Feldman v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Lawrence Feldman purchased advertising from Defendant Google, Inc. based on keywords such as Vioxx, Bextra and Celebrex. Plaintiff alleged that he was a victim of click fraud and that 20–30% of all clicks for which he was charged was fraudulent.

Plaintiff: Lawrence Feldman
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv02411
Filed: May 3, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE 22 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/28/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 26, 2008 22
NOTICE by Google, Inc. OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41) (Silbert, David) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
October 2, 2007 21
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Debra L. Mellinkoff as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
September 19, 2007 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 18, 2007 19
ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator, J. Daniel Sharp. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2007)
September 13, 2007 18
First MOTION to Amend/Correct 15 Case Management Statement (Joint) filed by Lawrence Feldman. (Feldman, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/13/2007)
August 24, 2007 17
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing J. Daniel Sharp as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
August 20, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER 14 Selecting ADR Process. Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/20/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 10, 2007 15
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Lawrence Feldman. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 8/10/2007)
August 6, 2007 14
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Google, Inc. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 8/6/2007)
August 1, 2007 13
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
June 28, 2007 12
CLERK'S NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2007 10:30 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2007. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
June 26, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/25/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2007)
June 20, 2007 10
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google, Inc.. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 6/20/2007)
June 13, 2007 9
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference from 8/17/2007 to 9/24/2007. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2007. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2007 10:00 AM Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2007)
June 12, 2007 6
MOTION to Consider Whether Case C05-2579 RMW and C05-2885 RMW Should Be Related filed by Google, Inc. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 6/12/2007) Text modified on 6/13/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2007 2
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2007. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2007 02:00 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feldman v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Feldman
Represented By: William E Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: David Jason Silbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?