Calloway v. California Department Correction & Rehabilitation

Plaintiff: James Wilson Calloway
Defendant: California Department Correction & Rehabilitation
Case Number: 5:2007cv02335
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 143 ; 144 ; 146 ; 149 ; 151 ; 153 ; 154 ; 155 Plaintiff's Post-Judgment Motions by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
August 17, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 136 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
June 29, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/29/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
March 24, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Addressing Pending Motions by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 92 Motion to Comply Service of the Summons and Complaint and to Reinstate Dismissed Defendants; Denying 95 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; Denying 98 Motion to Comply with F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a); Denying 102 Motion to Alter Judgment; Denying 105 Motion to Compel; Denying 106 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
September 30, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Denying 84 Motion to Compel Discovery, and Request for Appointment of Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 8, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Partial Dismissal; Order of Service; Order Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/4/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
July 6, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 68 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
April 15, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/14/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
February 12, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Addressing Pending Motions by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calloway v. California Department Correction & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department Correction & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?