Acer, Inc. et al v. Technology Properties Limited et al
Plaintiff: Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Acer America Corporation and Barco N.V.
Defendant: Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited and Technology Properties Limited
Petitioner: Non Party Texas Instruments Incorporated and LSI Corporation
Special Master: Thomas HR Denver
Interested Party: HTC America, Inc. and HTC Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Kwan Chan
Case Number: 5:2008cv00877
Filed: February 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2014 Filing 586 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 30, 2012, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number (408) 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2014. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
September 20, 2013 Filing 585 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 575 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Expert Report of Dr. Stephen D. Prowse) by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 584 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 577 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Exhibit 1 to Vinh Pham Declaration ISO of Defendants' Opposition to Acer's Motion for Summary Judgment for Noninfrigement of U.S. Patent '890) by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 583 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 577 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Exhibit M to the Omnibus Declaration of Irvin Tyan ISO of Defendants' Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment) by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Tyan, Irvin) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 582 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 576 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Exhibit A tothe Declaration of Mac Leckrone ISO of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Prowse) by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 581 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 576 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Exhibits 5, 6, and 21 to the Declaration of David Lansky ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Prowse) by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 21)(Lansky, David) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 580 Declaration of PHILIP W. MARSH in Support of #578 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS COMBINED OPPOSITIONS TO NON-PARTY TEXAS INSTRUMENTS MOTIONS TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENA filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #578 ) (Marsh, Philip) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 579 STIPULATION Stipulated Dismissal filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 578 RESPONSE (re #567 MOTION to Quash NON-PARTY TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATEDS MOTION TO QUASH THE TRIAL SUBPOENA SERVED BY DEFENDANTS ) DEFENDANTS COMBINED OPPOSITIONS TO NON-PARTY TEXAS INSTRUMENTS MOTIONS TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENA filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF IRVIN E. TYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS COMBINED OPPOSITIONS TO NON-PARTY TEXAS INSTRUMENTS MOTIONS TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENA, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Tyan, Irvin) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER GRANTING #536 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER GRANTING #532 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER GRANTING #569 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #571 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The briefing and hearing has been set in Docket No. 572. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 12, 2013 Filing 573 EXHIBITS re #569 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Expert Report of Stephen D. Prowse (Redacted version of Expert Report of Dr. Stephen D. Prowse) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #569 ) (Lansky, David) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 572 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTIONS AND COURT MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, Re ( #567 and #570 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) and ( #565 and #570 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG): The court modifies the briefing schedule as follows: Opposition by 9/17/2013. No reply will be considered. Motions are rescheduled for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 571 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #570 MOTION to Quash THE SECOND TRIAL SUBPOENA SERVED BY DEFENDANTS STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME AND EXPEDITING BRIEFING SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO CIV. L. R. 6-2 filed by Texas Instruments Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anupam Sharma, #2 Proposed Order)(Sharma, Anupam) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 570 MOTION to Quash THE SECOND TRIAL SUBPOENA SERVED BY DEFENDANTS filed by Texas Instruments Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/13/2013. Replies due by 9/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Vollbrecht, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Proposed Order)(Sharma, Anupam) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 569 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Expert Report of Stephen D. Prowse filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Lansky, #2 Declaration of Harold H. Davis, #3 Declaration of Kyle D. Chen, #4 Proposed Order)(Lansky, David) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 568 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/13/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2013. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 567 MOTION to Quash NON-PARTY TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATEDS MOTION TO QUASH THE TRIAL SUBPOENA SERVED BY DEFENDANTS filed by Texas Instruments Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/20/2013. Replies due by 9/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan Davis, #2 Declaration of Sarah Vollbrecht, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed Order)(Sharma, Anupam) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 566 EXHIBITS re #478 Declaration in Opposition, (EXHIBITS I, J, K, L, AND R TO IRVIN TYAN DECLARATION) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) #478 ) (Tyan, Irvin) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 565 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by James Carl Otteson NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TECHNOLOGY PROPERTIES LIMITED AND ALLIACENSE LIMITED (Otteson, James) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 564 OBJECTIONS to re #563 Notice (Other), DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Phillips, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 563 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS TO APPENDIX F OF THE JOINT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT [DKT. NO. 507] (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 562 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine held 8/29/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Any evidentiary issues to be addressed mornings before trial. Jury instructions deferred until charging conference. The court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR: (2:01 to 4:21) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 561 Exhibit List Defendants' Revised Trial Exhibit List by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited.. (Phillips, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 560 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Phillips, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 559 OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS ON DEFENDANTS TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 558 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Deposition Counter Designations by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 557 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Deposition Counter Designations by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 556 Minute Entry: Telephonic Status Conference held. Liability expert Andy Wolfe unable to attend upcoming trial. Within a week, counsel is to update the court as to how they would like to proceed with trial in light of Mr. Wolfe's unavailability. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:36 to 4:45.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 555 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 4:30 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 554 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF EXHIBIT F TO ACER/GATEWAYS #449 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT [DKT. NO. #449 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/27/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2013 Filing 553 OBJECTIONS to re #527 Proposed Form of Verdict PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS REVISED [PROPOSED] FORM OF VERDICT by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 552 NOTICE of Appearance by Vinh Huy Pham ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS TECHNOLOGY PROPERTIES LIMITED AND ALLIACENSE LIMITED (Pham, Vinh) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 551 EXHIBITS 4 re #454 REDACTION - MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,530,890 EXHIBITS 4, 5 AND 8 TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY P. WALKER IN SUPPORT thereof filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #454 ) (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/27/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2013 Filing 550 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #515 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, EXHIBIT 5 TO DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. RATINOFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 549 EXHIBITS 7 re #508 MOTION in Limine to EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. STEPHEN PROWSE (DAUBERT MOTION) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #508 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/27/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2013 Filing 548 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #515 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, EXHIBITS 1 AND 5 TO DECLARATION OF HAROLD H. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. STEPHEN PROWSE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 547 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #515 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT 5,530,890 by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 546 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #515 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,809,336 by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 545 EXHIBITS 3 re #455 REDACTED - MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,809,336 EXHIBITS 3-5 AND 8 TO DECLARATION OF HAROLD H. DAVIS, JR. IN SUPPORT thereof filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #455 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/27/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2013 Filing 544 NOTICE of Appearance by Jedediah Phillips ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS TECHNOLOGY PROPERTIES LIMITED AND ALLIACENSE LIMITED (Phillips, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 543 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #515 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON INFRINGEMENT 5,809,336 AND EXHIBIT 7 by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 542 NOTICE of Appearance by Irvin E. Tyan ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS TECHNOLOGY PROPERTIES LIMITED AND ALLIACENSE LIMITED (Tyan, Irvin) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 541 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #515 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONSUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,530,890 & EXHIBIT 7 HERETO by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 540 EXHIBITS 11 re #452 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ON THE APPROPRIATE DAMAGES PERIOD AND MARKING EXHIBITS 11-13 TO DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. RATINOFF IN SUPPORT filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) #452 ) (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/27/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2013 Filing 539 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 489 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, PRODUCT REPORTS by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 538 EXHIBITS 18 re #467 Declaration in Opposition TO DEFENDANTS CONFIDENTIAL MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) #467 ) (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/27/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2013 Filing 537 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 490 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, EXHIBITS 7, 9-14, 17, 19 AND 24 TO DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. RATINOFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CONFIDENTIAL MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 24)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 536 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Containing LSI Confidential Information filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lansky, David) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 535 RESPONSE (re #501 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF ENTIRE MARKET VALUE, SIZE, WEALTH, OR OVERALL REVENUES OF PLAINTIFFS ) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Exhibit 1)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 534 DECLARATION of David Lansky in Opposition to #533 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 7, #2 Exhibit 8 - 12, #3 Exhibit 13 - 19, #4 Exhibit 20 - 25, #5 Exhibit 26 - 32, #6 Exhibit 33 - 39)(Related document(s) #533 ) (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Filing 533 RESPONSE (re #532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS FILED IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. STEPHEN PROWSE, #508 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. STEPHEN PROWSE (DAUBERT MOTION) ) filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mac Leckrone)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Filing 532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS FILED IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. STEPHEN PROWSE filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF DAVID LANSKY IN SUPPORT thereof #2 Proposed Order)(Lansky, David) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Filing 531 OBJECTIONS to re #500 Proposed Form of Verdict, #506 Proposed Voir Dire DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO ACER'S VOIR DIRE AND VERDICT FORMS by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 530 RESPONSE (re #498 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude the Introduction of Evidence of Settlement Negotiations ) filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Otteson Declaration)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Filing 529 RESPONSE (re #504 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF DR. OKLOBDZIJAS TESTIMONY RE: SUBJECTS NOT DISCLOSED IN HIS EXPERT REPORT filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF VINH H. PHAM IN SUPPORT thereof #2 Exhibit 1 TO DECLARATION OF VINH H. PHAM IN SUPPORT thereof #3 Exhibit 2 TO DECLARATION OF VINH H. PHAM IN SUPPORT thereof)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Filing 528 RESPONSE (re #496 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Use of Derogatory Characterizations of Patent Holders ) Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defs' Motion In Limine No. 3 filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Kyle) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 527 REVISED Proposed Form of Verdict by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Filing 526 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Submission of Counter Designations and Objections to Plaintiff Acer's Use of Deposition Excerpts and Designated Discovery Responses by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 525 RESPONSE (re #503 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE LATE-PRODUCED DAMAGES DOCUMENTS AND RELATED TESTIMONY BASE THEREON filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Exhibit A to Otteson Declaration)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Filing 524 OBJECTIONS to Defendants Deposition Designations by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 523 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc. NOTICE PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. 