White v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cleophas White
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv00843
Filed: February 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/13/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/9/2009. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/23/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF CLEOPHAS WHITE'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 1, 2008. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/31/2008 10:30 AM. Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2008. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/18/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleophas White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?