Securities and Exchange Commission v. Jasper
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Carl W. Jasper
Case Number: 5:2007cv06122
Filed: December 4, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER Sustaining 346 Objection filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Accordingly, the Court SUSTAINS the SEC's Objection and ORDERS that on or before January 14, 2011, Defendant shall lodge with the Court evidence of a revised deed of trust for the full value of his home. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 7, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified text on 1/7/2011 (x2)(ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER re 332 granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion for a Stay. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 21, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Deadline to File re 253 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER SETTING POST-TRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 31, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - JURY TRIAL. On or before March 26, 2010, the parties shall lodge with the Court all Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B) expert witness reports. Once the reports have been lodged, the Court will address the appropriate scope of the testimony of each expert witness that is in contention. (2) On or before March 31, 2010, the parties shall complete their deposition of witness James Long. The deposition shall be videotaped. (3) On or before March 31, 2010, the parties shall file a list of the exhibits they intend to use and a list of witnesses they intend to call at trial. (4) The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request in part to extend the trial schedule. The Court adds two additional sessions for evidence presentation to the current trial schedule. Jury Selection set for 4/6/010 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 4/6/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further trial specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/23/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 70 defendant's Motion to Compel Documents. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING re 98 Stipulation. The hearing remains as scheduled for 12/14/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL): The Court VACATES the 10/19/2009 Conference. The Court further orders as follows: Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, In Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 2/22/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2010 11:00 AM, Jury Selection set for 4/6/2010 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 4/7/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further trial specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009) Modified docket re time for trial on 10/16/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO MODIFY DISCOVERY PLAN re 62 Stipulation. The last day to file motions regarding objections to experts anddispositive motions shall be 11/5/2009, and the hearing for both dispositive motions and objections t o experts shall be 12/14/2009 at 9 a.m. Any other deadline calculated from, or which depends upon, the occurrence of any event listed above shall be calculated using these agreed-upon dates, pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REGARDING DISCOVERY PLAN; CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 59 Stipulation. Close of ALL Discovery due by 10/15/2009. The last day for hearing motions regarding objections to e xperts and any dispositive motions is set for 11/9/2009 09:00 AM. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 10/9/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 40 plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING SECOND INTERIM CONFERENCE re 46 Status Report. Joint Status Statement due 6/19/2009. Second Interim Status Conference set for 6/29/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED DISCOVERY PLAN re 38 Stipulation filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The Case Management Conference on 11/17/2008 is VACATED. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 3/6/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/ 16/2009 10:00 AM.If, after meeting and conferring,the parties are unable to reach agreement that the deposition may go forward, the party wishing to take the deposition may seek from the Court(Magistrate Judge Lloyd) to take the deposition. Th e parties shall comply with the terms and procedures as agreed to in their Stipulated Discovery Plan: Close of All Discovery Discovery due by 8/24/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions by 10/26/2009. Joint Pretrial Conference statement due 7/10/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Stipulated Discovery Plan for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/13/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008) Modified on 2/4/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Jasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Marc J. Fagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl W. Jasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?