Brazil et al v. Dell Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Seick and Chad Brazil
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv01700
Filed: March 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES AND AWARD OF SERVICE AWARDS FOR CLASS REPRESENTATIVES re 320 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on April 4, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 319 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allison Stacy Elgart terminated (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 316 STIPULATION AND ORDER 314 Rescheduling Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement: Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 237 Motion to Certify Class (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 248 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER re 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, requiring response from Dell within 10 days. Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/22/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 228 Motion for Discovery; denying 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER 214 Granting Joint Request for a Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/21/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying 158 plaintiffs' objection to magistrate judge's order granting motion for protective order and denying motion to compel. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/7/09. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SEALING ORDER re 93 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Chad Brazil, Steven Seick. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/29/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 160 Motion to Continue. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RE: 141 DENYING IN PART MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 86 Motion to Dismiss and to Strike Class Allegations.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER 107 to Continue Case Management Conference:Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/6/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER vacating hearing. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/22/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER 100 Regarding Discovery. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/14/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 87 Motion For Expedited Further Case Management Conference (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER 75 & 90 Regarding Defendant Dell, Inc.'s Response to Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/8/8. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brazil et al v. Dell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Seick
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Brazil
Represented By: Allison Stacy Elgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?