282 (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 522 OBJECTIONS to re #499 Proposed Form of Verdict by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 521 RESPONSE (re #495 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE MR. RUSSELL H. FISHS TESTIMONY ) Plaintiffs Joint Opposition filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 520 RESPONSE (re #494 MOTION in Limine No. 1 by Regarding Prior Litigations ) Plaintiffs Joint Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine No. 1 filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ratinoff Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Ratinoff Decl.)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 519 Proposed Voir Dire by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Alliacense Limited, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited -Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questions. (Chen, Kyle) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 518 Proposed Jury Instructions by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc. JOINT. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 517 RESPONSE (re #510 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF HEARSAY ARTICLE 25 MICROCHIPS THAT SHOOK THE WORLD ) DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO ACERS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF ARTICLE 25 MICROCHIPS THAT SHOOK THE WORLD filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 516 RESPONSE (re #505 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY RE: DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS ) (Non-Opposition) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER GRANTING JOINT OMNIBUS MOTION REGARDING OUTSTANDING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (513) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying as moot (474), (487), and (493) in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; granting (508) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying as moot (460), (465), and (468) in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Motions terminated: #487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Gateway, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., #474 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, #493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by LSI Corporation. pursuant to [515[ ORDER. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 514 FINAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal #356 #357 #358 #374 in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; regarding #385 Motion for Reconsideration; #387 #388 #403 in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Omnibus Motion Regarding Outstanding Motions to Seal filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Chen, #2 Declaration of B. Damstedt, #3 Declaration of D. Lansky, #4 Declaration of A.Dominguez, #5 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 511 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Acer America Corporation for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Haycock, Jason) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 510 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF HEARSAY ARTICLE 25 MICROCHIPS THAT SHOOK THE WORLD filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/22/2013. Replies due by 8/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1_1, #3 Exhibit 1_2, #4 Exhibit 1_3, #5 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 509 TRIAL BRIEF PLAINTIFFS ACER, ACER AMERICA, AND GATEWAY'S TRIAL BRIEF by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 508 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. STEPHEN PROWSE (DAUBERT MOTION) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/29/2013. Replies due by 9/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Harold Davis, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 507 JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Appendix I, #10 Appendix J, #11 Appendix K) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/15/2013) Modified on 8/16/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2013 Filing 506 Proposed Voir Dire by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. . (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 505 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY RE: DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/29/2013. Replies due by 9/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 504 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF DR. OKLOBDZIJAS TESTIMONY RE: SUBJECTS NOT DISCLOSED IN HIS EXPERT REPORT filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/29/2013. Replies due by 9/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 503 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE LATE-PRODUCED DAMAGES DOCUMENTS AND RELATED TESTIMONY BASE THEREON filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/29/2013. Replies due by 9/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff ISO Plaintiffs' MILs, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Email exchange re TPL-NDH docs, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2008-11-21 TPL's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures1, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2010 Email Chain re TPL's responses to Acer's RFPs, #5 Exhibit 4 - TPL Responses to First Set of RFPs (January 12 2012), #6 Exhibit 5 - Exh 25 to Prowse depo - Lodged Under Seal, #7 Proposed Order)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 502 TRIAL BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 501 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF ENTIRE MARKET VALUE, SIZE, WEALTH, OR OVERALL REVENUES OF PLAINTIFFS filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/29/2013. Replies due by 9/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 500 Proposed Form of Verdict by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. Plaintiffs [Proposed] Form of Verdict. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 499 Proposed Form of Verdict by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited Defendants' [Proposed] Form of Verdict. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 498 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude the Introduction of Evidence of Settlement Negotiations filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/22/2013. Replies due by 8/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 497 Proposed Voir Dire by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited Defendants' [Proposed] Special Voir Dire Questions. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 496 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Use of Derogatory Characterizations of Patent Holders filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/22/2013. Replies due by 8/29/2013. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 495 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE MR. RUSSELL H. FISHS TESTIMONY filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/22/2013. Replies due by 8/29/2013. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 494 MOTION in Limine No. 1 by Regarding Prior Litigations filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/22/2013. Replies due by 8/29/2013. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 512 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #444 , #449 , #452 , #454 , #455 and #491 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG and #453 , #457 , #458 and #482 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG: Parties to submit joint submission re: sealing requests for the court's review within one week. Court to issue order after hearing. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal of Third-Party for Clarification of Order filed by LSI Corporation. (Ongaro, David) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 492 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON AUGUST 13, 2013 MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND HEARING RE SEALING MOTIONS (In Re: Docket Nos. #444 , #449 , #452 , #454 , #455 and #491 ): 8/13/2013 10:00 AM Motions are reset to 1:30 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 7, 2013 Set Hearing re (482 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG) Order: Hearing re: Sealing Motions set for 8/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE: SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 7, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER GRANTING #465 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The order is granted as to Doc. 467 Exs. 7, 9-14, 17, 19 and 24. As to each of the remaining documents addressed in the motion, because the designating party did not address the document in its declaration, the document or proposed filing will be made part of the public record. See Civ. L. R. 79-(d). The moving party shall proceed consistent with Civ. L. R. 79-5(e). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART #456 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The order is granted as to Doc. 452 Ex. 14. As to each of the remaining documents addressed in the motion, because the designating party did not address the document in its declaration, or did not file any timely responsive declaration at all, the document or proposed filing will be made part of the public record. See Civ. L. R. 79-(d). The moving party shall proceed consistent with Civ. L. R. 79-5(e). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 1, 2013 Filing 488 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. re #483 Reply to Opposition/Response NOTICE OF ERRATA (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 486 REPLY (re #454 REDACTION - MOTION for Summary Judgment [PUBLIC VERSION] OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,530,890 ) filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 485 REPLY (re #455 REDACTED - MOTION for Summary Judgment [PUBLIC VERSION] OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,809,336 ) [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 484 REPLY (re #452 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ON THE APPROPRIATE DAMAGES PERIOD AND MARKING ) [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 483 REPLY (re #449 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT ) filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 482 Declaration of David Lansky in Support of #465 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #465 ) (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 481 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas T. Carmack Notice of Appearance of David Lansky on behalf of Defendants Technology Properties Limited and Alliacense Limited (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 480 REPLY (re #465 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CONFIDENTIAL MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST ACER FOR DISCOVERY ABUSES filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 479 DECLARATION of Philip W. Marsh in Opposition to #477 Opposition/Response to Motion, #475 Opposition/Response to Motion, (PUBLIC VERSION) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of V. Oklobdzija (PUBLIC VERSION))(Related document(s) #477 , #475 ) (Marsh, Philip) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 478 DECLARATION of Irvin Tyan in Opposition to #477 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit P, #10 Exhibit I-O and Q-R slip sheet (PUBLIC VERSIONS))(Related document(s) #477 ) (Tyan, Irvin) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 477 RESPONSE (re #455 REDACTED - MOTION for Summary Judgment [PUBLIC VERSION] OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,809,336 ) (PUBLIC VERSION) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 476 RESPONSE (re #449 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT ) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jed Phillips (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B - I slip sheets)(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 475 RESPONSE (re #454 REDACTION - MOTION for Summary Judgment [PUBLIC VERSION] OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,530,890 ) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinh Pham (PUBLIC VERSION))(Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 474 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Declarations filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phillip W. Marsh, #2 Proposed Order)(Marsh, Philip) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 473 RESPONSE (re #452 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ON THE APPROPRIATE DAMAGES PERIOD AND MARKING ) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Appropriate Damages Period and Marking filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clifford Flowers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 472 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. NOTICE OF ERRATA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 471 RESPONSE (re #465 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CONFIDENTIAL MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY REBECCA M. CROCKER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #462 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRIAN J. ARNOLD PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #461 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL J. ABERNATHY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #460 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 467 DECLARATION in Opposition to #458 DEFENDANTS CONFIDENTIAL MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) #466 ) (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/23/2013) Modified on 7/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2013 Filing 466 RESPONSE (re #458 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST ACER FOR DISCOVERY ABUSES filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Jas Dhillon, #3 Declaration of William Brinkerhoff, #4 Declaration of Clarence Worthington, #5 Declaration of Harold Davis, #6 Declaration of Michael Bettinger, #7 Errata 1)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2013) Modified on 7/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2013 Filing 465 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Haycock, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 464 Declaration of Thomas T. Carmack in Support of #456 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Declaration in Support of Acer's Motion to File Under Seal) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #456 ) (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 463 Declaration of Adrienne E. Dominguez 1.Declaration of Adrienne E. Dominguez in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Filed by Plaintiffs Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc. and Gateway, Inc. filed byLSI Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order 2.Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Ongaro, David) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 462 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7867797.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crocker, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 461 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7867584.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Arnold, Brian) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 22, 2013 Filing 460 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7865720.) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Abernathy, Michael) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER re: #453 STIPULATION REGARDING PATENTS NO LONGER ASSERTED by Judge Paul S. Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 458 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 451 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Confidential Motion for Sanctions Against Acer for Discovery Abuses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip W. Marsh in Support thereof #2 Declaration of Thomas T. Carmack in Support thereof #3 Declaration of John Downing in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against Acer for Discovery Abuses, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Confidential Motion for Sanctions Against Acer for Discovery Abuses)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 7/17/2013) Modified on 7/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2013 Filing 457 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kyle Dakai Chen - Withdrawal of Kyle D. Chen and Mark R. Weinstein (Chen, Kyle) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 456 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 7/16/2013) Modified text on 7/17/2013, *** (proposed order NOT attached to its electronically filed document (e.g., stipulation and motions.