Amparan v. Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eneida Amparan
Defendant: Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv04498
Filed: August 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. All hearings and deadlines are VACATED. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 220 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Eneida Amparan, Guadalupe Cisneros, Rafael Cisneros. Motion Deadline 5/10/2013. Joint Case Mana gement Statement due by 5/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. This is the final continuance of the Case Management Conference. All parties shall be personally present at the conference scheduled for May 17, 2013, unless it is vacated in advance. Requests for telephonic appearance will not be considered. **4/19/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/16/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING STAY; SETTING DEADLINE FOR ADR REFERRAL. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Within 10 days of this order, the parties shall meet and confer in order to select a private mediator and shall file with this court the ADR form "Stipulation and Proposed Order Selecting ADR Process" indicating their sele ction. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement, they shall file the ADR form "Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference" within the same timeframe. *** 11/30/2012 CMC deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/28/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE RE WaMu Asset Acceptance Corp. and Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. ONLY. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), and upon consideration of the Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Eneida Amparan and Defendants Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. and WaMu Asset Acceptance Corp. (collectively, "WAMU"), all claims against WAMU in this action are hereby dismissed without prejudice, without co sts or attorney's fees as to any party, and with each party waiving any right to appeal. Motions terminated: 207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Eneida Amparan., WaMu Asset Acceptance Corp. and Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/1/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER STAYING CASE AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case is hereby STAYED until 8/31/2012, except that the parties shall respond to any outstanding discovery requests. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING 198 STIPULATION (Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) as to Countrywide Bank, FSB, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. ONLY (Correction of 200 Order). Countrywide Bank, FSB and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. terminated. Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/27/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: ADJOURNING CASE DEADLINES PENDING MEDIATION re 183 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/21/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING 171 JOINT STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 is CONTINUED to 12/17/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DENYING 141 MOTION TO TRANSFER; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 140 , 146 MOTIONS TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND OVERRULING 149 OBJECTIONS TO JOINDERS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/23/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT NINTH CIRCUIT DECISION (approving 159 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING 142 JOINT STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2009 is RESET for 1/29/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP., WAMU ASSET ACCEPTANCE CORP., AND PLAZA HOME MORTGAGE, INC. TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 135 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/1/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING 114 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/28/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 72 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 & 60 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/17/08. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER APPROVING re 61 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/15/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT PLAZA HOME MORTGAGE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, MOTION TO STRIKE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM NOVEMBER 7, 2008 TO DECEMBER 12, 2008 (granting docket no. 62 ). Motion hearing CONTINUED from 11/7/08 to 12/12/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/20/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SEPTEMBER 26, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 7, 2008, granting docket no. 55 . Further Case Management Conference is RESET for 11/7/2008 at 9:00 a.m. to be heard with motions. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/24/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 for Defendant's Time to File Responsive Pleading to Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/18/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING re 48 MOTION for leave by REBECCA TINGEY to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611003815.) filed by Eneida Amparan. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/28/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amparan v. Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eneida Amparan
Represented By: Ira Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?