Me-Wuk Indian Community of the Wilton Rancheria et al v. Kempthorne et al
Plaintiff: Me-Wuk Indian Community of the Wilton Rancheria
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne, Carl J. Artman, United States Department of Interior, Michael O. Leavitt and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Intervenor_dft: County of Sacramento, California and City of Elk Grove
Case Number: 5:2007cv05706
Filed: January 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING 105 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/17/2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/15/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/9/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving docket no. 25 ). Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/13/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2008 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/17/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING re 23 Substitution of Counsel filed by Me-Wuk Indian Community of the Wilton Rancheria. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/2/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Me-Wuk Indian Community of the Wilton Rancheria et al v. Kempthorne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Me-Wuk Indian Community of the Wilton Rancheria
Represented By: Little Fawn Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Represented By: Sara E. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl J. Artman
Represented By: Sara E. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Sara E. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O. Leavitt
Represented By: Sara E. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Sara E. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: County of Sacramento, California
Represented By: Michele Elizabeth Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: City of Elk Grove
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?