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2013 Filing 455 REDACTED - MOTION for Summary Judgment [PUBLIC VERSION] OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,809,336 filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/30/2013. Replies due by 8/6/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harold Davis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2013) Modified on 7/17/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2013 Filing 454 REDACTED - MOTION for Summary Judgment [PUBLIC VERSION] OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,530,890 filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/30/2013. Replies due by 8/6/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Walker, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2013) Modified on 7/17/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2013 Filing 453 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION REGARDING PATENTS NO LONGER ASSERTED filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 452 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ON THE APPROPRIATE DAMAGES PERIOD AND MARKING filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/30/2013. Replies due by 8/6/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Ratinoff, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER GRANTING #444 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 16, 2013 Filing 450 Declaration of Clarence Worthington in Support of #444 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Confidential Motion for Sanctions Against Acer for Discovery Abuses; Declarations in Support Thereof and Exhibits Thereto filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #444 ) (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 449 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/30/2013. Replies due by 8/6/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Haycock, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7please see #554 Exhibit F NMF, #8 Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2013) Modified on 8/27/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2013 Filing 448 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Nathaniel Haycock (Haycock, Jason) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER GRANTING #446 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 11, 2013 Filing 446 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify the Dispositive Motion Briefing Deadlines filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 445 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' CONFIDENTIAL MOTION FOR SANCTIONS: Motion for Sanctions Hearing (In Re: Docket No. #444 ) set for 8/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 444 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Confidential Motion for Sanctions Against Acer for Discovery Abuses; Declarations in Support Thereof and Exhibits Thereto filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2013 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Bettinger (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (441) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; granting (451) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 3, 2013 Filing 441 Joint MOTION to Continue Under Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 to Modify the Case Schedule with Regards to Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 2, 2013 Filing 440 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING SEPTEMBER 10, 2013 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: 9/10/2013 Pretrial Conference advanced to 8/29/2013 at 2:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 439 Letter Dated March 14, 2013 Pursuant to Order (Docket No. #434 ) Unredacted Version (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - part 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment A - part 2, #3 Exhibit Attachment A - part 3)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (437) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; granting (448) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 437 Joint MOTION to Continue Under Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 to Modify the Case Schedule filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 436 Letter Dated March 13, 2013 Pursuant to Order Docket Nos. #434 and 445 Unredacted Version (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2013 Filing 435 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL: Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER RE LIFT OF AUTOMATIC STAY AND SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (416) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (417) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 433 Letter from Acer and Gateway RE EFFECT OF AUTOMATIC STAY. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 432 Letter from James C. Otteson to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re Effect of Automatic Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 431 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #432 . *** Letter from James C. Otteson to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re Effect of Automatic Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 3/29/2013) Modified on 4/1/2013 (fff, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER INVITING BRIEFING RE EFFECT OF AUTOMATIC STAY re (441 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Technology Properties Limited, (427 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) Amended Document filed by Technology Properties Limited, (428 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Technology Properties Limited, (425 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Technology Properties Limited, (440 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG) Amended Document filed by Technology Properties Limited, (438 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Technology Properties Limited. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 27, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 429 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Acer America Corporation from Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 428 NOTICE by Technology Properties Limited Notice Clarifying Prior Notice of Filing of Chapter 11 Proceeding and Notice of Automatic Stay of Actions (Otteson, James) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 427 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Technology Properties Limited. Amendment to #425 Notice (Other) RE: Amended and Superceded Notice of Filing of Chapter 11 Proceeding and Notice of Automatic Stay of Actions. (Penhallegon, Ryan) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER RE: STATUS UPDATES (425 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) and (438 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG): Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362, both of the cases in this court are automatically stayed pending resolution of the bankruptcy case. The parties shall submit to the court every 90 days joint letter briefs with updates about the status of the bankruptcy case. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/21/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 425 NOTICE by Technology Properties Limited re: Notice of Filing of Chapter 11 Proceeding and Notice of Automatic Stay of Actions (Penhallegon, Ryan) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 424 Emergency MOTION Modify Case Schedule; Memorandum of Points and Authorities re 414 filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2013 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/7/2013. Replies due by 2/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Declaration of Thomas T. Carmack, #3 Declaration of Philip W. Marsh, #4 Declaration of John Downing, #5 (Proposed) Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Text modified on 3/21/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2013 Filing 423 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/19/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2013. (Related documents(s) #422 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Technology Properties Limited from Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 421 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #409 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Modified on 3/21/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2013 Filing 420 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #409 by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Modified on 3/21/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2013 Filing 419 Minute Entry: Status Conference held. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 418 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE (In Re: Docket Nos. 414 , #416 and #417 ) in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG: Status Conference set for 3/19/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 417 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Confidential March 14, 2013 Letter Response To Defendants Unsolicited March 13, 2013 Letter And Exhibits filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Confidential March 13, 2013 Letter to Judge Grewal) filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 11, 2013 Filing 415 Letter to Judge Grewal pursuant to the Court's March 7,2013 Order from Acer (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 3/11/2013) Modified on 3/12/2013 tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER GRANTING #410 MOTION TO CONTINUE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The deadline for all fact discovery is extended to March 29, 2013. The court notes from TPL's papers that it appears that, without seeking any relief from the court, Acer did not comply with the court's February 8, 2013 order to complete its production of board level schematics, block diagrams and the rest no later than February 15, 2013. The court further notes that Acer's response does not appear to refute TPL's assertion. So that the court can fully appreciate Acer's compliance vel non with the February 8, 2013, Acer shall file a letter on the docket explaining its actions. Acer shall file its letter no later than March 11, 2013 at 5PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 6, 2013 Filing 413 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/08/2013, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2013. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 412 DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Continue Discovery Cut-Off ( #411 ) filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 9, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 10 - 32)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 411 OPPOSITION TO #410 MOTION to Continue MOTION UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULES 6-3 AND 7-11 TO EXTEND THE FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF ) in Opposition filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/5/2013) Modified Docket Text on 3/6/2013 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2013 Filing 410 MOTION to Continue MOTION UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULES 6-3 AND 7-11 TO EXTEND THE FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (359) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (364) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (366) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (398) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; granting (386) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (392) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (395) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (424) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MODIFIED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/12/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #402 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 8, 2013 Filing 407 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re (394 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE A 30(B)(6) WITNESS FOR CERTAIN TOPICS and (402 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendants' Emergency Motion to Modify Case Schedule Due to Acer's Discovery Abuses and (426 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG): Parties have reached agreement as to plaintiffs motion to compel, withdrawal of motion on file. Acer to complete production of documents discussed in court by 2/15/2013 at 5:00 p.m. Court is open to entertain a motion for sanctions from Technology Properties Limited. Court to issue revised trial schedule. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 405 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 2/8/2013 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 404 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS ACER INC., ACER AMERICA CORPORATION, AND GATEWAY INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE A 30(b)(6) WITNESS FOR CERTAIN TOPICS PURSUANT TO L.R. 7.7(e) (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 403 RESPONSE (re #402 MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendants' Emergency Motion to Modify Case Schedule Due to Acer's Discovery Abuses ) filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 402 MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendants' Emergency Motion to Modify Case Schedule Due to Acer's Discovery Abuses filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE A 30(B)(6) WITNESS FOR CERTAIN TOPICS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting in part #396 . Motion to Compel will be heard on 2/8/2013 at 4:45 p.m. Defendants must file its response to motion to compel by 2/7/2013. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 6, 2013 Filing 400 Statement of Non-Opposition re Defendants' Emergency Motion to Modify Case Schedule filed byHTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc.. (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 6, 2013 Filing 399 RESPONSE (re #396 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL, #394 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE A 30(B)(6) WITNESS FOR CERTAIN TOPICS ) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 6, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #394 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE A 30(B)(6) WITNESS FOR CERTAIN TOPICS. Response due by 2/7/2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2013 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 5, 2013 Filing 398 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Confidential Emergency Motion to Modify Case Schedule Due to Acer's Discovery Abuses, Declarations Submitted in Support Thereof, and Certain Exhibits Attached to the Declarations filed by Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 397 Declaration of Harold Davis in Support of #396 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #396 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 396 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 395 Declaration of Harold Davis in Support of #394 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE A 30(B)(6) WITNESS FOR CERTAIN TOPICS filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #394 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 394 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE A 30(B)(6) WITNESS FOR CERTAIN TOPICS filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/19/2013. Replies due by 2/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas T. Carmack on Behalf of Defendants Technology Properties Limited and Alliacense Limited (Carmack, Thomas) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 391 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip William Marsh on Behalf of Defendants Technology Properties Limited and Alliacense Limited (Marsh, Philip) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER MODIFYING INTERIM PRE-TRIAL DATES by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (390) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG and granting (420) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 29, 2013 Filing 390 MOTION to Continue (Joint Motion Under Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 to Permit Depositions of LSI Corporation Out of Time and to Modify Select Interim Pre-Trial Dates) filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #388 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012) Modified on 1/2/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 Filing 388 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendants' Unopposed Motion Under Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 for Modest Extension of Interim Pre-Trial Dates filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Modifying Interim Pre-trial Dates)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER DENYING TPL'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, denying (384) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; denying (413) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/18/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ***EFILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. #387 ***ORDER DENYING TPL'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, denying (384) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; denying (413) Motion to Continue in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012) Modified on 12/19/2012 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2012 Filing 385 RESPONSE (re #384 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion Under Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 to Continue Trial Date and Corresponding Dates; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Walker, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 12, 2012 Filing 384 MOTION UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULES 6-3 AND 7-11 TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND CORRESPONDING DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 (Proposed) Revised Case Management Order) (Otteson, James) (Filed on 12/12/2012) Modified on 12/14/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2012 Filing 383 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE #384 **** MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion Under Civil Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 to Continue Trial Date and Corresponding Dates; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Otteson Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Revised Case Management Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 12/12/2012) Modified on 12/13/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2012 Filing 382 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 30, 2012, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number 408 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2013. