Eagle North America, Inc. v. Genesis Fluid Solutions, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Eagle North America, Inc.
Defendant: Genesis Fluid Solutions, LTD and Michael K Hodges
Case Number: 5:2008cv02060
Filed: April 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Proposed Order filed by Eagle North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/15/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 27 Motion to Apply California Law to Attorney's Fees. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER 21 Extending Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/15/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle North America, Inc. v. Genesis Fluid Solutions, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle North America, Inc.
Represented By: Wallace Merlin Tice-Wallner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Fluid Solutions, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?