Davis v. Eastfield Ming Quong, Inc
Plaintiff: Brenda Davis
Defendant: Eastfield Ming Quong, Inc
Case Number: 5:2008cv00769
Filed: February 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 37 Motion to Strike. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/10/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER 32 to Continue Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER 23 Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/15/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Eastfield Ming Quong, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Davis
Represented By: Michael M. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastfield Ming Quong, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?