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 381 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re (356, 357, 358 & 374 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) AND re (385, 387, 388 & 403 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/4/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 4, 2012 Filing 380 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 30, 2012, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number (408) 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2013. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 30, 2012 Filing 379 Minute Entry: Tutorial, Claim Construction and Motions for Reconsideration held on 11/30/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court issues construction from the bench; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Gina Galvan Colin.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2012)
November 29, 2012 Filing 378 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT 11/30/2012 TUTORIAL/CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING: Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER RE TELEPHONE APPEARANCES AT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; granting (320) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:08-cv-05398-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 376 PLAINTIFFS' JOINT MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT DURING COURT HEARING; ORDER, granting (405 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/28/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 19, 2012 Filing 375 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN ASPECTS OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION re #374 filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 11/19/2012) Modified on 11/20/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2012 Filing 374 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN ASPECTS OF FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 (Proposed) Order) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 11/19/2012) Modified on 11/20/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2012 Filing 373 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KYLE D. CHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF RE #372 filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30, #8 Exhibit 31, #9 Exhibit 32, #10 Exhibit 33, #11 Exhibit 34) (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 11/9/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2012 Filing 372 CONSOLIDATED RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF [RELATED filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 11/9/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2012 Filing 371 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN ASPECTS OF FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re #358 filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chen, #2 Exhibit-10) (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 11/9/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2012 Filing 370 REPLY SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle G. Breit in Support of Defendants' Reply Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit-A to Declaration of Michelle G. Breit)(Breit, Michelle) (Filed on 11/9/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2012 Filing 369 REPLY (re #356 MOTION for Reconsideration re #336 Order Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Certain Aspects of Claim Construction ) filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle G. Breit, #2 Exhibit A to Breit Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Breit Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Breit Declaration)(Breit, Michelle) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 368 RESPONSE (re #356 MOTION for Reconsideration re #336 Order Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Certain Aspects of Claim Construction ) OPPOSITION TO TPL'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chen, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 367 RESPONSE BRIEF TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN ASPECTS OF FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re #358 filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Exhibit-A, #3 Exhibit-B, #4 Exhibit-C, #5 Exhibit-D) (Otteson, James) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 Filing 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Kyle Chen in Support of Motion for Reconsideration and Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Kyle Chen in Support of Consolidated Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed by Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 22, 2012 Filing 365 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT CORRECTED PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPENING SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 20, 2012 Filing 364 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 10/20/2012)
October 20, 2012 Filing 363 Declaration of KYLE D. CHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPENING SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 10/20/2012)
October 20, 2012 Filing 362 Declaration of ANDREW WOLFE in Support of #361 Claim Construction Statement PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #361 ) (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 10/20/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 361 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPENING SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 360 Proposed Order re #358 MOTION for Reconsideration OF CERTAIN ASPECTS OF FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 358 MOTION for Reconsideration OF CERTAIN ASPECTS OF FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle D. Chen, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 357 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Defendants Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed by Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Otteson, #2 Exhibit 1-2 to Otteson Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3-6 to Otteson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 7-9 to Otteson Declaration, #5 Exhibit 10-11 to Otteson Declaration)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 356 MOTION for Reconsideration re #336 Order Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Certain Aspects of Claim Construction filed by Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 2, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re (384 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG, 300 in 5:08-cv-05398-PSG and 355 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG): Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN ASPECTS OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (354) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; granting (383) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG; granting (299) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:08-cv-05398-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 28, 2012 Filing 354 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Certain Aspects of First Claim Construction Order filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN ASPECTS OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (349) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; granting (378) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG; granting (294) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:08-cv-05398-PSG. Motion for Reconsideration set for 11/30/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 352 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DEFER SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (351) Stipulation in case 5:08-cv-00877-PSG; granting (380) Stipulation in case 5:08-cv-00882-PSG. Exchange of Opening Supplemental Claim Construction Briefs: 10/19/2012. Exchange of Responsive Supplemental Claim Construction Briefs: 11/9/2012. Tutorial and Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/30/2012 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re (352 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG, 352 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG, 381 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG, 381 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG, 297 in 5:08-cv-05398-PSG, 297 in 5:08-cv-05398-PSG) Order on Stipulation: 11/7/2012 Tutorial and Claims Construction Hearing reset to 11/30/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing: Motion for Reconsideration set for 11/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 351 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DEFER SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 350 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial and Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/7/2012 at 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2013 at 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 6/24/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/14/2012. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 349 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Certain Aspects of Claim Construction filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 348 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/4/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case management scheduling order to be issued. (Date Filed: 9/4/2012). (Court Reporter FTR: (3:02 to 3:33.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 347 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON 9/4/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 9/4/2012 2:00 PM Case Management Conference reset to 3:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 29, 2012 Filing 346 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC TERMINATING APPOINTMENT OF TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on August 21, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 Filing 344 STIPULATION TO DEFER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR AUGUST 28, 2012 TO SEPTEMBER 4, 2012, granting (372 in 5:08-cv-00882-PSG), (288 in 5:08-cv-05398-PSG) and (343 in 5:08-cv-00877-PSG) Stipulation filed by Gateway, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc. 8/28/2012 Case Management Conference continued to 9/4/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement to be submitted no later than 8/28/2012. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/21/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 20, 2012 Filing 343 STIPULATION to Defer Case Management Conference Currently Set for August 28, 2012 to September 4, 2012 filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 15, 2012 Filing 342 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2012. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all further proceedings. Hon. James Ware no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/15/12. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying (318) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:08-cv-00877-JW (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 6, 2012 Filing 339 Statement Supplemental of Joint Consent to Magistrate Judge Grewal by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Barco N.V., Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO PROVIDE NOTICE RE. REASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE GREWAL. Joint Statement due by 8/6/2012. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on August 2, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 337 STIPULATION re #336 Order on Further Claim Construction filed by Acer America Corporation, Alliacense Limited, Barco N.V., Gateway, Inc., Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 336 FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 12, 2012. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY FARMER PRO HAC VICE by Chief Judge James Ware, granting #334 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 7, 2012 Filing 334 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (James R. Farmer) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6877633.) filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farmer, James) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
March 16, 2012 Filing 333 Special Masters Order Recommended Discovery Order No. 3. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 332 Special Masters Order Recommended Discovery Order No. 2. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO SPECIAL MASTER; VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (238 in 3:08-cv-05398-JW) MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF TPLS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Barco NV. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/13/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 9, 2012 Filing 330 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-27-2012, before Chief Judge James Ware. Official Court Reporter Connie Kuhl, CSR, RPR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2012. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 8, 2012 Filing 329 Special Masters Order No. 1. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
January 27, 2012 Filing 328 Minute Entry: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 1/27/2012 before James Ware (Date Filed: 1/27/2012). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 327 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 1/26/2012 before James Ware (Date Filed: 1/26/2012). (Court Reporter N/A.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #325 Proposed Order filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/24/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 325 Proposed Order re Motion for Order Permitting Use of Equipment During Court Hearing by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 324 Declaration of Brandon Baum UNDER GENERAL ORDER NO. 45 REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING OF DEFENDANTS REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PAPERS filed byPatriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 323 Declaration of James C. Otteson in Support of #322 Claim Construction Statement ISO OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF FOR THE "TOP TEN" TERMS filed byPatriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EE, #2 Exhibit FF, #3 Exhibit GG, #4 Exhibit HH)(Related document(s) #322 ) (Otteson, James) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 322 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Defendants' Reply Claim Construction Brief for the "Top Ten" Terms filed by Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 11, 2012 Filing 321 DECLARATION of Kwan Chan, Technical Advisor by Kwan Chan. (Chan, Kwan) (Filed on 1/11/2012) Modified on 1/12/2012 (far, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER appointing technical advisor. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 11, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 319 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT CORRECTED PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 7, 2012 Filing 318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBIT 7 TO THE DECLARATION OF KYLE CHEN ISO PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle Chen ISO Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibit 7, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibit 7)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 1/7/2012)
