Santa Clara Valley Water District v. Olin Corporation
Plaintiff: Santa Clara Valley Water District
Defendant: Olin Corporation
Case Number: 5:2007cv03756
Filed: July 20, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STIPULATION AND ORDER 301 of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING 296 REQUEST FOR HEARING. Hearing set for 4/14/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/9/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER for Further Settlement Conference requiring the parties to appear before United States District Judge Fogel at 1:30 p.m. on September 16, 2009, unless a settlement is reached before then. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/15/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER continuing pretrial conference and trial dates signed by Judge Whyte on 9/2/09; pretrial conference is continued to 9/14/09 at 2:00 p.m., trial is continued to 9/21/09 at 1:30 p.m. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Summary Judgment. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STIPULATION AND ORDER (AS AMENDED BY THE COURT) re 227 Stipulation, filed by Santa Clara Valley Water District, 218 MOTION to Compel filed by Santa Clara Valley Water District. The September 1, 2009 hearing is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/28/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 224 Stipulation filed by Olin Corporation, 171 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Olin Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/27/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER for further settlement conference. Signed by Judge whyte on 8/24/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 90 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion to Compel. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying as moot in part 124 Defendant Olin Corporation's Motion to Compel (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER of Recusal from Discovery Reference Only. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/13/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 Stipulation filed by Olin Corporation. *PLEASE NOTE MINOR SCHEDULE CHANGE.* Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/13/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER 62 Modifying Case Management Order: Jury Trial set for 7/20/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/4/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santa Clara Valley Water District v. Olin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Clara Valley Water District
Represented By: Holly Louise Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?