Portillo et al v. Sarneveslit
Plaintiff: Adel Portillo and Ediel Lopez
Defendant: Nader Sarneveslit
Case Number: 5:2008cv00190
Filed: January 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 46 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 35 defendants' Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) motion to dismiss without prejudice; granting 37 defendants' Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss with leave to amend; denying 44 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file additional briefing. Motion hearing set for 2/17/2009 is vacated. Plaintiffs' amended complaint due within 10 days from the date of this order. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document within 10 days. Case management conference set for 1/27/09. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Plaintiffs' Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Appear. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/21/2008 01:30 PM. Case management conference continued to 10/21/2008, 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/14/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Vacating Scheduling Order re 18 Scheduling Order; Referring Case for Reassignment to a Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Parties' Content. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/11/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portillo et al v. Sarneveslit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adel Portillo
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ediel Lopez
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nader Sarneveslit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?