January 7, 2012 Filing 317 Proposed Jury Instructions by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. INCORPORATING PLAINTIFFS CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 1/7/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 316 Declaration of Kyle Chen in Support of #315 Claim Construction Statement filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Chen Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Chen Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Chen Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Chen Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 to Chen Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 to Chen Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 to Chen Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 to Chen Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 to Chen Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 to Chen Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 to Chen Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 to Chen Declaration, #13 Exhibit 13 to Chen Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 to Chen Declaration, #15 Exhibit 15 to Chen Declaration, #16 Exhibit 16 to Chen Declaration, #17 Exhibit 17 to Chen Declaration, #18 Exhibit 18 (Part 1) to Chen Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 (Part 2) to Chen Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to Chen Declaration, #21 Exhibit 20 to Chen Declaration, #22 Exhibit 21 to Chen Declaration, #23 Exhibit 22 to Chen Declaration)(Related document(s) #315 ) (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 315 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 314 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (313 in 3:08-cv-00877-JW) Stipulation filed by Gateway, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/5/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 313 STIPULATION to Consolidate and Expand Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefing by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER by Judge James Ware in case 3:08-cv-00877-JW; granting (241) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:08-cv-05398-JW (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 23, 2011 Filing 311 Proposed Jury Instructions by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited [Proposed] Jury Instructions Incorporating Defendants' Claim Constructions. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 23, 2011 Filing 310 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief for the "Top Ten" Terms filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James C. Otteson In Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief for the "Top Ten" Terms, #2 Exhibit Exhibit X to Otteson Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Y to Otteson Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit Z to Otteson Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit AA to Otteson Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit BB to Otteson Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit CC to Otteson Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit DD to Otteson Declaration)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 309 NOTICE of intent to appoint a technical advisor. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 19, 2011. (Attachments: #1 Resume of Technical Advisor, Kwan Chan)(jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon D. Baum on behalf of Defendants Technology Properties Limited and Alliacense Limited (Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 307 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (Corrected) filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER denying defendants' motion to extend time; continuing case tutorial to January 26, 2012 by Judge James Ware in case 3:08-cv-00877-JW; denying (330) Motion in case 3:08-cv-00882-JW; denying (231) Motion in case 3:08-cv-05398-JW (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 19, 2011 Filing 305 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (AMENDED, JOINT) filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 11/19/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Gail Breit Notice of Appearance of Michelle G. Breit on Behalf of Defendants Technology Properties Limited and Alliacense Limited (Breit, Michelle) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 303 RESPONSE to re #301 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Opposition to Defendants Motion for Relief from First Patent Scheduling Order by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (229 in 3:08-cv-05398-JW) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Technology Properties Ltd., Alliacense Ltd. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/16/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 301 NOTICE by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND EXPEDITED MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FIRST PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-3; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James C. Otteson In Support Of Expedited Relief From First Patent Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Second Patent Scheduling Order)(Otteson, James) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by James Carl Otteson CORRECTION OF DOCKET #299. (Otteson, James) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 299 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #300 NOTICE of Appearance by James Carl Otteson Notice of Appearance of James C. Otteson on Behalf of Defendants Technology Properites Limited and Alliacense Limited (Otteson, James) (Filed on 11/15/2011) Modified on 11/16/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2011 Filing 298 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by John L. Cooper Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Defendants Technology Properties Limited and Alliacense Limited and [Proposed] Order (Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 FIRST PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER; NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPOINT A SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 296 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/3/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 10/3/2011). Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Tutorial Hearing set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter N/A.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 295 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 294 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Walker, Timothy) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL Status Report due by 9/23/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/13/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2011 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/8/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Ware for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 09/01/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 290 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement Under Patent Local Rule 4-3 filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 289 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/24/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/24/2011). Markman hearing set for 11/14/2011 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 288 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Alliacense Limited, Barco N.V., Gateway, Inc., Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 287 CLERKS NOTICE-RE TIME CHANGE Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2011 will be heard at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on May 13, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
April 28, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. Markman Hearing previously set for 5/10/2011 VACATED pursuant to Order issued 4/28/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER VACATING MARKMAN HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 28, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 283 Declaration of Nan E. Joesten in Support of #282 Statement, DECLARATION OF NAN E. JOESTEN IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STATEMENT REQUESTING ORDER ON CLAIM TERMS TO BE CONSTRUED filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Related document(s) #282 ) (Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 282 Statement JOINT STATEMENT REQUESTING ORDER ON CLAIM TERMS TO BE CONSTRUED by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Alliacense Limited, Gateway, Inc., Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 284 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 4/22/2011) re (282 in 5:08-cv-00882-JF) MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, (178 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF) MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-6 filed by Technology Properties Ltd., Alliacense Ltd, (159 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF) MOTION to Amend/Correct Barcos First Amended Invalidity Contentions (REDACTED) MOTION to Amend/Correct Barcos First Amended Invalidity Contentions (REDACTED) filed by Barco NV, (258 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF) MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, (275 in 5:08-cv-00882-JF) MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, (249 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF) MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, (173 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF) MOTION to Amend/Correct DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 5,530,890 PURSUANT TO PATENT L.R. 3-6 filed by Technology Properties Ltd., Alliacense Ltd. The motions are taken under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 281 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #280 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS 14-19 TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. RATINOFF by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER GRANTING #271 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE EXHIBITS 14-19 TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. RATINOFF UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/20/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE #280 FOR ORDER*** ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION #271 TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 20, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011) Modified on 4/21/2011 (jflc2, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 Filing 278 Declaration of Eugene Y Mar in Support of #277 Reply to Opposition/Response,, Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Defendants' Motions to Amend Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent Nos. 5,530,890 (Dkt. No. 249) and 5,440,749 (Dkt. No. 258) filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #277 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 277 REPLY (re #258 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7, #249 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 ) Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Defendants' Motions to Amend Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent Nos. 5,530,890 (Dkt. No. 249) and 5,440,749 (Dkt. No. 258) filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 276 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. of Service of Court's Order Denying Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint on Charles Moore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 275 Declaration of Mac Leckrone in Support of #271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS 14-19 TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. RATINOFF filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #271 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 274 Declaration of JEFFREY M. RATINOFF in Support of #273 Opposition/Response to Motion,, FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS [DKT. NOS. 249 AND 258] filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20)(Related document(s) #273 ) (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 273 RESPONSE (re #258 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7, #249 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 ) OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS [DKT. NOS. 249 AND 258] filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 272 Proposed Order re #271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS 14-19 TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. RATINOFF by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS 14-19 TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. RATINOFF filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/8/2011) Modified on 4/21/2011 (jflc2, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2011 Filing 270 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc. NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5(d) (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 269 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #273 . *** RESPONSE (re #258 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7, #249 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 ) ACER, INC.'S, ACER AMERICA CORP.'S AND GATEWAY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS [DKT. NOS. 249 AND 258] filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/8/2011) Modified on 4/11/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2011 Filing 268 Brief re #218 Claim Construction Statement, #264 Order PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED SURREPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF CORRECTION OF DOCKET #265 . filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #218 , #264 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER DENYING MOTION #223 FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 7, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 266 Brief re #227 Reply Memorandum DECL OF ANDREW WOLFE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' SURREPLY ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed byAcer America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #227 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 265 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #268 . *** Brief re #227 Reply Memorandum PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED SURREPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byAcer America Corporation. (Related document(s) #227 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Modified on 4/8/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED SURREPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 5, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO SET THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 5,440,749 AND U.S. PATENT NO. 5,530,890. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 31, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 262 Declaration of Nan E. Joesten in Support of #261 Stipulation, filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #261 ) (Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 261 STIPULATION re #258 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7, #249 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 260 Declaration of Nan E. Joesten in Support of #258 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Envelope F)(Related document(s) #258 ) (Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 259 Declaration of Dimas Brataadiredja in Support of #258 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #258 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 258 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 5,440,749 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 24, 2011 Filing 257 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/18/2011, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2011. