Spears et al v. Washington Mutual, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Felton A Spears, Jr. and Sidney Scholl
Defendant: Washington Mutual, Inc., First American Eappraiseit and Lender Service, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv00868
Filed: February 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 596 Motion for Settlement; FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OFDISMISSAL (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER DENYING 564 MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 12/8/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER to meet and confer and file updated time estimate by October 15, 2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on October 6, 2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER re 451 Letter filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 10/2/2014. (rmwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 383 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 386 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 387 Motion Decertify; granting in part and denying in part 388 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 392 Motion to Bifurcate (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER re: sealing motions 385 389 390 402 406 409 410 416 . Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 9/10/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 425 STIPULATED ORDER 414 Providing for Production of Documents From FDIC v. Corelogic Valuation Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/20/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER Requesting Response re 381 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Response due 7/11/2014.. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 7/7/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 362 Non-Party JPMorgan Chase Bank's Motion for Clarification. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 380 STIPULATION AND ORDER 378 Extending Certain Pre-Trial Dates. Expert Discovery cutoff 9/5/2014; Mediation to be Completed by 9/25/2014; Dispositive Motion Hearing cutoff 8/22/2014. [Dkt. Nos. 376, 377 are termed as moot]. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/18/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 375 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 9. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 370 INTERIM ORDER re 362 JPMorgan Chase Bank's motion for clarification of discovery order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/19/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 STIPULATION AND ORDER 364 Extending the Deadline for Plaintiffs to Respond to Nonparty JP Morgan Chase's Motion for Clarification of Order Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 8 and Scheduling Hearing Date for February 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 353 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 8. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 344 Dicovery Dispute Joint Report No. 4. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/6/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 339 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 3. Plaintiffs' request for extended deposition is granted. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER 329 on Stipulation for the Production of Documennts Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/30/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 302 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. EA's requests granted in part and denied in part. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 283 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 286 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 STIPULATION AND ORDER 299 (1) Extending the Number of Depositions per Side to 25; and (2) Extending the Remaining Deadlines in the Action by Four Months. Jury Trial set for 10/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronal d M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/27/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 288 Motion for Order Shortening Time. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 REVISED AMENDED ORDER 259 Regarding Class Notice, Appointment of Lead Counsel, and Pre-Trial Scheduling: Jury Trial set for 6/23/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/1/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION AND ORDER 250 Continuing Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2012. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/15/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 217 Motion for Class Certification and Setting Case Management Conference.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 STIPULATION AND ORDER 225 Continuing Briefing Schedule: Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/22/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STIPULATION AND ORDER 215 Setting Briefing Schedule: Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/15/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying without prejudice 189 , 197 Motion to Certify Class. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION AND ORDER 207 Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/30/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 188 Motion to Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER re 188 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Whyte on 5/13/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND Case Management ORDER 184 . Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/9/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 178 motion for certification of interlocutory appeal and for a stay. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 176 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/2/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 *** E-FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE ENTRY *** ORDER continuing hearing on 24 motion for entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/20/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (jg, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 150 Motion to Intervene; granting 155 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Dismiss; denying 157 Motion to Strike. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER 154 Re: Briefing Schedule and Adjournment of Hearing Date for Motion to Intervene. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/7/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 97 without prejudice plaintiff's motion for jurisdictional discovery. Motion hearing set for 3/10/2009 is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER 125 to Substitute the FDIC, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank, as Real Party in Interest. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER 126 to Stay Proceedings. Case is Stayed for 90 Days. Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2009 10:30 AM. Motion Hearing on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss Plaitniff's First Amended Complaint set for 2/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/18/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER staying briefing and continuing hearing date on 97 plaintiffs' motion for jurisdictional discovery. Motion hearing continued to 12/16/2008, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/21/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER 121 to Continue Motion Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2008 10:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/15/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears et al v. Washington Mutual, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felton A Spears, Jr.
Represented By: Ira Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Scholl
Represented By: Ira Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Eappraiseit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lender Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?