American Hardware Mutual Insurance Company v. Escamilla et al

Plaintiff: American Hardware Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Juan Escamilla and Julie Figueroa
Counter-claimant: Julie Figueroa and Juan Escamilla
Counter-defendant: American Hardware Mutual Insurance Company
Mediator: Thomas HR Denver
Case Number: 5:2007cv01545
Filed: March 19, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 112 Re: Dismissal With Prejudice, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/8/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 23, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 104 re: Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Julie Figueroa, Julie Figueroa terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
March 4, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 95 Continuing Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/4/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
September 30, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
October 9, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 74 Continuing Hearing Date for American Hardware Insurance Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/9/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Hardware Mutual Insurance Company v. Escamilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Hardware Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Escamilla
Represented By: Robert Louis Mezzetti, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Figueroa
Represented By: David Walter Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Julie Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Juan Escamilla
Represented By: Robert Louis Mezzetti, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: American Hardware Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Hegen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Thomas HR Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?