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 256 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #255 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal UNREDACTED Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting #237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 254 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2011 before Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 3/18/2011) re (223 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF) MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The motion is taken under submission. Markman hearing set for 5/10/2011 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ***FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #255 ***ORDER GRANTING MOTION #237 TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 18, 2011. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (gm, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION #244 TO FILE SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO JOIN CHARLES H. MOORE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 18, 2011. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 251 Declaration of Dimas Brataadiredja in Support of #249 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #249 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 250 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar in Support of #249 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #249 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 249 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 16, 2011 Filing 248 CLERKS NOTICE Motion for Leave to File Hearing set for 3/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 16, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. Hearing date on Administrative Motion Docket #237 terminated (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 247 RESPONSE (re #244 MOTION for Permission to File a Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore ) filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 246 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Acer America Corporation. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 245 Declaration of Nan E. Joesten in Support of #244 MOTION for Permission to File a Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #244 ) (Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 244 MOTION for Permission to File a Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 243 REPLY (re #223 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore ) filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 242 RESPONSE (re #233 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief ) CORRECTION OF DOCUMENT #240 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Surreply Claim Construction Brief, and Proposed Surreply in the Alternative filed byPatriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/4/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 Filing 241 Declaration of Nan E. Joesten in Support of #240 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #240 ) (Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 240 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #242 . *** RESPONSE (re #233 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief ) [Opposition to Motion] filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Surreply Claim Construction Brief, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Surreply Claim Construction Brief)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2011 Filing 239 Declaration of Scott Andrews in Support of #238 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #238 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 25, 2011 Filing 238 RESPONSE (re #223 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore ) Opposition to Motion [REDACTED] filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 25, 2011 Filing 237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Technology Properties LTD's and Alliacense LTD's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/25/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (gm, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting #225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on February 23, 2011. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 234 Declaration of Jas S. Dhillon in Support of #233 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #233 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 233 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 232 RESPONSE (re #229 MOTION Requesting Case Management Conference ) Opposition in Part to Defendants' Request filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 231 Declaration of Daniel E. Leckrone in Support of #225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3, 5, 6 and 8 to Dhillon Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #225 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 230 Declaration of Jas Dhillon in Support of #223 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore (Supplemental) filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 16, 2011 Filing 229 MOTION Requesting Case Management Conference filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 228 Declaration of Deepak Gupta in Support of #227 Reply Memorandum filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #227 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 227 Reply Memorandum in Support of #212 Defendants' Claim Construction Statement filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 226 Declaration of Jas S. Dhillon in Support of #223 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3, 5, 6 and 8 to Dhillon Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Dhillon Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 224 Declaration of Jas S. Dhillon in Support of #223 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 223 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Join Charles H. Moore filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Gramting Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 222 Declaration of Eugene Mar in Support of #213 Declaration in Support, [CORRECTED Declaration of Eugene Mar In Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief] filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #213 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 221 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT #212 CORRECTED Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION #217 TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on February 9, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 1, 2011 Filing 219 Declaration of Mac Leckrone in Support of #217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibits E, F, G and J to the Declaration of Kyle Chen in Support of Plaintiffs Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #217 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 218 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF CORRECTION OF DOCKET #215 . filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibits E, F, G and J to the Declaration of Kyle Chen in Support of Plaintiffs Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Chen Declaration ISO Administrative Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Administrative Motion to Seal)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 216 Declaration of KYLE CHEN in Support of #215 Claim Construction Statement PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) #215 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 215 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #218 . *** CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 1/21/2011) Modified on 1/26/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2010 Filing 214 EXHIBITS re #213 Declaration in Support, Exhibits M through W to Declaration of Eugene Mar in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P through Q, #2 Exhibit R through W)(Related document(s) #213 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 9, 2010 Filing 213 Declaration of Eugene Mar in Support of #212 Claim Construction Statement filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through F, #2 Exhibit G through J, #3 Exhibit K through L)(Related document(s) #212 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 9, 2010 Filing 212 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE AND EXPAND PAGE LIMITS FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING re (111 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF), (205 in 5:08-cv-00882-JF), (209 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/23/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING #195 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/19/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 209 STIPULATION to Consolidate and Expand Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefing by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 208 Declaration of Daniel E. Leckrone in Support of #200 Memorandum in Opposition [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #202] filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #200 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Paul A. Alsdorf in Opposition to #200 Memorandum in Opposition re #195 Ex Parte Application for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #200 ) (Alsdorf, Paul) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 206 Declaration of Charles H. Moore in Support of #200 Memorandum in Opposition [of TPL's Response to Acer's Motion Regarding Privileged Documents] filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #200 ) (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 205 Declaration of Daniel E. Leckrone in Support of #200 Memorandum in Opposition [Supplemental Declaration of Daniel E. Leckrone in Support of TPL's Response to Acer's Motion Regarding Privileged Documents] filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Related document(s) #200 ) (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 204 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2010 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 11/2/2010) re #195 (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 203 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement [JOINT] filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Daniel E. Leckrone in Opposition to #195 Ex Parte Application for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents filed byTechnology Properties Limited. (Attachments: *** #1 Exhibit 1 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #195 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 10/28/2010) Modified on 11/4/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2010 Filing 201 DECLARATION of Paul A. Alsdorf in Opposition to #195 Ex Parte Application for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents filed byTechnology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #195 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 200 Memorandum in Opposition re #195 Ex Parte Application for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents filed byTechnology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE SCHEDULING DATES re (192 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF), (187 in 5:08-cv-00882-JF), (108 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/26/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 198 EXHIBITS re #195 Ex Parte Application for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents Amended Exhibit 3 and 4 To The Declaration of Jas Dhillon filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #195 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING #193 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/25/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING #194 Motion to Shorten Time. Plaintiffs' motion #195 shall be heard on 11/02/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants shall file any opposition brief by 10/28/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/25/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 195 Ex Parte Application for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents, #2 Declaration of Jas Dhillon In Support Of for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 194 MOTION to Shorten Time RE Ex Parte Motion for Immediate Resolution of Dispute Over Two Allegedly Privileged Documents filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Shorten Time, #2 Declaration of Jas Dhillon In Support Of Motion to Shorten Time)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 193 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Ratinoff Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Notice to Defendants)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 192 STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE SCHEDULING DATES by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE SCHEDULING DATES (approving #185 in 5:08-cv-00882-JF, #106 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF. #189 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/20/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 190 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #188 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 13 - 29 to The Declaration of Jeffrey Ratinoff in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed Under Seal Exhibits 15-19, #2 Exhibit Filed Under Seal Exhibits 20-25, #3 Exhibit Filed Under Seal Exhibits 26-29)(Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 189 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Scheduling Dates by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER GRANTING #178 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER (1) DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND (2) DENYING BARCO N.V.'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/10/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 186 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 9/3/2010) re (167 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF) MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, (176 in 5:08-cv-00882-JF) MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, (79 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF) MOTION for Attorney Fees REGARDING UNITED STATES PATENT NO. 5,784,584, (81 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF) MOTION for Entry of Judgment REGARDING U.S. PATENT NO. 5,784,584, (90 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF) MOTION to Amend Infringement Contentions. The motions are taken under submission. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 185 Declaration of Mac Leckrone in Support of #178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 13-29 to the Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #178 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Support re #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO PATENT L.R. 3-7 filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #175 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/16/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. re #179 Declaration in Support, of Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 181 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc. re #176 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 180 Proposed Order re #178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 13-29 to the Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 179 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff in Support of #178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 13-29 to the Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #178 ) (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 13-29 to the Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 177 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff in Support of #176 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-7 filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-29 to Declaration of Jeffrey M. Ratinoff)(Related document(s) #176 ) (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 176 Memorandum in Opposition re #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO PATENT L.R. 3-7 filed byAcer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 175 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS DESIGNATION OF CONSULTANT PURSUANT TO SECTION 7.4 OF THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #173 extention of time for Plaintiffs' to file motion for protective order regarding designation of consultant under the stipulated protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/07/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 173 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Plaintiffs' to File Motion for Protective Order Regarding Designation of Consultant Under the Stipulated Protective Order by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 172 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Designation of Consultant Pursuant to Section 7.4 of the #171 Stipulated Protective Order by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2010) Modified on 8/3/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS THE SECOND CLAIM OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #165 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/28/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 170 Proposed Order re #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO PATENT L.R. 3-7 by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 169 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar in Support of #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO PATENT L.R. 3-7 filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 D)(Related document(s) #167 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 168 Declaration of Benjamin Chiu in Support of #167 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO PATENT L.R. 3-7 filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 167 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO PATENT L.R. 3-7 filed by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 166 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2010 is CONTINUED to 9/3/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 165 STIPULATION Request to Dismiss the Second Claim of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,784,584 and [Proposed] Order Thereon by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 1, 2010 Filing 164 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Stephanie Powers Skaff Notice of Removal of Counsel and Notice of Appearance (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting (159) Motion to Relate Case Number CV-10-00816-JF (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re #161 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/6/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 161 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order by Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 160 EXHIBITS re #159 Joint MOTION to Relate Case - Joint Civil L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related and Requesting Entry of Case Schedule (Exhibit A) filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Related document(s) #159 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 159 Joint MOTION to Relate Case - Joint Civil L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related and Requesting Entry of Case Schedule filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 2, 2010 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 157 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/12/2010, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2010. