Morphis v. LoanCity, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff sued defendants LoanCity, Inc., Rick Soukoulis, Blackberry Capital, Inc., E*TRADE Group, Inc., InterWest Partners, Marsh & McLennan Capital, Inc. and BankAmerica, Inc. Plaintiff alleged that defendants refused to pay all sums due pursuant to an employment contract, and that defendants repeated libeled and slandered plaintiff by intentionally misrepresenting plaintiff's job performance while employed at LoanCity, Inc.

Plaintiff: Amber Johnson Morphis
Defendant: LoanCity, Inc., Rick Soukoulis, Blackberry Capital, Inc., E*Trade Group, Inc., InterWest Partners, Marsh & McLennan Capital, Inc. and BankAmerica, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv01501
Filed: March 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9
ORDER 7 for Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/6/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
May 18, 2007 Filing 8
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
April 17, 2007 Filing 7
Proposed Order Request for Dismissal by Amber Johnson Morphis. (Davidson, Thornton) (Filed on 4/17/2007)
March 19, 2007 Filing 6
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amber Johnson Morphis. Amendment to 4 Amended Complaint First Amended Summons. (Davidson, Thornton) (Filed on 3/19/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morphis v. LoanCity, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Johnson Morphis
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Soukoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackberry Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterWest Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh & McLennan Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BankAmerica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?