Acticon Technologies LLC v. Pretec Electronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Acticon Technologies LLC
Defendant: Pretec Electronics Corporation, PTI Global, Inc., Chiu Feng Chen, Gordon Yu, Grace Yu, Kuei Lu and C-One Technology Corporation
Case Number: 5:2007cv04507
Filed: August 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL (approving 144 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 AMENDED JUDGMENT AGAINST C-ONE TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/28/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 JUDGMENT AGAINST C-ONE TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 108 of Dismissal of Defendants Tommy Ho and Robert Wu Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/15/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acticon Technologies LLC v. Pretec Electronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acticon Technologies LLC
Represented By: James William Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pretec Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Global, Inc.
Represented By: David John Sasseen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiu Feng Chen
Represented By: Richard C. J. Wahng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Yu
Represented By: Richard C. J. Wahng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Yu
Represented By: Richard C. J. Wahng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuei Lu
Represented By: Richard C. J. Wahng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-One Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?