Pleadings #33 - 49 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 6 Index of State Court Pleadings #18 - 33 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 5 Index of State Court Pleadings #1 - 17 filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2009: #1 Exhibit complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to complaint) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2007 Filing 4 Index of State Court Pleadings filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2007 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2007 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2007. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2007 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # ( #2 ) bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (NO PROCESS) from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 105CV047381. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611000604). Filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2007 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (NO PROCESS) from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 105CV047381. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611000604). Filed by ConnectU, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Facebook, Inc. v. Connectu, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gucwa
Represented By: Valerie Margo Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Northwest Software, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Williams
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConnectU LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Shaw
Represented By: Evan A. Parke
Represented By: Alison Paige Buchanan
Represented By: Steven Christopher Holtzman
Represented By: David A. Barrett
Represented By: D. Michael Underhill
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Represented By: Mark A. Weissman
Represented By: Sean F. O'Shea
Represented By: James Earl Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Chang
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Alan Lincoln, Esq.
Represented By: Theresa Ann Sutton
Represented By: Yvonne Penas Greer
Represented By: Monte M.F. Cooper
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Chester Wren-Ming Day
Represented By: George Hopkins Guy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Sean Alan Lincoln, Esq.
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Represented By: Theresa Ann Sutton
Represented By: Yvonne Penas Greer
Represented By: Monte M.F. Cooper
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Chester Wren-Ming Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Fenwick & West LLP
Represented By: Tyler Alexander Baker
Represented By: Kalama M. Lui-Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: R. Gregory Roussel
Represented By: Tyler Alexander Baker
Represented By: Kalama M. Lui-Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Divya Narendra
Represented By: Jerome B. Falk, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Andrew Byrne
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Represented By: Tyler Roberts Meade
Represented By: Mark A. Weissman
Represented By: John Phillip Duchemin
Represented By: Sean M. SeLegue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Cameron Winklevoss
Represented By: Jerome B. Falk, Jr.
Represented By: Evan A. Parke
Represented By: Mark Andrew Byrne
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Represented By: Tyler Roberts Meade
Represented By: Mark A. Weissman
Represented By: John Phillip Duchemin
Represented By: Sean M. SeLegue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Tyler Winklevoss
Represented By: Jerome B. Falk, Jr.
Represented By: Evan A. Parke
Represented By: Tyler Roberts Meade
Represented By: John Phillip Duchemin
Represented By: Sean M. SeLegue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master George C. Fisher
Represented By: George C. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L.L.P.
Represented By: Merri Anne Baldwin
Represented By: John Gerard Heller
Represented By: Lisa Barclay
Represented By: Thomas B Mason
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP
Represented By: Randall Garteiser
Represented By: Bruce Eric Van Dalsem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
Represented By: Evan A. Parke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CNET Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm
Represented By: Roger Rex Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?