Briggs v. City Of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Emily Briggs
Defendant: City Of San Jose, James Helmer, Stephanie Dueltgen and Diane Milowicki
Case Number: 5:2007cv04512
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re 67 Stipulation. ***OSC Deadlines terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010) Modified text on 7/14/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/19/2010 09:00 AM. Stipulated Dismissal due by 7/14/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/18/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. The Show Cause hearing is continued from 5/17/2010 to 6/21/2010 09:00 AM. Stipulated Dismissal or a Joint Statement due by 6/11/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/3/2010 09:00 AM. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 4/23/2010. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss this action. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE re 55 Statement. the Court finds that the caseshould be set on a parallel track with any settlement efforts by the parties. The Court finds that in light of the age of the case, no further delay is warranted. This is the final extension of the case schedule for this action. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS as follows: The 2/22/2010 status conference is VACATED. Close of Expert Discovery Discovery due by 4/16/2010. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 4/30/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Continuing Status Conference re 51 Stipulation. Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2010. Status Conference set for 2/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT. In light of Judge Trumbulls continuance, the Court finds good cause to continue the12/14 Conference to 1/25/2010 10:00 AM. On or before 1/18/2010, the parties shall file a Joint Statement updating the Court on the status of the parties' settlement efforts. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO VACATED PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE re 46 Stipulation. The Court VACATES all previously set pretrial and trial deadlines. Joint Status Conference Statement due 12/10/2009. If there is no settlement, the parties shall propose a trialschedule in their Joint Statement. Status Conference set for 12/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation re 28 Stipulation filed by City Of San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/7/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. City Of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Briggs
Represented By: Sidney C Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Represented By: Robert R. Fabela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Helmer
Represented By: Robert R. Fabela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Dueltgen
Represented By: Robert R. Fabela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Milowicki
Represented By: Robert R. Fabela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?