Vesta Strategies, LLC v. Estupinian et al
Plaintiff: Vesta Strategies, LLC
Defendant: Robert E. Estupinian, Ginny Estupinian, Mutual Vision, LLC,, Millennium Realty Group, Vesta Reverse 100,LLC, Vesta Capital Advisors, LLC and Carol-Ann Tognazzini
Case Number: 5:2007cv06216
Filed: December 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman denying 199 Motion to Relate Case. (blflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 17, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 189 Motion to Relate Case (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON COUNTER-CLAIMANT AND THIRD PARTY CLAIMANTS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 177 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AND PROVE-UP HEARING ON DAMAGES. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 177 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AND PROVE-UP HEARING ON DAMAGES.The Claimants shall serve a copy of this Order on the defaulting party and file a certificate of service on or before 5/29/2009. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint; Reinstating Default; Setting Hearing. Signed by Judge James Ware on April 8, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 159 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CLARIFYING THE COURT'S DECEMBER 18 ORDER; SCHEDULING HEARING FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 152 Order, 154 Stipulation. The Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2009 is VACATED. The parties are order ed to comply with the clarification as stated in this order. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2009 09:00 AM, Joint Case Management Conference statement due 2/27/2009, Further Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009) Modified docket text on 1/7/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 111 Motion to Set Aside ; granting 117 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 123 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying 135 Motion for Default Judgment (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION AND ORDER as Modified by the Court Continuing Hearing on Motions to Set Aside Default Judgment and Motion to to Set Aside Entry of Dismissal; Motions for Default Judgment from 11/24/2008 to 12/1/2008 re 131 Stipulation, 107 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by John Terzakis, Vesta Strategies, LLC. Defendants' Opposition due 11/14/2008, Plaintiff's Reply due 11/17/2008, Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for furthere specifics. Motions terminated: 107 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by John Terzakis, Vesta Strategies, LLC.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/7/2008. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vesta Strategies, LLC v. Estupinian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vesta Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Aron J. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Estupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginny Estupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Vision, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Realty Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta Reverse 100,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta Capital Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol-Ann Tognazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?