Concetti v. Impac Funding Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dominic Concetti
Defendant: Impac Funding Corporation, Universal Mortgage and Sales, Inc., Raymond Flores and Erik S. Gonzales
Case Number: 5:2007cv05410
Filed: October 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 (a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Dismissal of Universal Mortgage and Sales, Inc. and to Close Case re 59 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Universal Mortgage and Sales, Inc. and Universal Mortgage and Sales, Inc. terminated. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT FLORES FRCP 41(C)) re 54 Stipulation. Defendant Raymond Flores terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER VACATING CURRENT SCHEDULE; SETTING SUBSEQUENT INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 21, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-CLAIM OF CROSS-CLAIMANT IMPAC FUNDING CORPORATION DBA IMPAC LENDING GROUP AGAINST CROSS-DEFENDANT RAYMOND FLORES [FRCP 41(c)] re 50 Stipulation. Cross-Defendant Raymond Flores terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/30/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice of Complaint as to Defendant Impac Funding Corporation [FRCP 41(a)(1)] re 48 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER - JURY TRIAL: Close of All Discovery due by 12/31/2008. Interim Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2009 10:00 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2009 03:00 PM, Jury Selection set for 5/5/2009 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 5/6/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/20/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concetti v. Impac Funding Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Concetti
Represented By: Kerstin Arusha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impac Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Mortgage and Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik S. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?