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 155 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/12/2010) re (67 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF) MOTION to Dismiss. The Court grants the motion. Further Case Management Conference held on 2/12/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/12/2010). The Court lifts the stay and adopts Acer and Barco's proposed case schedule plus 60 days. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2010)
February 8, 2010 Filing 154 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
November 16, 2009 Filing 152 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/13/2009, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2010. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 13, 2009 Filing 153 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 11/13/2009). Further Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 151 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Second Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 21, 2009 Filing 150 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2009 is continued to 11/13/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
September 18, 2009 Filing 149 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 9/18/2009). Further Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 148 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT TPL's Supplemental to the September 8 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 147 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by Alliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 146 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/12/2009, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2009. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #126 & #109 MOTIONS TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/16/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING #137 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-3. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #136 Stipulated Protective Order, filed by Gateway, Inc., Acer America Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 06/16/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 12, 2009 Filing 145 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2009 before Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/12/2009) re (109 in 5:08-cv-00882-JF) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings, (126 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings, (42 in 5:08-cv-05398-JF) MOTION FOR EXEMPTION FROM ADR PROCESS. The motions to stay are taken under submission. The motion for exemption is granted. The case management conference is not held. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/12/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 141 Proposed Order re #139 Memorandum in Opposition, DENYING ACER'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME, by Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 140 Declaration of NAN E. JOESTEN in Support of #139 Memorandum in Opposition, TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME filed byAlliacense Limited, Technology Properties Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #139 ) (Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 139 Memorandum in Opposition re #137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent L.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed byAlliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Technology Properties Limited. (Joesten, Nan) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 138 Declaration of Jas S. Dhillon in Support of #137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent L.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #137 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent L.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time for Compliance with Patent L.R. 4-3)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 4, 2009 Filing 136 STIPULATION Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Protective Order by Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order), #2 Exhibit 2 (Defendants' Proposed Protective Order))(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 6/4/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 135 Declaration of Harold H. Davis in Support of #134 Response in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #134 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Support re #126 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 133 Proposed Order re #126 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 132 DECLARATION of Eugene Y. Mar in Opposition to ( #126 ) Acer's Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Modified to add linkage on 5/26/2009 (srm, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Filing 131 Memorandum in Opposition re #126 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part #102 Motion for Protective Order; denying #105 Motion for Protective Order (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. The hearing on the Motion to Stay Proceedings set for 6/5/2009 is CONTINUED to 6/12/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/13/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 128 STIPULATION Regarding Case Scheduling by Acer, Inc., Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited, Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Barco N.V. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Text modified on 5/12/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 Filing 127 Declaration in Support of #126 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #126 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 126 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 15, 2009 Filing 125 Declaration in support of Motion FILED UNDER SEAL. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting #104 Motion to Seal Document #110 Declaration in Support, (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 14, 2009 Filing 123 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2009 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 4/14/2009) re #102 , #105 . (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 122 Declaration of Harold H. Davis in Support of #121 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Enter Protective Order and Allow Plaintiffs to Disclose Patent L.R. 3-1 Exchange filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #121 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 121 Reply to Opposition re #102 MOTION for Protective Order and to Allow Plaintiffs to Disclose Patent L.R. 3-1 Exchange filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 120 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar in Support of #119 Reply Memorandum, in Support of Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #119 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 119 Reply Memorandum re #105 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Reply to Acer's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 118 Declaration of Harold H. Davis in Support of #117 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion for Entry of a Protective Order filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #117 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 117 Memorandum in Opposition re #105 MOTION for Protective Order filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Entry of a Protective Order)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 116 Declaration of Mac Leckrone in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 115 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar in Support of #114 Memorandum in Opposition, to Acer's Motion to Enter Protective Order and to Allow Plaintiffs to Disclose Patent L.R. 3-1 Exchange filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #114 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 114 Memorandum in Opposition re #102 MOTION for Protective Order and to Allow Plaintiffs to Disclose Patent L.R. 3-1 Exchange filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 17, 2009 Filing 113 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Fisher in Support of #104 MOTION to Seal Document filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Sealing Order)(Related document(s) #104 ) (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 112 ANSWER to Counterclaim byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 111 NOTICE by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. re #102 MOTION for Protective Order and to Allow Plaintiffs to Disclose Patent L.R. 3-1 Exchange Notice of Motion for Protective Order and Allow Plaintiffs to Disclose Patent L.R. 3-1 Exchange (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 110 Declaration of Harold H. Davis in Support of #104 MOTION to Seal Document filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit B: Sealed)(Related document(s) #104 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 109 Proposed Order re #105 MOTION for Protective Order by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 108 Declaration of Divya Madhyasta in Support of #105 MOTION for Protective Order filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Related document(s) #105 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 107 Declaration of Torsten Partsch in Support of #105 MOTION for Protective Order filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Related document(s) #105 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 106 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar in Support of #105 MOTION for Protective Order filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #105 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 105 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 104 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 103 Declaration of Harold H. Davis in Support of #102 MOTION for Protective Order and to Allow Plaintiffs to Disclose Patent L.R. 3-1 Exchange filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Enter Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A : Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C: Printout from Defendant TPL's Website)(Related document(s) #102 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 102 MOTION for Protective Order and to Allow Plaintiffs to Disclose Patent L.R. 3-1 Exchange filed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING #100 JOINT MOTION REGARDING PROPOSED CASE SCHEDULES. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 100 Joint MOTION for Discovery Regarding Proposed Case Schedule filed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 99 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 98 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. Filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting #52 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting (81) Motion for Leave to File and denying (80) Motion for Reconsideration in case 5:08-cv-00877-JF; granting (73) Motion for Leave to File and denying (71) Motion for Reconsideration in case 5:08-cv-00882-JF (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 95 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/30/2009, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2009. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 93 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/30/2009, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2009. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 92 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 19, 2008, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kristen Moody, Telephone number (408) 981-6070. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2009. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 94 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 1/30/2009) re (80 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF) MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, (73 in 5:08-cv-00882-JF) MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and Notice of Motion filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, (52 in 5:08-cv-00877-JF) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Gateway, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer, Inc., Further Case Management Conference held on 1/30/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 1/30/2009). The motions are taken under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 91 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated filed by Acer, Inc., Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited, Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 90 Declaration of John L. Cooper in Support of #89 Reply to Opposition, #80 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #89 , #80 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 89 Reply to Opposition re #80 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 88 Declaration of Jas Dhillon in Support of #87 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #87 ) (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 87 Memorandum in Opposition re #80 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 6, 2009 Filing 86 CLERKS NOTICE Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration is set for hearing on 1/30/2009 at 9:00 a.m. Any response to the motion is due 1/21/2009. Any reply is due 1/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Filing 85 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 19, 2008 Filing 84 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/19/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 12/19/2008). Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2009 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2009 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Kristen Moody.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 83 Proposed Order re #81 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Consideration and Granding Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration by Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 82 Declaration of Dan Leckrone in Support of #80 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Consideration filed by Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2009 10:30 AM. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 80 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2009 10:30 AM. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting #70 Motion to Relate Cases. