Perez v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sandra Perez
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
3rd Party Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Cross-claimant: Countrywide Home Loans
Cross-defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2007cv06402
Filed: December 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Complaint and First Amended Cross-Complaint with Prejudic re 47 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER as Moot re 41 Stipulation. Please see 44 Order to Show Cause re Settlement. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Status Response due by 6/12/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/22/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Status Response due by 6/12/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/22/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 34 Pretrial Conference Statement. Close of All Discovery due by 5/1/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions by 6/29/2009. Joint Pretrial Statement due 5/27/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Perez
Represented By: Kimberly Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael McKown, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-claimant: Countrywide Home Loans
Represented By: Aaron Michael McKown, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?