Lenz v. Universal Music Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lenz
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. and Universal Music Corp.
Case Number: 5:2007cv03783
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SALLIE KIM FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/12/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 475 FILED OPINION. AFFIRMED. Each party shall bear its own costs. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER DENYING 390 , 395 CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/24/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 388 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE (approving 387 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/2/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER Following In Camera Review. Plaintiff need not produce any of the redacted information to defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/19/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 365 defendants' motion to find plaintiff in contempt, to compel compliance and in camera review, and for sanctions.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 381 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re 380 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER OVERRULING 346 DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/17/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER RE OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/16/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE (approving 342 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS AND TESTIMONY by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 297 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY PLAINTIFF POST-DATING THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 235 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 31, 2010 HEARING. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on August 27, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE (approving 290 ). Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 5/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/16/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER: (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORY NO. 17; (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DESIGNATION OF WITNESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 30(b)(6); (3) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF' S MOTION TO DETERMINE SUFFICIENCY OF RESPONSES; (4) SOLICITING FURTHER BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull deferring ruling on 235 Motion to Compel; granting 236 Motion to Compel; denying 240 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 242 Motion for Discovery. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER re 240 242 236 Vacating Hearing and Submitting Motions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/19/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO SEAL DECLARATION OF MELISSA J. MIKSCH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS POST-DATING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS THERETO re 265 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Stephanie Lenz. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 5, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 199 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment(jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO SEAL MOTION TO DETERMINE THE SUFFICIENCY OF RESPONSES TO RFAS, SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. KWUN AND EXHIBITS THERETO re 231 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Stephanie Lenz. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on February 23, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO SEAL UNIVERSAL'S CONFIDENTIAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, AND CONFIDENTIAL DECLARATION OF KELLY M. KLAUS AND EXHIBITS THERETO re 212 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/4/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009) Modified on 12/7/2009 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF FOLGER LEVIN & KAHN LLP AS COUNSEL FOR STEPHANIE LENZ re 202 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/3/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER OVERRULING 170 OBJECTION TO AUGUST 25, 2009 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNIVERSAL-PRINCE COMMUNICATIONS AS TO WHICH UNIVERSAL ASSERTS PRIVILEGE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/29/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER RE: 157 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING AUGUST 25, 2009, ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/27/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER re 170 Objection, filed by Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing Group Inc. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/16/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (1) STAYING PART C.4 OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE SEEBORG'S AUGUST 25, 2009 ORDER, (2) DISCOVERY MATTERS, AND (3) MODIFYING THE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE (approving 172 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE (approving 164 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO 157 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 CORRECTED ORDER RE: 129 DENYING MOTION TO SEAL. Please disregard 151 . (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Seeborg GRANTING 90 106 MOTION TO SEAL (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: 72 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 59 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 47 MOTION TO CERTIFY INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/4/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenz v. Universal Music Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lenz
Represented By: Marcia Clare Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Laura Ashley Aull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Group Inc.
Represented By: Laura Ashley Aull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Corp.
Represented By: Laura Ashley Aull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?