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 78 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion For Leave To Amend and Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2008 at 9:00 a.m. are RE-SET for 12/19/08 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part #55 Motion to Compel (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 76 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2008 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 12/16/2008) re #55 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 75 Statement of Non-Opposition re #70 MOTION to Relate Case Barco's L.R. 3-12 Admin. Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #70 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 74 Memorandum in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Relate Case Barco's L.R. 3-12 Admin. Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 73 Counterdefendants' ANSWER to Counterclaim byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 72 Proposed Order re #70 MOTION to Relate Case Barco's L.R. 3-12 Admin. Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Barco N.V.. (Runyan, Edward) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 71 Declaration of Edward Runyan in Support of #70 MOTION to Relate Case Barco's L.R. 3-12 Admin. Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byBarco N.V.. (Related document(s) #70 ) (Runyan, Edward) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 70 MOTION to Relate Case Barco's L.R. 3-12 Admin. Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Barco N.V.. (Runyan, Edward) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 69 Declaration of Ares Yang in Support of #66 Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed byAcer, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #66 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 68 Declaration of Michael Barry in Support of #66 Response in Support Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed byAcer, Inc.. (Related document(s) #66 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 67 Declaration of Harold H. Davis in Support of #66 Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #66 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Support re #52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 65 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Fisher in Support of #64 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel The Depositions and Trial Testimony of Plaintiffs' Witnesses in this District filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #64 ) (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 64 Reply to Opposition re #55 MOTION to Compel The Depositions and Trial Testimony of Plaintiffs' Witnesses in this District filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 63 Declaration of Harold H. Davis in Support of #62 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Compel the Depositions and Trail Testimony of Plaintiffs Witnesses in this District filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #62 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 62 Memorandum in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Compel The Depositions and Trial Testimony of Plaintiffs' Witnesses in this District filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Compel the Depositions and Trail Testimony of Plaintiffs' Witnesses in this District)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 61 Memorandum in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 60 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AND, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #57 Stipulation, filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/19/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 19, 2008 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harold H. Davis, Jr (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 57 STIPULATION re #55 MOTION to Compel The Depositions and Trial Testimony of Plaintiffs' Witnesses in this District Stipulated Request for Order Shortening Time by Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 56 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Fisher in Support of #55 MOTION to Compel The Depositions and Trial Testimony of Plaintiffs' Witnesses in this District filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 55 MOTION to Compel The Depositions and Trial Testimony of Plaintiffs' Witnesses in this District filed by Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 54 Proposed Order re #52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 53 Declaration of Harold H Davis in Support of #52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #52 ) (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 51 Transcript of Proceedings before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2009. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 50 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 11/7/2008). The Court adopts the proposed case schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2008 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 49 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session on 10/2/08 & 10/15/08, case not settled, phone discussions within 2 weeks, mediation continuing. Signed by Mediator, Jack Slobodin, dated 11/5/08. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 48 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING #19 MOTION TO DISMISS, TO TRANSFER VENUE, AND TO STAY. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 46 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 9/19/2008) re #19 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is taken under submission. Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2008 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2008)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING re #44 Stipulation Regarding Deferral of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference until September 19, 2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2008 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/21/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 44 STIPULATION re #43 Clerk's Notice, Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing and ORDER by Technology Properties Limited. (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 5, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 10/2/2008 10:00 AM., at the offices of K&L Gates LLP, 55 Second Street, San Francisco, CA. Briefs submitted to the mediator only 10 days before the session. There is a 10-page limit. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
July 31, 2008 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on Thursday, July 31, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 29, 2008 ADR Remark: Mediator would like to conduct the pre mediation telephone conference call at 10:00 a.m. on July 31, 2008. Counsel to confirm their availability for the call directly with mediator as soon as possible. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion to Dismiss, Transfer and/or Stay and the Case Management Conference to 8/8/2008 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 42 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 41 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Fisher in Support of #40 Reply Memorandum, in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #40 ) (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 40 Reply Memorandum re #19 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 39 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Jack L. Slobodin as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 11, 2008 Filing 38 Declaration of Michael Flannery in Support of Plaintiffs' #34 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 7/11/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2008 Filing 37 Declaration of Acer America Corp. in Support of Plaintiffs' #34 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 7/11/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2008 Filing 36 Declaration of Acer Inc. in Support of Plaintiffs' #34 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 7/11/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2008 Filing 35 Declaration of Jas Dhillon in Support of #34 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 7/11/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2008 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' #19 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dhillon, Jas) (Filed on 7/11/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2008: #2 Table of Contents and Authorities) (gm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING re #31 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/18/08. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING re #30 Stipulation Regarding Deferral of Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/12/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 17, 2008 Filing 31 STIPULATION to Extend Mediation Deadline by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 5, 2008 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 6/4/2008 by Daniel Bowling ADR Staff Attorney. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 30 STIPULATION Stipulation Regarding Deferral of Case Management Conference Until August 1, 2008 by Technology Properties Limited. (Dutton, Helen) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
May 27, 2008 Filing 29 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, June 4, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. The ADR Unit will initiate the call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/23/08. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE STAYING DISCOVERY AND DEFERRING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #26 Stipulation filed by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited Further Case Management Conference reschuled for 7/18/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/22/08. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 20, 2008 Filing 26 STIPULATION REGARDING STAY OF DISCOVERY AND DEFERRAL OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS by Technology Properties Limited, Alliacense Limited. (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold H. Davis, Jr and Timothy Walker, PhD (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 23 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RELATED CASE ORDER re #7 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/22/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
April 25, 2008 Filing 21 Declaration of Mike Davis in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 25, 2008 Filing 20 Declaration of John L. Cooper in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byTechnology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Cooper, John) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 25, 2008 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Transfer Case and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, John) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. (Chen, Kyle) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 9, 2008 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. Patriot Scientific Corporation served on 4/2/2008, answer due 4/22/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 9, 2008 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. Alliacense Limited served on 4/2/2008, answer due 4/22/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 9, 2008 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. Technology Properties Limited served on 4/2/2008, answer due 4/22/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. Summons and Complaint (Patriot Scientific Corp.) (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. Summons and Complaint (Alliacense Limited) (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. Summons and Complaint (Technology Properties Limited) (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. re #9 Proposed Order, #7 MOTION to Relate Case Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #8 Declaration in Support, (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Relate Case Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 9 Proposed Order re #7 MOTION to Relate Case Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 8 Declaration of Mark R. Weinstein in Support of #7 MOTION to Relate Case Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Relate Case Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 3-12 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Weinstein, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 03/21/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 19, 2008 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.. (Chen, Kyle) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008) (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Summons Issued as to Alliacense Limited. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2008. Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2008 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Technology Properties Limited, Patriot Scientific Corporation, Alliacense Limited ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611002551). Filed byAcer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc.\ (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Summons Issued as to Patriot Scientific Corporation. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Summons Issued as to Technology Properties Limited. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acer, Inc. et al v. Technology Properties Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Thomas HR Denver
Represented By: Thomas H R Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Eugene Y. Mar
Represented By: David L. Lansky
Represented By: Nan E. Joesten
Represented By: Brandon D. Baum
Represented By: Philip William Marsh
Represented By: Jedediah Phillips
Represented By: James Carl Otteson
Represented By: Irvin E. Tyan
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Represented By: Thomas T. Carmack
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliacense Limited
Represented By: Eugene Y. Mar
Represented By: David L. Lansky
Represented By: Nan E. Joesten
Represented By: Brandon D. Baum
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Represented By: Philip William Marsh
Represented By: Jedediah Phillips
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Irvin E. Tyan
Represented By: James Carl Otteson
Represented By: Vinh Huy Pham
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Represented By: Thomas T. Carmack
Represented By: James R. Farmer
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology Properties Limited
Represented By: Eugene Y. Mar
Represented By: Helen E. Dutton
Represented By: David L. Lansky
Represented By: Nan E. Joesten
Represented By: Brandon D. Baum
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Represented By: Philip William Marsh
Represented By: Jedediah Phillips
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Irvin E. Tyan
Represented By: James Carl Otteson
Represented By: Vinh Huy Pham
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Represented By: Thomas T. Carmack
Represented By: James R. Farmer
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acer, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Crocker
Represented By: Samuel Citron O'Rourke
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: William Sloan Coats, III
Represented By: Michael J. Abernathy, Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Paar Walker
Represented By: Jas S Dhillon
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Nathaniel Haycock
Represented By: Brian J Arnold
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Crocker
Represented By: Samuel Citron O'Rourke
Represented By: Brandon D. Baum
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Represented By: William Sloan Coats, III
Represented By: Michael J. Abernathy, Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Paar Walker
Represented By: Jas S Dhillon
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Nathaniel Haycock
Represented By: Brian J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acer America Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Crocker
Represented By: Samuel Citron O'Rourke
Represented By: Brandon D. Baum
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: William Sloan Coats, III
Represented By: Michael J. Abernathy, Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Paar Walker
Represented By: Jas S Dhillon
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Nathaniel Haycock
Represented By: Brian J Arnold
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barco N.V.
Represented By: Brandon D. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Non Party Texas Instruments Incorporated
Represented By: Anupam Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LSI Corporation
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kwan Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?