Syscan, Inc. v. Plustek, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Syscan, Inc.
Defendant: Plustek, Inc. and Futurewell Holding Limited
Counter-claimant: Plustek, Inc. and Futurewell Holding Limited
Counter-defendant: Syscan, Inc.
Mediator: Stephen H. Sulmeyer, J.D., Ph.D.
Case Number: 5:2007cv01603
Filed: March 21, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with prejudice re 151 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 14, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT re 149 Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2010. Status Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
April 19, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO CONTINUE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING re 147 Stipulation. Claim Construction Hearing set for 6/25/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Status Report due 6/14/2010. No further continuances will be granted. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
March 17, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Claim Construction Hearing re 142 Stipulation. Claim Construction set for 4/23/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose, before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010) Modified hearing date on 3/20/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation on Page Limitations for Claim Construction Briefing re 126 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 30, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MOOT re 87 Stipulation. The stipulation is found as MOOT. The Court has issued its Order 125 on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
September 29, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS FORPARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The parties shall meet and confer to agree on abriefing schedule and file the appropriate Stipulation for the Courts approval on or before 10/5/2009. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
July 9, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement due 9/18/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
January 29, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT to Continue the Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statements and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference re 51 Stipulation. Joint Pretrial Conference statement due 3/13/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 28, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Preliminary Pretrial Conference from 2/2/2009 to 3/23/2009 re 51 Stipulation. Joint Pretrial Statement due 3/13/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
November 25, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 47 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syscan, Inc. v. Plustek, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syscan, Inc.
Represented By: Yung-Ming Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plustek, Inc.
Represented By: George Luis Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futurewell Holding Limited
Represented By: George Luis Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Plustek, Inc.
Represented By: George Luis Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Futurewell Holding Limited
Represented By: George Luis Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Syscan, Inc.
Represented By: Yung-Ming Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Stephen H. Sulmeyer, J.D., Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?