McCauley v. Stanford University Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Vanda McCauley
Defendant: Stanford University Medical Center, Lucile Packard Children's Hospital and Stanford Hospital And Clinics
Mediator: David T. Kelley
Case Number: 5:2007cv01784
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER re 84 Notice of Appeal filed by Vanda McCauley (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
May 28, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL RE 76 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TAXED COSTS. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 6, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 70 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND HER COMPLAINT; AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
March 11, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 33 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(f). (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCauley v. Stanford University Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanda McCauley
Represented By: Marylon M. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford University Medical Center
Represented By: Michael Terrence Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucile Packard Children's Hospital
Represented By: Michael Terrence Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Hospital And Clinics
Represented By: Alyson Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: David T. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?