Ramirez et al v. Milgard Manufacturing Inc.

Plaintiff: Jose Fernando Ramirez, Evararado Montejano and Sergio Jacobo
Defendant: Milgard Manufacturing Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv02408
Filed: May 3, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2012 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 176 Granting Joint Status Report Re: Case Management Conference and Request for Continuance: Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/24/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
March 29, 2012 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 172 Granting Joint Request for Continuance of March 30, 2012 Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/29/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
February 16, 2012 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 170 Granting Joint Request for Continuance of 2/17/2012 CMC. Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/16/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
January 25, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 168 for Continuance of 1/27/2012 Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh for Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/24/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
July 14, 2011 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 165 Granting Joint Request for Continuance of 7/15/2011 CMC. Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/14/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 2, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 160 for Continuances of June 3, 2011 Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose or File a Dismissal Before 7/1/2011. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/2/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
July 1, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 7/10/2009. Sur-replies due by 7/17/2009. Hearing on motions continued to 8/28/2009. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
January 21, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 45 Regarding Summary Judgment Issues.Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2009 10:30 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due 2/20/2009. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
February 6, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Discovery Plan & ORDER 33 Regarding Discovery & Filing of First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/6/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. Milgard Manufacturing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Fernando Ramirez
Represented By: Hector R. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evararado Montejano
Represented By: Hector R. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Jacobo
Represented By: Hector R. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milgard Manufacturing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?