Matthes v. County of Santa Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Carl Matthes
Defendant: County of Santa Cruz, Steve Robbins, Payne, Wilson and 10 Unknown Correctional Officers and Other Personnel at the Santa Cruz County Jail Employed by the Santa Cruz Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 5:2007cv05559
Filed: October 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF SANTA CRUZ, SHERIFF STEVE ROBBINS, LT. ROBERT PAYNE, LT. CRAIG WILSON re 33 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/8/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE FACT DISCOVERY, DISCLOSE EXPERTS AND COMPLETE EXPERT DISCOVERY (approving 31 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/1/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 10/17/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/11/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthes v. County of Santa Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Matthes
Represented By: Kate Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Unknown Correctional Officers and Other Personnel at the Santa Cruz County Jail Employed by the Santa Cruz Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?