Verigy US, Inc. v. Mayder, et al
Plaintiff: Verigy US, Inc.
Defendant: Romi Omar Mayder, Wesley Mayder, Silicon Test Systems, Inc. and Silicon Test Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 5:2007cv04330
Filed: August 22, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER Sealing Documents. Declaration and Corrected Declaration of Tim C. Hale in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Disclose Highly Confidential-Attorneys Eyes Only Material to Two Additional Experts and Exhibits 1-3 to be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/20/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 437 STIPULATION AND ORDER 436 to Continue Trial Date:Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 295 defendants' motion to compel production of documents. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 432 REDACTED ORDER GRANTING IN PART 261 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND DENYING 261 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/18/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 296 defendants' motion to quash subpoena; granting in part and denying in part 319 plaintiff's motion to compel documents. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 412 STIPULATION AND ORDER 407 Re: Pretrial Filings. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 230 Wesley Mayder's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 231 Motion for Sanctions.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 317 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents re 3rd and 5th Sets of Requests for Production. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting as Unopposed 293 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Motion for protective order is granted as unopposed and consistent with the parties' agreement described in defendants' Statement of Non-Opposition. 10/14/2008 motion hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 344 STIPULATION AND ORDER 338 For Further Limited Modification of Order Re: May 23, 2008 Case Management Conference Hearing. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 298 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Disclose "Highly Confidential Attorney's Eyes Only" Documents to its Experts. Motion hearing set for 9/9/2008 is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Whyte Granting 5 Plaintiff Verigy US, Inc.'s Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order Authorizing Expedited Discovery; Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verigy US, Inc. v. Mayder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verigy US, Inc.
Represented By: Melinda Mae Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romi Omar Mayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Mayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Test Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Test Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?