Aqua-Lung America, Inc. v. American Underwater Products, Inc., dba Oceanic et al

Plaintiff: Aqua-Lung America, Inc.
Defendant: Two Forty Deuce Corporation and American Underwater Products, Inc., dba Oceanic
Case Number: 5:2007cv02346
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 152 OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/17/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 19, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/23/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
August 4, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 141 RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/4/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 28, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 134 , 135 DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/28/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
May 19, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING AQUA-LUNG'S MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/19/10. The parties should file a joint case management Statement no later than 7/15/10.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
April 28, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 94 , 96 , 98 , 100 , 102 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/28/2010. Case Management Conference set for 06/10/2010 at 10:00 a.m. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 29, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 127 , 128 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/29/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
February 22, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 107 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/22/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
August 6, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 89 MODIFYING TIME. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
August 4, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel re 85 Aqua-Lung America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on August 4, 2009. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
February 26, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/26/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
December 3, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING APPARATUS IN THE COURTROOM re 76 filed by Aqua-Lung America, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/3/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aqua-Lung America, Inc. v. American Underwater Products, Inc., dba Oceanic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Forty Deuce Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Underwater Products, Inc., dba Oceanic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aqua-Lung America, Inc.
Represented By: A. James Isbester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?