United States of America v. Seidel
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thomas E. Seidel
Case Number: 5:2007cv04128
Filed: August 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER APPROVING 87 REQUEST FOR HEARING AND NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING FOR THE PURPOSE OF DISCUSSING RELEASE OF LIENS AND PENDING ATTORNEYS' FEES. Status Conference set for 7/8/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/7/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE 73 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF COSTS AND PROFESSIONAL FEES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/25/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 65 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING FEDERAL TAX LIENS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/28/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 to Dismiss Counterclaim Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/20/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 48 DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE FORM 2751. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESET FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/3/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David L. Denier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?