Castillo v. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sylvia Castillo
Defendant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 5:2008cv01247
Filed: March 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: 39 CASES ARE NOT RELATED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/19/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal re: 36 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Stipulation filed by P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/29/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Castillo
Represented By: David M. Arbogast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Dianne Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?