Juniel v. Felkner
Petitioner: Richard James Juniel, Jr.
Respondent: T. Felkner
Case Number: 5:2007cv04542
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/11/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/18/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Directing Petitioner to File Proof of Exhaustion or Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/23/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying as Moot 8 Motion to Deny and Dismiss Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time; Granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 10 Motion to Request the Record on Appeal After Judgment and Final Order; Denying 14 Motion to Stay. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juniel v. Felkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard James Juniel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. Felkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?