Lythgoe et al v. Bank of The West et al

Plaintiff: Tracie Lythgoe, Behnaz Morshedi, Patricia Simpson, Marylin Foster and Angie Kottikas
Defendant: Bank of The West, Ken Fujihara and Linda Locklear
Case Number: 5:2007cv02300
Filed: April 27, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 76 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/12/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
January 26, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 73 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO VACATE ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
October 27, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/26/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
September 17, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MOVE SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE TO NOVEMBER 13, AND TO MOVE TRIAL DATE AND OTHER DEADLINES re 70 . Jury Trial set for 3/3/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/16/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 3, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 64 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING THE HEARING DATE; AND DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE A NEW HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/3/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
August 17, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PARTIES 10 ADDITIONAL PAGES IN BRIEFS IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 53 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
May 7, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/7/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lythgoe et al v. Bank of The West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of The West
Represented By: Neda N. DalCielo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Fujihara
Represented By: Suzanne R Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Locklear
Represented By: Suzanne R Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Lythgoe
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behnaz Morshedi
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Simpson
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marylin Foster
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Kottikas
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?