Labtis v. Paulson
Plaintiff: Sado Labtis
Defendant: Henry M Paulson, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2007cv03333
Filed: June 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER CONTINUING SHOW CAUSE HEARING: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/8/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/29/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE: 46 TERMINATING SETTLEMENT COUNSEL PARTICIPATION IN THE ASSISTED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT AND ORDER re 63 . (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/3/2009 09:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/4/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 51 Stipulation filed by Henry M Paulson, Jr. Further Case Management Conference continued to 4/1/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/6/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference continued to 2/11/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER APPOINTING SETTLEMENT COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE TO ASSISTED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/7/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING IN CASES WITH UNREPRESENTED PARTIES: Case designated for electronic filing. Effective immediately all represented parties will e-file their submissions to the court. Represented parties will be required to serve paper copie s by mail on unrepresented parties. Unrepresented litigants will continue to file and serve all submissions to the court in paper form unless prior leave is obtained from the assigned judge. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn Walker dated 5/11/07 (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labtis v. Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sado Labtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry M Paulson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?